MacRury v. American Steamship Company
Plaintiff: Mark MacRury
Defendant: American Steamship Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv10523
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Thomas L Ludington
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
3 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Galea on behalf of American Steamship Company. (Galea, Paul)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Rejecting Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Markus Edgars Apelis on behalf of American Steamship Company. (Apelis, Markus)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Waiver of Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *American Steamship Company* (ATee)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (SSch)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Correction re 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. (SKra)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark MacRury against American Steamship Company with Jury Demand. Fee waiver included in accordance with 28 USC 1916. Plaintiff requests summons issued. County of 1st Plaintiff: Iosco - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Pre-Payment of Fees and Costs) (O'Bryan, Dennis)
February 28, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacRury v. American Steamship Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Steamship Company
Represented By: Paul D. Galea
Represented By: Markus Edgars Apelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark MacRury
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?