Woodham v. Decorative Panels International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Woodham
Defendant: Decorative Panels International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10650
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Thomas L Ludington
2 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Thomas L. Ludington to District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (SSch)
April 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Decorative Panels International, Inc. of Motion to Consolidate in Related Action (Sallah, Anthony)
April 25, 2023 Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Sallah, Anthony)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to Utilities; Proposed Orders due by 4/25/2023. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
April 6, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (Defendant's Answer and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint) by Decorative Panels International, Inc.. (Denton, Charles)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying #6 Motion to Adjourn Answer Deadline. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 28, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Decorative Panels International, Inc.. (Sallah, Anthony)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying Stipulation to Adjourn Answer Deadline. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony C. Sallah on behalf of Decorative Panels International, Inc.. (Sallah, Anthony)
March 21, 2023 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Decorative Panels International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AS America, Inc., Other Affiliate Decorative Panels International, Inc. for Decorative Panels International, Inc.. (Denton, Charles)
March 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Denton on behalf of Decorative Panels International, Inc.. (Denton, Charles)
March 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Decorative Panels International, Inc. from Alpena County Circuit Court, case number 2023-0000001983-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9281389 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): E.D. Michigan (USDC), 1:22-cv-12054, Judge Hon. Matthew F. Leitman] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Denton, Charles)
March 21, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodham v. Decorative Panels International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Woodham
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decorative Panels International, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony C. Sallah
Represented By: Charles M. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?