Jimkoski v. McLaren Bay Region
Plaintiff: Angela M Jimkoski
Defendant: McLaren Bay Region
Case Number: 1:2019cv13298
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders by 1/7/2020.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by McLaren Bay Region (Fossee, Carol)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by McLaren Bay Region. (Fossee, Carol)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. McLaren Bay Region served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Gafkay, Julie)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol L. Fossee on behalf of McLaren Bay Region. (Fossee, Carol)
November 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *McLaren Bay Region* (DAll)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Angela M Jimkoski against McLaren Bay Region with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7480105 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Bay County - County Where Action Arose: Bay County - County of 1st Defendant: Bay County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gafkay, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimkoski v. McLaren Bay Region
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M Jimkoski
Represented By: Julie A. Gafkay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLaren Bay Region
Represented By: Carol L. Fossee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?