Mick et al v. Bank of America, NA
Plaintiff: Colleen Mick and Walter Mick
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2024cv13360
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Shalina D Kumar
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2025 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 2/13/25 is Cancelled. (THal)
January 24, 2025 Filing 9 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan STATEMENT of Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by All Parties (Baucus, Laura)
January 24, 2025 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Appraisal, #3 Exhibit Parcel Number, #4 Exhibit Payoff Statement) (Baucus, Laura)
January 13, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Colleen Mick, Walter Mick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Remand Exhibits) (Stearn, Ryan)
January 10, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Colleen Mick, Walter Mick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits) (Stearn, Ryan)
January 10, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Colleen Mick, Walter Mick. (Stearn, Ryan)
January 2, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN DEADLINE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2025 09:30 AM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. *READ NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS. (THal)
December 23, 2024 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Baucus, Laura)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, N.A.. (Baucus, Laura)
December 18, 2024 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. from Iosco County Circuit Court, case number 24-4275-CH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10050403 - Fee: $405 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proof of Receipt of Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Appraisal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Baucus, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mick et al v. Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Laura Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Mick
Represented By: Ryan B. Stearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Mick
Represented By: Ryan B. Stearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?