McNeal v. Foundation Radiology Group, PC et al
Plaintiff: Alex McNeal
Defendant: Foundation Radiology Group, PC and Andrea Montgomery Frazier
Case Number: 1:2022cv10645
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [STRICKEN PER ERROR NOTICE] STATEMENT of Plaintiff's Case Management Order by Alex McNeal (Peacock, Emily) Modified on 4/29/2022 (KWin).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error directed to: Emily M. Peacock re #9 Statement. Pursuant to #5 Order to Submit Materials for Case Management Order, Submissions are to be Submitted to CM/ECF (PACER); Utilities; Proposed Orders and Not Filed on the Docket. Filing #5 is Stricken. Please submit to Proposed Orders. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KWin)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit) (Lederman, Ronald)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Lederman, Ronald)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Lederman, Ronald)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Alex McNeal. (Peacock, Emily)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/ECF(PACER); Utilities; Proposed Orders by 4/29/2022. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Reliance Upon Plaintiff's Jury Demand by Foundation Radiology Group, PC, Andrea Montgomery Frazier. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Proof of Service) (McConaghy, Todd)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Foundation Radiology Group, PC, Andrea Montgomery Frazier (McConaghy, Todd)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrea Montgomery Frazier, Foundation Radiology Group, PC from Isabella, case number 20-16661-NH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8848589 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-1 Summons, Complaint, Jury Demand and Affidavit of Merit, #3 Exhibit A-2 Order, #4 Exhibit A-3 First Amended Complaint, Reliance on Jury Demand and Affidavit of Merit, #5 Exhibit B-1 Pennsylvania Business Name History, #6 Exhibit B-2 Maryland Estate Record, #7 Exhibit C Stipulated Order) (McConaghy, Todd)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Foundation Radiology Group, PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex McNeal
Represented By: Emily M. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Radiology Group, PC
Represented By: Todd A. McConaghy
Represented By: Ronald S. Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Montgomery Frazier
Represented By: Todd A. McConaghy
Represented By: Ronald S. Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?