Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Gabara et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Gary Lumsden, Crystal Parris, Jenna Oliver, Merton Gabara and Tamyra Crittenden
Case Number: 1:2020cv11925
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Patricia T Morris
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend time to file responsive pleadings. Response due by October 8, 2020. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking as Improperly Filed re #13 Stipulation filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. **PLEASE SEE R12 OF THE ECF POLICIES AND PROCEDURES MANUAL ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS** Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION to File Responsive Pleadings by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Rankins, Lauren) Modified on 8/28/2020 (BSau).
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Rankins, Lauren)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Rankins, Lauren)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Rowse-Oberle on behalf of Crystal Parris. (Rowse-Oberle, Karen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Winnifred P. Boylan on behalf of Crystal Parris. (Boylan, Winnifred)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Concannon, Andrew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Concannon, Andrew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew D. Concannon appearing on behalf of Gary Lumsden (Concannon, Andrew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew D. Concannon appearing on behalf of Merton Gabara (Concannon, Andrew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew D. Concannon appearing on behalf of Tamyra Crittenden (Concannon, Andrew)
July 16, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Tamyra Crittenden, Merton Gabara, Gary Lumsden, Jenna Oliver, Crystal Parris* (SKra)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lauren E. Rankins appearing on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Rankins, Lauren)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7930344 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Alpena - County of 1st Defendant: Alpena. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Sebastian, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Gabara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lumsden
Represented By: Andrew D. Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Parris
Represented By: Karen L. Rowse-Oberle
Represented By: Winnifred P. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merton Gabara
Represented By: Andrew D. Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamyra Crittenden
Represented By: Andrew D. Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Sebastian
Represented By: Lauren E. Rankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?