Halasz et al v. Cass City Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Charity Halasz and Thomas Halasz
Defendant: Cass City Public Schools, William Hartzell, Allison Zimba, Donald Markel and Stacey Bliss
Case Number: 1:2022cv13158
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/ECF; Utilities; Proposed Orders by 3/16/2023. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
February 24, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Piper, Kailen)
February 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Mair on behalf of All Defendants. (Mair, Gregory)
February 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kailen C. Piper on behalf of All Defendants. (Piper, Kailen)
January 13, 2023 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Stacey Bliss waiver sent on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/6/2023; Cass City Public Schools waiver sent on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/6/2023; William Hartzell waiver sent on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/6/2023; Donald Markel waiver sent on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/6/2023; Allison Zimba waiver sent on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. (Altman, Keith)
January 3, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Charity Halasz, Thomas Halasz against Stacey Bliss, Cass City Public Schools, William Hartzell, Donald Markel, Allison Zimba with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9178852 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Tuscola - County Where Action Arose: Tuscola - County of 1st Defendant: Tuscola. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Altman, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halasz et al v. Cass City Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Halasz
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Halasz
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass City Public Schools
Represented By: Gregory W. Mair
Represented By: Kailen C. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hartzell
Represented By: Gregory W. Mair
Represented By: Kailen C. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Zimba
Represented By: Gregory W. Mair
Represented By: Kailen C. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Markel
Represented By: Gregory W. Mair
Represented By: Kailen C. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Bliss
Represented By: Gregory W. Mair
Represented By: Kailen C. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?