Pattwell v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Paul Pattwell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security, Commissioner of
Interested Party: (Court Use Only) SSA Notification - Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2023cv12468
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Muir on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of. (Muir, Chad)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James R. Rinck appearing on behalf of Paul Pattwell (Rinck, James)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Secure Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 10/16/2023 (SSch)
October 2, 2023 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of New Case Filing to Social Security Administration's Office of the General Counsel and the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Michigan. (SSch)
October 2, 2023 Filing Fee for Civil Case Received by Paul Pattwell. re #1 Complaint,,. (Rodman, Jason)
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Scott Rodman on behalf of Paul Pattwell. (Rodman, Jason)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Paul Pattwell against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action) (Rodman, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pattwell v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Pattwell
Represented By: Jason Scott Rodman
Represented By: James R. Rinck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of
Represented By: Chad Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: (Court Use Only) SSA Notification - Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?