Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare v. Dynamo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare
Defendant: Dynamo, LLC, Kulabrands, Inc. and David McPherson
Case Number: 1:2021cv12232
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Patricia T Morris
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Kulabrands Inc. to Respond to #1 Complaint, (Response due by 11/22/2021). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants Dynamo, LLC and David McPherson to Respond to #1 Complaint, (Response due by 11/22/2021). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare proposed Stipulated Order Extending Defendants Dynamo and McPherson's Time to Respond to Complaint (Ruppel, Kimberly)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare proposed Stipulated Order Extending Kulabrands' Time to Respond to Complaint (Ruppel, Kimberly)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Extending Time to Answer #1 Complaint, (Response due by 11/8/2021). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit email dated October 28, 2021) (Ruppel, Kimberly)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute: Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kulabrands, Inc. served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Ruppel, Kimberly)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dynamo, LLC served on 10/6/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Ruppel, Kimberly)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dynamo, LLC served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Ruppel, Kimberly)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. David McPherson served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Ruppel, Kimberly)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Trivax on behalf of Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare. (Trivax, Emma)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly J. Ruppel on behalf of Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare. (Ruppel, Kimberly)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8624867 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: Tennessee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K) (Ruppel, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare v. Dynamo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covenant Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a Covenant Healthcare
Represented By: Emma Trivax
Represented By: Kimberly J. Ruppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kulabrands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?