DeSandre et al v. Oscoda, County of et al
Plaintiff: Tina DeSandre and Robert DeSandre
Defendant: Kristi McGregor, Gary Cole, Oscoda, County of, Kevin Grace, Christina L Morse-Bills and Casandra L Morse-Bills
Case Number: 1:2020cv12209
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gary Cole served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (DeRouin, Amy)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Casandra L Morse-Bills served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (DeRouin, Amy)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER For Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Response due by 10/30/2020) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Oscoda, County of served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (DeRouin, Amy)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher J. Raiti appearing on behalf of Gary Cole, Kevin Grace, Kristi McGregor, Casandra L Morse-Bills, Oscoda, County of (Raiti, Christopher)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: G. Gus Morris appearing on behalf of Gary Cole, Kevin Grace, Kristi McGregor, Casandra L Morse-Bills, Oscoda, County of (Morris, G.)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kevin Grace served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (DeRouin, Amy)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kristi McGregor served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Casandra L Morse-Bills* (SKra)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as of Right filed by Tina DeSandre, Robert DeSandre against Casandra L Morse-Bills. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Trainor, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for Casandra L Morse-Bills. (Trainor, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Tina DeSandre, Robert DeSandre with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7991308 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oscoda - County Where Action Arose: Oscoda - County of 1st Defendant: Oscoda. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Trainor, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeSandre et al v. Oscoda, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi McGregor
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Christopher J. Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Cole
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Christopher J. Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscoda, County of
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Christopher J. Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Grace
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Christopher J. Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina L Morse-Bills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casandra L Morse-Bills
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Christopher J. Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina DeSandre
Represented By: Christopher J. Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert DeSandre
Represented By: Christopher J. Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?