Troll Smokehouse v. Reich et al
Plaintiff: Troll Smokehouse
Defendant: Reich and Briltran LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv12332
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Mastromarco, Victor)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Vacating #4 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Mastromarco, Victor)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Troll Smokehouse to Show Cause why this Case should not be Dismissed for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2021 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Briltran LLC* (DPer)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Reich* (DPer)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TROLL SMOKEHOUSE, a Michigan Corporation against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8639308 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Bay - County Where Action Arose: Bay - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Mastromarco, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troll Smokehouse v. Reich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troll Smokehouse
Represented By: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briltran LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?