Sabra Health Care Frankenmuth, LLC v. Senior Living Frankenmuth, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sabra Health Care Frankenmuth, LLC
Defendant: Senior Living Frankenmuth, LLC and Senior Village Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv13570
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statement Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders by 2/3/2020.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Senior Living Frankenmuth, LLC (Vogt, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Senior Village Management, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Welltower Inc. for Senior Village Management, LLC. (Vogt, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Vogt, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Vacating #8 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. (Response due by 1/17/2020. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Grace on behalf of All Defendants. (Grace, Peter)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Moore on behalf of All Defendants. (Moore, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (ECF No.8) by Sabra Health Care Frankenmuth, LLC. (Barnes, Dennis)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael R. Vogt appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Vogt, Michael)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 1/23/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Senior Village Management, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Barnes, Dennis)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Senior Living Frankenmuth, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Barnes, Dennis)
December 4, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Senior Village Management, LLC* (NAhm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Senior Living Frankenmuth, LLC* (NAhm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Denise Page Hood* and *Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford* to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (NAhm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Barnes, Dennis)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7510620 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: Saginaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Barnes, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabra Health Care Frankenmuth, LLC v. Senior Living Frankenmuth, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Living Frankenmuth, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Vogt
Represented By: Peter M. Grace
Represented By: Brian M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Village Management, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Vogt
Represented By: Peter M. Grace
Represented By: Brian M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabra Health Care Frankenmuth, LLC
Represented By: Dennis M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?