Kutchinski v. Freeland Community School District et al
Plaintiff: Jason Kutchinski
Defendant: Traci L Smith, Freeland Community School District and Matthew A Cairy
Case Number: 1:2019cv13810
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/29/2022 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/31/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2022 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 11/28/2022 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (WBar)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING FERPA; Terminating #31 MOTION to Compel; and Extending Discovery, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 1/3/2022 (Court Reporter: Not on the Record) (WBar)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response re #31 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Jason Kutchinski. (Ellison, Philip)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by All Defendants. (Mair, Gregory)
December 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Discovery Dispute Status Conference set for 1/3/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Jason Kutchinski. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests (with Responses), #3 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Proposed Order) (Ellison, Philip)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Scheduling Order Dates; ( Discovery due by 12/17/2021;, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/21/2022,) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/22/2021 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/22/2021 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2022 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (WBar)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/22/2021 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 7/22/2021 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (WBar)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/22/2021 03:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE by Jason Kutchinski re SCOTUS Decision in MAHANOY AREA SCHOOLS v. B.L. (Ellison, Philip)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING OUTCOME OF MAHANOY AREA SCHOOLS V. B.L. IN THE UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob G Lyday on behalf of All Defendants. (Lyday, Jacob)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Attorney Withdrawal with stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 3/1/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/30/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy, Jury Trial set for 10/5/2021 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See order for additional dates). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 11/30/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/29/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy, Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WITNESS LIST by Matthew A Cairy, Freeland Community School District, Traci L Smith (Mair, Gregory)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Exhibit List by Matthew A Cairy, Freeland Community School District, Traci L Smith. (Mair, Gregory)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/30/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 10/30/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (WBar)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Scheduling Conference held on 4/14/2020, (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (WBar)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/14/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy***Joint Rule 26(f) Plan due on or before 4/8/2020*** (WBar)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference RESET for 3/25/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy***PLEASE USE THE FOLLOWING CALL-IN INFORMATION: (888) 363-4734; Access Code: 2541474*** (WBar) Modified on 3/16/2020 (WBar).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Mair, Gregory)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Mair, Gregory)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint filed by Jason Kutchinski against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Student Handbook, #2 Exhibit B - Instagram Screenshots, #3 Exhibit C - Smith Statement, #4 Exhibit D - OLC Letter, #5 Exhibit E - IP Addresses, #6 Exhibit F - OLC Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Cairy Letter) (Ellison, Philip)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas Paul Gamber appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Gamber, Nicholas)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Gronda, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint Jury Demand and New Matter by All Defendants. (Mair, Gregory)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Mair, Gregory)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Gronda on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gronda, Matthew)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Matthew A Cairy served on 1/2/2020, answer due 2/28/2020; Freeland Community School District served on 1/2/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Ellison, Philip)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Mair on behalf of All Defendants. (Mair, Gregory)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Matthew A Cairy waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020; Freeland Community School District waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020; Traci L Smith waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Ellison, Philip)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jason Kutchinski against Matthew A Cairy, Freeland Community School District, Traci L Smith with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7541747 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: Saginaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Student Handbook, #2 Exhibit B - Instagram Screenshots, #3 Exhibit C - Traci Smith Statement, #4 Exhibit D - May 22, 2019 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Instagram IP Addresses Record, #6 Exhibit F - July 1, 2019 Letter, #7 Exhibit G - 10 Day Suspension Letter) (Ellison, Philip)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kutchinski v. Freeland Community School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci L Smith
Represented By: Gregory W. Mair
Represented By: Jacob G Lyday
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Gamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeland Community School District
Represented By: Gregory W. Mair
Represented By: Jacob G Lyday
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Gamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A Cairy
Represented By: Gregory W. Mair
Represented By: Jacob G Lyday
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Gamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Kutchinski
Represented By: Philip L. Ellison
Represented By: Matthew E. Gronda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?