Tomelleri v. Sunfrog, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Sunfrog, LLC, Merchpong Manufacturing, LLC, Sunfrog Staffing, LLC and Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv10370
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sunfrog Staffing, LLC waiver sent on 3/3/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Slough, William)
March 22, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sunfrog, LLC waiver sent on 3/3/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Slough, William)
March 22, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC waiver sent on 3/3/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Slough, William)
March 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Jurgensen on behalf of All Defendants. (Jurgensen, Andrew)
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. Misterovich on behalf of All Defendants. (Misterovich, Eric)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying Stipulated Order to Adjourn Answer Deadline (Dkt. #5 ). Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KSan)
March 6, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC, Sunfrog Staffing, LLC, Sunfrog, LLC (Jurgensen, Andrew)
March 3, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants (Di Giacomo, John)
March 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Di Giacomo on behalf of All Defendants. (Di Giacomo, John)
February 14, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC, Sunfrog Staffing, LLC, Sunfrog, LLC* (TTho)
February 13, 2023 NOTICE of Error directed to: William P. Slough re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted or incorrect. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
February 13, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
February 13, 2023 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC. Reason: Parties were omitted and incorrectly added to CM/ECF when e-filing Notice of Error, #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Slough, William)
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Slough, William)
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9233674 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: OUT OF STATE - County Where Action Arose: OTSEGO - County of 1st Defendant: OTSEGO. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Slough, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Sunfrog, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: William P. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunfrog, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Jurgensen
Represented By: Eric W. Misterovich
Represented By: John A. Di Giacomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchpong Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunfrog Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Jurgensen
Represented By: Eric W. Misterovich
Represented By: John A. Di Giacomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchpond Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Jurgensen
Represented By: Eric W. Misterovich
Represented By: John A. Di Giacomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?