Hill v. 1105 Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Oliver Hill
Defendant: 1105 Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv12191
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Defendant's #5 Unopposed Motion to Extend Response Deadline re #1 Complaint. (Response due by 11/28/2021. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Consented) by 1105 Media, Inc.. (Frechette, Donald)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald E. Frechette on behalf of 1105 Media, Inc.. (Frechette, Donald)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 1105 Media, Inc. served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Fraietta, Philip)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *1105 Media, Inc.* (SSch)
September 20, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Oliver Hill against 1105 Media, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8619710 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cheboygan - County Where Action Arose: Cheboygan - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q) (Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. 1105 Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Hill
Represented By: Philip L. Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1105 Media, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E. Frechette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?