United States of America v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Antonio Nevada Evans, Arthur Yancey, Nakia Batts, Darrell Evans, Deandre Johnson, Raphael A. Robinson, Karl Graham and Michael Bernard Jones
Undetermined: Clarence Fisher, Lamonte, John Doe, Rodney K. Neely, Half and Herbert C. Robinson
Case Number: 2:1995cr81102
Filed: December 21, 1995
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to Clarence Fisher, Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson, Rodney K. Neely, Nakia Batts, Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Karl Graham, Arthur Yancey - Disposition: DENIED the second successive motions; denying motion to remand case [Appeal Case Number 13-1413] (KKra)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to Clarence Fisher, Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson, Rodney K. Neely, Nakia Batts, Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Karl Graham, Arthur Yancey re 325 Notice of Appeal - Disposition: Dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [Appeal Case Number 13-1573] (KKra)
June 27, 2013 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #332 Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability as to Antonio Nevada Evans. Documents mailed to Antonio Nevada Evans Pris. No. 21232-039, United States Penetentiary, P. O. Box 3900, Adelanto, CA 92301-0710. (JCur)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER denying #331 Motion for Certificate of Appealability as to Antonio Nevada Evans (1). Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (JCur)
June 20, 2013 Filing 331 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Antonio Nevada Evans. (See Document 332 for Order Image) (KKra) Modified on 10/1/2018 (LBar).
June 10, 2013 Filing 330 Letter from Antonio Evans regarding appeal fee (DWor)
May 21, 2013 Filing 328 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marcia Silvers re 324 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (KKra)
May 20, 2013 Filing 329 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Antonio Nevada Evans. Mail sent to Marcia J. Silvers re 326 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal (KKra)
May 14, 2013 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #327 Request as to Antonio Nevada Evans, 21232039, United States Penetentiary, P. O. Box 3900, Adelanto, CA 92301 (JCur)
May 3, 2013 Filing 326 Certificate of Service re #325 Notice of Appeal as to Antonio Nevada Evans. (KKra)
May 2, 2013 Filing 327 REQUEST by Antonio Nevada Evans. (KKra)
May 2, 2013 Filing 325 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Antonio Nevada Evans. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. (KKra)
April 30, 2013 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #324 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct as to Antonio Nevada Evans. Documents mailed to Marcia J. Silvers at 2601 S. Bayshore Drive, Ste. 601, Miami, FL 33133. (Grimes, K.)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds Denying #323 Motion For Reconsideration as to Antonio Nevada Evans (1). (Grimes, K.)
April 18, 2013 Filing 323 MOTION to Alter/Amend #320 Order Transferring Case to USCA by Antonio Nevada Evans. (See Document #333 for Order Image) (KKra) Modified on 10/1/2018 (LBar).
April 17, 2013 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #322 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct as to Antonio Nevada Evans, 21232039, United States Penetentiary, P. O. Box 3900, Adelanto, CA 92301. (CHem)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER denying #321 Motion to Amend/Correct as to Antonio Nevada Evans (1). Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CHem)
April 16, 2013 Filing 321 MOTION to Amend/Correct #320 Order Transferring Case to USCA by Antonio Nevada Evans. (See Order 332 for Image) (KKra) Modified on 10/1/2018 (LBar).
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER Transferring Case to USCA for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (KKra)
March 5, 2013 Filing 319 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Antonio Nevada Evans (DWor)
March 1, 2013 Filing 317 NOTICE and Supplement to the Record filed by Antonio Nevada Evans (DWor)
February 26, 2013 Filing 316 MOTION to Alter/or Amend #271 Order, by Antonio Nevada Evans. (DWor)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to Clarence Fisher, Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson, Rodney K. Neely, Nakia Batts, Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Karl Graham, Arthur Yancey re 310 Notice of Appeal - Disposition: Dismissed for want of prosecution [Appeal Case Number 12-2558] (KKra)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Transferring Case to USCA for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (DWor)
January 14, 2013 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Order Transferring Case to Court of Appeals as to Antonio Nevada Evans, 21232039, Federal Correctional Complex,United States Penitentiary, P. O. Box 3900, Adelanto, CA 92301. (CHem)
January 3, 2013 Filing 314 MOTION to Reopen Judgment by Antonio Nevada Evans. (SSch)
January 3, 2013 Filing 313 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Antonio Nevada Evans Mail sent to Antonio Nevada Evans re #312 Order on Motion - Free (DWor)
December 18, 2012 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #312 Order on Motion - Free as to Antonio Nevada Evans, 21232-039, United States Penitentiary, P.O. Box 3900,FCI Complex, Adelanto, CA 92301. (CHem)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER denying 307 Motion for a copy of trial transcripts and limited portions of grand jury transcript as to Antonio Nevada Evans (1). Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CHem)
November 27, 2012 Filing 311 Certificate of Service re #310 Notice of Appeal as to Antonio Nevada Evans. (PMil)
November 26, 2012 Filing 310 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Antonio Nevada Evans re #306 Order on Motion for Order. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. (PMil)
November 19, 2012 Filing 309 NOTICE of Intent to Re-Open Section 2255 Proceedings by Antonio Nevada Evans (PMil)
November 19, 2012 Filing 308 DECLARATION of Antonio Evans as to Antonio Nevada Evans (PMil)
November 19, 2012 Filing 307 MOTION for a Copy of Trial Transcripts and Limited Portions of Grand Jury Transcript by Antonio Nevada Evans. (PMil)
November 9, 2012 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #306 Order Denying Motion for Order as to Antonio Nevada Evans, # 21232-039, U.S. P Victorville, Federal Correctional Complex,P.O. Box 3900, Adelanto, CA 92301. (CHem)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER denying 305 Motion for Order as to Antonio Nevada Evans (1). Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CHem)
October 22, 2012 Filing 305 MOTION for Order amending judgment by Antonio Nevada Evans. (DWor)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER Granting Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release as to Michael Bernard Jones Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CHem)
February 9, 2011 Filing 303 EXHIBIT re #302 Renewed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Supervised Release by Michael Bernard Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Picker, Marc)
September 22, 2010 Filing 302 Renewed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Supervised Release by Michael Bernard Jones. (Picker, Marc)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER denying #300 Motion for termination from supervised release as to Michael Bernard Jones (2). Signed by District Judge Nancy G Edmunds. (CHem)
April 8, 2009 Filing 300 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Supervised Release by Michael Bernard Jones as to Clarence Fisher, Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson, Rodney K. Neely, Nakia Batts, Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Karl Graham, Arthur Yancey. (Picker, Marc)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER with Request Modifying Terms of Supervised Release as to Michael Bernard Jones. Signed by Honorable Nancy G Edmunds (SMar)
July 26, 2006 Filing 298 Certified Appeal Order as to Michael Bernard Jones, request seeking permission to file a second 2255 motion in the district court is denied. [Case No 05-2623]. (CGre, )
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER Transferring Case to USCA for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by Honorable Nancy G Edmunds. (CHem, )
September 16, 2005 Filing 296 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc P. Picker appearing for Michael Bernard Jones. (NHoll, )
September 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Requiring Response to #294 Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Michael Bernard Jones. Response due: 10/28/2005, Reply due 11/30/ 2005. Signed by Honorable Nancy G Edmunds. (CHem, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 294 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 ( Civil Action 05-71630.) by Michael Bernard Jones. (DHame, )
June 24, 2003 Filing 293 NOTICE as to Clarence Fisher of transfer of jurisdiction of probationer to Northern District of Ohio (cm)
June 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Clarence Fisher, transfer of jurisdiction of probationer [EOD Date 6/24/03] (cm)
April 25, 2003 Filing 291 RECORD of appeal record [277-1] returned from USCA - appeal case #01-1736 as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (kg) (PMil).
April 22, 2003 Filing 290 MANDATE from USCA affirming the decision of the District Court - appeal case # 01-1736 as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (nh)
April 21, 2003 SUPERVISED release hearing held and continued as to defendant Clarence Fisher- defendant admitted guilt to each violation, hearing suspended without date for Clarence Fisher - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (ch)
March 31, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Clarence Fisher, with financial affidavit attached (nh)
March 25, 2003 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds setting supervised release violation hearing for 11:00 4/21/03 for Clarence Fisher (ch)
March 24, 2003 Filing 288 SUMMONS for TSR Violation Petition returned executed by U.S. Probation on 3/5/03 as to defendant Clarence Fisher (nh) (PMil).
February 25, 2003 Filing 287 NON-CERTIFIED copy of order as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans from USCA affirming the decision of the District Court - appeal case #01-1736 (kg)
February 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 286 PETITION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds for issuance of summons as to defendant Clarence Fisher for violation of supervised release (kg) (PMil).
November 13, 2001 Filing 285 NON-CERTIFIED copy of order as to Michael Bernard Jones from USCA denying case [0-0] - appeal case # 01-1906 (lg) (PMil).
October 4, 2001 Filing 284 MANDATE from USCA dismissing appeal - appeal case # 01-1787 as to Antonio Nevada Evans (LS) (PMil).
August 13, 2001 Filing 283 NON-CERTIFIED copy of order as to Antonio Nevada Evans from USCA dismissing appeal case # 01-1787 (cm) (PMil).
June 25, 2001 Filing 282 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans from USCA of receipt of appeal notice of appeal & docket [280-1] - appeal case # 01-1736 (dh) (PMil).
June 25, 2001 Filing 281 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT from USCA of receipt of appeal notice by Antonio Nevada Evans [278-1] - appeal case # 01-1787 (dp) (PMil).
June 15, 2001 Filing 280 CERTIFIED copy of appeal notice by Antonio Nevada Evans [278-1] and docket transmitted to USCA (do) (PMil).
June 15, 2001 Filing 279 PROOF of mailing as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans of notice of appeal to USCA and counsel of record (do) (PMil).
June 13, 2001 Filing 278 APPEAL by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans of order [275-1] to USCA with proof of service - FEE: PAID - Receipt #: 419699 (do) (PMil).
June 13, 2001 Filing 277 RECORD of appeal notice by Antonio Nevada Evans [272-1] consisting of 1 volume(s) of pleadings transmitted to USCA - appeal case # 01-1736 (dp) (PMil).
June 12, 2001 Filing 276 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT from USCA of receipt of appeal notice by Antonio Nevada Evans [272-1] - appeal case # 01-1736 (dp) (PMil).
June 6, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans denying certificate of appealability; with proof of mailing [EOD Date 6/12/01] (dp) (PMil).
May 30, 2001 Filing 274 CERTIFIED copy of appeal notice by Antonio Nevada Evans [272-1] and docket transmitted to USCA (do) (PMil).
May 30, 2001 Filing 273 PROOF of mailing as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans of notice of appeal to USCA and counsel of record (do) (PMil).
May 25, 2001 Filing 272 APPEAL by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans of orders [271-1] and [270-1] to USCA with proof of service - FEE: PAID - Receipt #: 418704 (do) (PMil).
May 15, 2001 Filing 271 JUDGMENT by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds dismissing motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Antonio Nevada Evans [261-1] and dismissing motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Antonio Nevada Evans [259-1] with proof of mailing. (civil #00-73579) (cf) (PMil).
May 9, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM opinion and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Antonio Nevada Evans denying motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Antonio Nevada Evans [261-1], denying motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Antonio Nevada Evans [259-1] [EOD Date: 5/12/01] (lg) (PMil).
April 16, 2001 Filing 269 SUPPLEMENTAL (notice of supplemental authority) by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans in support of motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Antonio Nevada Evans [261-1] with proof of mailing. (cf) (PMil).
October 25, 2000 Filing 268 REPLY by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans to response to motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 [261-1] with proof of mailing (kg) (PMil).
October 18, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans granting motion to file reply memorandum in response to government's response and brief to petitioner's motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 on or before 10/25/00 by Antonio Nevada Evans [266-1] and setting deadline for reply to response to motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Antonio Nevada Evans [261-1] for 10/25/00 ; with proof of mailing [EOD Date 10/19/00] (dp) (PMil).
October 12, 2000 Filing 266 MOTION by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans to file reply memorandum in response to government's response and brief to petitioner's motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 on or before 10/25/00 with proof of mailing (dp) (PMil).
October 4, 2000 Filing 265 RESPONSE by USA to motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Antonio Nevada Evans [261-1] with brief and proof of mailing (cm) (DTyl).
September 14, 2000 Filing 264 COPY of order [262-1] mailed to Clarence Fisher and returned as undeliverable (lg) (PMil).
September 14, 2000 Filing 263 LETTER by plaintiff USA, regarding motion for reduction of sentence by defendant Clarence Fisher (nh) (PMil).
September 14, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Clarence Fisher denying motion for reduction of sentence by Clarence Fisher [258-1] with proof of mailing [EOD Date 9/24/00] (nh) (PMil).
August 29, 2000 Filing 261 MOTION by Antonio Nevada Evans as to Antonio Nevada Evans to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 with proof of mailing (lg) (DTyl).
August 18, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Antonio Nevada Evans, setting deadline for response to motion to vacate sentence [259-1] for 10/2/00 , and setting deadline for reply to response to motion to vacate for 11/2/00 with proof of mailing [EOD Date 8/21/00] (cm) (DTyl).
August 8, 2000 Filing 259 MOTION by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 with memorandum, attachment, and proof of mailing. (PP)
July 18, 2000 Filing 258 MOTION by defendant Clarence Fisher for reduction of sentence (dp) (DTyl).
April 17, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 257 REQUEST and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds modifying terms of supervised release as to Raphael A. Robinson (lg) (DTyl).
October 25, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones denying motion for certificate of appealability [255-1]; with proof of mailing [EOD Date 10/27/99] (dp) (DTyl).
October 8, 1999 Filing 255 MOTION by defendant Michael Bernard Jones for certificate of appealability with proof of mailing (LS) (DTyl).
September 15, 1999 Filing 254 RECORD of appeal record [245-1] returned from USCA - appeal case #98-1396 as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (kg) (DTyl).
September 3, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones granting motion to dismiss motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence by USA [250-1], dismissing motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Michael Bernard Jones [247-1] petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel is denied as moot (motion not on docket), with proof of mailing [EOD Date 9/7/99] (dh) (DTyl).
August 13, 1999 Filing 252 MANDATE from USCA affirming the decision of the District Court - appeal case # 98-1396 (as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans) (dp) (DTyl).
August 9, 1999 Filing 251 REPLY by defendant Michael Bernard Jones to response to motion to vacate sentence [247-1] with proof of mailing (dp) (DTyl).
July 29, 1999 Filing 250 MOTION by USA as to Michael Bernard Jones to dismiss motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence with brief, exhibit and proof of mailing (lg) (DTyl).
July 26, 1999 Filing 249 COPY of notice of filing motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by Michael Bernard Jones [247-1] mailed to Michael Bernard Jones and returned as undeliverable (LS) (DTyl).
July 21, 1999 Filing 248 NON-CERTIFIED copy of order as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans from USCA affirming the decision of the District Court - appeal case # 98-1396 (kg) (DTyl).
July 13, 1999 Filing 247 MOTION by defendant Michael Bernard Jones to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 with brief, attachment, proof of mailing (dh) (DTyl).
April 5, 1999 Filing 246 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to pay Stephen T. Rabaut attorney for defendant Antonio Nevada Evans Voucher # 0417123 - supplemental voucher for sentencing proceedings (lg) Modified on 04/22/1999 (DTyl).
August 5, 1998 Filing 245 RECORD of appeal [230-1] consisting of: 1 volume(s) of pleadings 6 transcript(s) 0 deposition(s) transmitted to USCA as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans - appeal case # 98-1396 (dh) (DTyl).
June 26, 1998 Filing 244 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and voucher for payment of transcript for defendant Antonio Nevada Evans Voucher # 3980968438 (RH) (DTyl).
June 3, 1998 Filing 243 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and voucher for payment of transcript for defendant Antonio Nevada Evans Voucher # 3980967969 (lg) (DTyl).
June 3, 1998 Filing 242 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and voucher for payment of transcript for defendant Antonio Nevada Evans Voucher # 3980967970 (lg) (DTyl).
June 1, 1998 Filing 241 TRANSCRIPT as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans taken on 3/20/98 of motion and guilty plea (lg) (DTyl).
May 26, 1998 Filing 240 TRANSCRIPT as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans taken on 2/5/97 of jury trial - Vol. 5 (kg) (DTyl).
May 26, 1998 Filing 239 TRANSCRIPT as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans taken on 2/4/97 of jury trial - Vol. 4 (kg) (DTyl).
May 26, 1998 Filing 238 TRANSCRIPT as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans taken on 2/3/97 of jury trial - Vol. 3 (kg) (DTyl).
May 26, 1998 Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans taken on 1/31/97 of jury trial - Vol. 2 (kg) (DTyl).
May 26, 1998 Filing 236 TRANSCRIPT as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans taken on 1/30/97 of jury trial - Vol. 1 (kg) (DTyl).
May 6, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, for temporary detention pending hearing (lg) (DTyl).
April 13, 1998 Filing 234 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT from USCA of receipt of appeal notice by Antonio Nevada Evans [228-1] - appeal case # 98-1396 (kg) Modified on 05/05/1998 (DTyl).
April 6, 1998 Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT order form by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans regarding appeal notice by Antonio Nevada Evans [228-1] requesting transcript(s) of: 1/30,31; 2/3-5, 1997 and 3/20/98 (RH) Modified on 05/05/1998 (DTyl).
April 6, 1998 Filing 232 MOTION by plaintiff USA as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans to dismiss original indictment (RH) Modified on 05/05/1998
April 3, 1998 Filing 231 AUTHORIZATION, with attachments, by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to pay Stephen T. Rabaut attorney for defendant Antonio Nevada Evans - Voucher # 0417123. (cf) (DTyl).
April 2, 1998 Filing 230 CERTIFIED copy of appeal notice by Antonio Nevada Evans [228-1] and docket transmitted to USCA (do) (DTyl).
April 2, 1998 Filing 229 PROOF of mailing of notice of appeal to USCA, Stephen Rabaut, Ross Parker, Patricia Blake, Suzanne Jacques and U.S. Probation (do) (DTyl).
March 27, 1998 Filing 228 APPEAL by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans of order sentencing Antonio Nevada Evans (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 5s [227-1] to USCA - FEE: NO FEE PAID (do) (DTyl).
March 20, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 227 JUDGMENT and commitment order entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing Antonio Nevada Evans (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 5s , dismissing Antonio Nevada Evans (1) count(s) 7s , acquitting Antonio Nevada Evans (1) count(s) 4s, 8s , disposing of count(s) as to Antonio Nevada Evans (1) count(s) cmp, 1, 2, 4 (dp)
March 20, 1998 SENTENCING held as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - D/Atty: Stephen Rabault - AUSA: Ross Parker - Court Reporter: Ron DiBartolomeo (ch)
March 17, 1998 Filing 226 RESPONSE by USA as to motion to set aside conviction by Antonio Nevada Evans [225-1] (dh) Modified on 05/05/1998 (DTyl).
March 16, 1998 Filing 225 MOTION by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans to set aside conviction with brief, notice of hearing and proof of mailing (lg) (DTyl).
March 9, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, setting sentencing date (kg) (DTyl).
March 9, 1998 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans sentencing set for 10:30 3/20/98 for Antonio Nevada Evans (ch)
November 19, 1997 Filing 223 WARRANT for arrest returned executed by FBI on 2/9/96 as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (lg) (DTyl).
November 14, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 222 AMENDED judgment commitment order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson (LB) (DTyl).
November 13, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MOTION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson, to reduce sentence by 67 days (LB) (DTyl).
October 6, 1997 Filing 220 JUDGMENT and commitment order returned as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson (LS) (DTyl).
October 6, 1997 Filing 219 JUDGMENT and commitment order returned as to defendant Karl Graham (LS) (DTyl).
September 2, 1997 Filing 218 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to pay Michelene T. Sager attorney for defendant Raphael A. Robinson # 0445558 (LS) (DTyl).
August 21, 1997 Filing 217 JUDGMENT and commitment order returned as to defendant Clarence Fisher (LS) (DTyl).
August 19, 1997 Filing 216 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to pay Robert J. Lech attorney for defendant Karl Graham Voucher # 0416502 (LS) (DTyl).
July 17, 1997 Filing 215 WARRANT for arrest returned unexecuted as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson (LS) (DTyl).
July 10, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham extending report date to 9/11/97. (LS) (DTyl).
July 10, 1997 Filing 212 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to pay Francisco J. Villarruel attorney for defendant Clarence Fisher Voucher # 0625990 (LS) (DTyl).
July 9, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 214 STIPULATION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones, amending judgment to reflect the guideline recommendations of probation (LS) (DTyl).
June 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 211 JUDGMENT and commitment order entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing Raphael A. Robinson (6) count 1 (LB) (DTyl).
June 5, 1997 Filing 210 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and voucher for payment of transcript for defendant Michael Bernard Jones Voucher # 3970961606 (LB) (DTyl).
June 5, 1997 SENTENCING held as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - D/Atty: Michelene Sager - AUSA: Ross Parker - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
May 21, 1997 Filing 208 JUDGMENT and commitment order returned as to defendant Nakia Batts - self surrender by defendant. (cf) (DTyl).
May 20, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 209 JUDGMENT and commitment order entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds dismissing Clarence Fisher (9) count(s) 1, 5-6 , sentencing Clarence Fisher (9) count(s) 7 . (time stamped 5/21/97) (cf) (DTyl).
May 20, 1997 Filing 207 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and voucher for payment of transcript to Suzanne Jacques for defendant Raphael A. Robinson. (cf) (DTyl).
May 20, 1997 SENTENCING held as to defendant Clarence Fisher - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - D/Atty: Francisco Villarruel - AUSA: Ross Parker - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
May 12, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION and order by Magistrate Judge Thomas A. Carlson for warrant and for forfeiture of bond as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson , w/i. (LS) (DTyl).
April 29, 1997 Filing 204 APPOINTMENT for defendant Karl Graham of attorney Robert J. Lech - Voucher # 0416502 (Replaces voucher # 0417390 filed on 12/11/95) (MM) (DTyl).
April 16, 1997 Filing 202 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to pay James C. Thomas attorney for defendant Michael Bernard Jones # 417389 (kg) (DTyl).
April 15, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 203 JUDGMENT and commitment order entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing Arthur Yancey (3) on count 1s and disposing of count 1 (pd) (DTyl).
April 15, 1997 SENTENCING held as to defendant Arthur Yancey - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - D/Atty: Gabi Silver - AUSA: Ross Parker - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
April 14, 1997 Filing 201 SEALED matter by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (kg) (DTyl).
April 8, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 200 JUDGMENT and commitment order entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds disposing of count(s) as to Karl Graham (4) count(s) 1 , sentencing Karl Graham (4) count(s) 1s . (time stamped 4/9/97) (cf) Modified on 04/10/1997 (DTyl).
April 8, 1997 Filing 199 SEALED matter by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham placed in the vault. (cf) (DTyl).
April 8, 1997 SENTENCING held as to defendant Karl Graham - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - D/Atty: Robert Lech - AUSA: Ross Parker - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
March 31, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham, for travel expenses (LS) Modified on 04/01/1997
March 31, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey for travel, lodging and subsistence expenses (LS) (DTyl).
March 21, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION and order by Judge Paul D. Borman rescheduling report date for defendant Nakia Batts to 4/11/97 at 2:00 (LB) (DTyl).
March 12, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey, for travel, lodging and subsistence expenses (LB) (DTyl).
March 3, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey, for travel, lodging and subsistence expenses (lg) (DTyl).
February 24, 1997 Filing 193 APPOINTMENT for defendant Clarence Fisher of attorney, Francisco Villarruel, in place of attorney Federal Defender's Office for Clarence Fisher - Voucher # 0625990. (cf) (DTyl).
February 11, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 192 AMENDED judgment commitment order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones. (NOTE: The only amendment is on page 4 of the judgment, "statement of reasons", "fine range" amounts now read "$15,000 to $4,000,000".) (cf) (DTyl).
February 6, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, granting defendant's oral motion for judgment of acquittal on count seven (lg) (DTyl).
February 6, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham, for travel expenses (lg) (DTyl).
February 6, 1997 Filing 189 VERDICT form as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (lg) (DTyl).
February 5, 1997 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans sentencing set for 2:30 5/20/97 (jz)
February 5, 1997 JURY verdict, of guilty entered as to Antonio Nevada Evans (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 5s , of not guilty entered as to Antonio Nevada Evans (1) count(s) 4s, 8s the Court dismisses Count 7s - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
February 5, 1997 CRIMINAL jury trial held, closing arguments heard, Court instructs the jury. Jury deliberates and reaches verdicts, trial concluded - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
February 4, 1997 CRIMINAL jury trial held and continued to 9:00 2/5/97 for Antonio Nevada Evans - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
February 3, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to dismiss counts as to Michael Bernard Jones (2) count(s) 1, 3 and 3s (pd) (DTyl).
February 3, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 187 JUDGMENT and commitment order entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing Michael Bernard Jones (2) count(s) 1s , dismissing Michael Bernard Jones (2) count(s) 3s (lg) (DTyl).
February 3, 1997 SENTENCING held as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
February 3, 1997 CRIMINAL jury trial held and continued to 9:00 2/4/97 for Antonio Nevada Evans - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 31, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Antonio Nevada Evans, and Clarence Fisher, that the superseding indictment be amended with respect to the names of defendant No. 1 and No. 9 (lg) (DTyl).
January 31, 1997 CRIMINAL jury trial held and continued to 9:30 2/3/97 for Antonio Nevada Evans - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 30, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 186 JUDGMENT and commitment order entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing Herbert C. Robinson (7) on count 1s and dismissing count 1 (pd) Modified on 02/05/1997 (DTyl).
January 30, 1997 SENTENCING held as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson - Rule 11 Plea agreement accepted and entered - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 30, 1997 CRIMINAL jury trial held and continued to 9:00 1/31/97 for Antonio Nevada Evans - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 29, 1997 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Clarence Fisher sentencing set for 2:30 5/20/97 for Clarence Fisher (jz)
January 28, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 184 JUDGMENT and commitment order entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing Nakia Batts (5) on count 1s and dismissing count 1 (pd) (DTyl).
January 28, 1997 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Nakia Batts on government's oral motion for downward departure - disposition: granted - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 28, 1997 SENTENCING held as to defendant Nakia Batts - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 28, 1997 CRIMINAL jury trial begun and continued to 9:00 1/30/97 for Antonio Nevada Evans - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 28, 1997 JURY sworn before Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 28, 1997 VOIR DIRE held as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans before Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 27, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones, for travel, lodging and subsistence expenses (LS) (DTyl).
January 27, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION by the USA and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Antonio Nevada Evans, Clarence Fisher permitting firearm in the courthouse as an exhibit (LS) (DTyl).
January 23, 1997 PLEA held as to defendant Clarence Fisher, plea of guilty by Clarence Fisher (9) count(s) 7 , Rule 11 Plea Agreement taken under advisement defendant Clarence Fisher referred to probation , set unsecured bond in the amount of $50,000 with conditions - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (jz)
January 23, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts, for noncustodial round-trip airfare from California to Detroit and for overnight lodging (LS) (DTyl).
January 23, 1997 Filing 180 RULE 11 plea agreement by defendant Clarence Fisher (LS) (DTyl).
January 23, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Clarence Fisher, setting unsecured bond in the amount of $50,000.00 with conditions (LS) (DTyl).
January 21, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Clarence Fisher denying motion for order requiring the prosecution to disclose its intention to use other crimes, wrongs or acts evidence by Clarence Fisher [170-1], denying motion for disclosure of statments made by the defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 by Clarence Fisher [172-1], denying motion for disclosure of statments made by co-conspirators imputable to defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 by Clarence Fisher [171-1], with proof of mailing. (PP) (DTyl).
January 21, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones, for travel, lodging and subsistence expenses from San Bernardino, California to Detroit on 1/27/97 and for return from Detroi to San Bernardino, California (PP) (DTyl).
January 15, 1997 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Clarence Fisher on motion for order requiring the prosecution to disclose its intention to use other crimes [170-1], motion for disclosure of statments made by the defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 [172-1], and motion for disclosure of statments made by co-conspirators imputable to defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 [171-1] - disposition: MOTIONS DENIED - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (MM)
January 7, 1997 STATUS conference held as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (MM)
December 26, 1996 Filing 176 RESPONSE by plaintiff USA to motion for order requiring the prosecution to disclose its intention to use other crimes, wrongs or acts evidence by Clarence Fisher [170-1], motion for disclosure of statments made by the defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 by Clarence Fisher [172-1], motion for disclosure of statments made by co-conspirators imputable to defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 by Clarence Fisher [171-1] with brief and proof of mailing. (cf) (DTyl).
December 17, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 175 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Komives and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Clarence Fisher (kg) (DTyl).
December 16, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Clarence Fisher hearing on motion for order requiring the prosecution to disclose its intention to use other crimes, [170-1], motion for disclosure of statments made by the defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 [172-1] , and motion for disclosure of statments made by co-conspirators imputable [171-1] set for 2:00 1/15/97 (MM)
December 16, 1996 Filing 174 NOTICE by court of hearing on motion for order requiring the prosecution to disclose its intention to use other crimes, wrongs or acts evidence by Clarence Fisher [170-1], motion for disclosure of statments made by the defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 by Clarence Fisher [172-1], motion for disclosure of statments made by co-conspirators imputable to defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 by Clarence Fisher [171-1] (kg) (DTyl).
December 13, 1996 Filing 170 MOTION and brief by defendant Clarence Fisher for order requiring the prosecution to disclose its intention to use other crimes, wrongs or acts evidence (kg) (DTyl).
December 13, 1996 Filing 173 PROOF of mailing as to defendant Clarence Fisher of motions (kg) (DTyl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2017: #1 Document Continuation) (DTyl).
December 13, 1996 Filing 172 MOTION by defendant Clarence Fisher for disclosure of statments made by the defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 with brief (kg) (DTyl).
December 13, 1996 Filing 171 MOTION by defendant Clarence Fisher for disclosure of statments made by co-conspirators imputable to defendant sought to be introduced under FRE 801 with brief (kg) (DTyl).
December 3, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Clarence Fisher deadline for filing motions set for 12/30/96 (MM)
December 3, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey, for travel, lodging and subsistence expenses (lg) (DTyl).
December 3, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Clarence Fisher, allowing extension of motion cut-off date (lg) (DTyl).
November 21, 1996 PRETRIAL conference held as to defendant Clarence Fisher - Magistrate Judge Paul J. Komives (kd)
November 20, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, defendant Clarence Fisher criminal jury trial set for 9:00 1/21/97 (MM)
November 20, 1996 Filing 167 NOTICE by the Court as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, defendant Clarence Fisher of criminal jury trial (RH) (DTyl).
November 20, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson, appointing a psychiatric examiner at Court expense (RH) (DTyl).
November 19, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan as to defendant Clarence Fisher, for detention pending trial (RH) (DTyl).
November 19, 1996 Filing 165 APPEARANCE for defendant Clarence Fisher of attorney Francisco Villarruel (RH) (DTyl).
November 19, 1996 Filing 164 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Clarence Fisher and defense counsel Francisco J. Villarruel of indictment (RH) (DTyl).
November 19, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan as to defendant John Doe pretrial conference set for 9:30 11/21/96 for John Doe (ch)
November 19, 1996 DETENTION hearing held as to defendant John Doe Disposition: bond denied - Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan D/Atty: Francisco Villaruel AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: VM-1366 (ch)
November 19, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT concluded as to defendant John Doe, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan - D/Atty: Francisco Villaruel - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape #: VM-1366 (ch)
November 18, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Clarence Fisher (RH) (DTyl).
November 18, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe as to defendant Clarence Fisher, for temporary detention (RH) (DTyl).
November 18, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT adjourned as to defendant John Doe to 1:00 11/19/96 - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe - D/Atty: David Tholen - AUSA: E. James King - Tape #: Duty Call 11/18/96 (ml)
November 18, 1996 INITIAL appearance by defendant John Doe (9) count(s) 1, 5-7 before Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe, detention hearing set for 1:00 11/19/96 - D/Atty: David Tholen - AUSA: E. James King - Tape # Duty Call 11/18/96 (ml)
November 5, 1996 Filing 160 RECORD received from Northern District of Ohio at Cleveland as to defendant John Doe a/k/a Clarence Lamont Fisher. (LS) (DTyl).
October 30, 1996 Filing 159 AUTHORIZATION by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to pay Stephen T. Rabaut attorney for defendant Rodney K. Neely Voucher # 0445557 (RH) Modified on 2/2/2017 (DTyl). (DTyl).
October 29, 1996 Filing 158 APPOINTMENT for defendant Antonio Nevada Evans of attorney Stephen T. Rabaut in place of attorney Federal Defender's Office for Antonio Nevada Evans Voucher # 0417123 (RH) (DTyl).
October 23, 1996 MINUTE SHEET of proceedings before Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - as to Antonio Evans to determine if defendant has retained new counsel- Disposition: Court appoints FDO; trial adjourned without date - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (MM)
October 23, 1996 attorney Steven F. Fishman for Antonio Nevada Evans terminated as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (PP)
October 23, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, with financial affidavit attached (PP) (DTyl).
October 18, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Rodney K. Neely, dismissing indictment count(s) 1 (lg) (DTyl).
October 16, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting motion to withdraw by Steven F. Fishman as attorney for Antonio Nevada Evans by Steven F. Fishman [149-1] (kg) (DTyl).
October 11, 1996 PLEA held, plea of guilty by Herbert C. Robinson (7) count(s) 1s - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Joan Morgan (pd)
October 11, 1996 Filing 154 SECOND SUPERSEDING information against Herbert C. Robinson (7) count(s) 1s (lg) Modified on 02/05/1997 (DTyl).
October 11, 1996 Filing 153 RULE 11 plea agreement by defendant Herbert C. Robinson with attachments. (cf) Modified on 02/05/1997 (DTyl).
October 11, 1996 Filing 152 WAIVER of indictment by defendant Herbert C. Robinson and attorney (cf) Modified on 02/05/1997 (DTyl).
October 11, 1996 PLEA held as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson, plea of guilty by Raphael A. Robinson (6) count(s) 1 , defendant referred to probation - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Joan Morgan (MM)
October 11, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson sentencing set for 2:00 1/28/97 (MM)
October 11, 1996 Filing 151 RULE 11 plea agreement by defendant Raphael A. Robinson (RH) (DTyl).
October 9, 1996 Filing 150 RULE 11 plea agreement by Arthur Yancey (lg) (DTyl).
October 9, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans criminal jury trial set for 9:00 10/29/96 (MM)
October 9, 1996 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans on motion to withdraw by Steven F. Fishman [149-1] - disposition: GRANTED - defendant waives right to sppedy trial - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Denise Mosby (MM)
October 8, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey sentencing set for 2:00 1/9/97 (MM)
October 8, 1996 PLEA held as to defendant Arthur Yancey, plea of guilty by Arthur Yancey (3) count(s) 1s , bond continued - defendant referred to probation - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (MM)
October 7, 1996 Filing 149 MOTION as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans to withdraw by Steven F. Fishman as attorney for Antonio Nevada Evans with brief, notice of hearing, and proof of mailing. (PP) (DTyl).
September 30, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey, for travel from Riverside, CA. to Detroit, MI for plea and back to Riverside, CA (kg) (DTyl).
September 3, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham, for travel expenses (sh) (DTyl).
August 23, 1996 Filing 146 WARRANT for arrest returned executed by Marshal on 2/9/96 as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (LS) (DTyl).
August 15, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing set for 2:00 1/9/97 for Nakia Batts (Mm)
August 15, 1996 PLEA held as to defendant Nakia Batts, plea of guilty by Nakia Batts (5) count(s) 1s , defendant referred to probation - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: S. Jacques (Mm)
August 15, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing set for 2:00 1/9/97 for Karl Graham (Mm)
August 15, 1996 PLEA held as to defendant Karl Graham, plea of guilty by Karl Graham (4) count(s) 1s , defendant referred to probation - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: S. Jacques (Mm)
August 15, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds sentencing set for 2:00 1/9/97 for Michael Bernard Jones (Mm)
August 15, 1996 PLEA held as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones, plea of guilty count(s) 1s , df defendant referred to probation - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: S. Jacques (Mm)
August 15, 1996 Filing 145 RULE 11 plea agreement by defendant Nakia Batts (kg) (DTyl).
August 15, 1996 Filing 144 RULE 11 plea agreement by defendant Karl Graham (kg) (DTyl).
August 15, 1996 Filing 143 RULE 11 plea agreement by defendant Michael Bernard Jones (kg) (DTyl).
August 12, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham for the Marshal to provide transportation expenses from California to Detroit. (LS) (DTyl).
August 12, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones for the Marshal to provide transportation, lodging ans subsistence expenses from California to Detroit. (LS) (DTyl).
August 12, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts for the Marshal to provide round trip airfare from California to Detroit (LS) (DTyl).
August 9, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey for travel, lodging and subsistence expenses (LS) (DTyl).
June 26, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds denying motion to reveal informant's identity by Raphael A. Robinson [121-1], denying motion for bill of particulars by Raphael A. Robinson [120-1], denying motion to suppress evidence by Raphael A. Robinson [119-1] with proof of mailing. (LS) (DTyl).
June 25, 1996 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson on motion to reveal informant's identity [121-1], motion for bill of particulars [120-1], motion to suppress evidence [119-1] - disposition: ALL MOTIONS DENIED - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (MM)
June 21, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting motion to sever defendants Arthur Yancey and Karl Graham by USA [111-1] with proof of mailing. (LS) (DTyl).
June 19, 1996 MOTION hearing held on motion to sever defendants Arthur Yancey and Karl Graham by USA [111-1] - disposition: GRANTED - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (MM)
June 13, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey, for defendant to travel from Riverside, California to Detroit, Michigan (RH) (DTyl).
June 10, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts the US Marshal provide defenant nonocustodial reound-trip fare from Riverside, California to Detroit, Michigan (RH) (DTyl).
May 31, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION by defendant Karl Graham and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham, for travel expenses . (cf) (DTyl).
May 30, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones for travel, lodging and subsistence expenses. (cf) (DTyl).
May 28, 1996 Filing 132 RE-NOTICE by defendant Arthur Yancey as to defendant Arthur Yancey of hearing on motion to reveal informant's identity or to produce informant for in camera examination by A. Robinson [121-1], motion for bill of particulars by Raphael A. Robinson [120-1], motion to suppress evidence by Raphael A. Robinson [119-1], motion motion for evidentiary hearing by Raphael A. Robinson [119-2] with proof of mailing. (PP) (DTyl).
May 22, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson hearing on motion to reveal informant's identity [121-1], motion for bill of particulars [120-1] , and motion to suppress evidence [119-1] set for 1:00 6/25/96 (MM)
May 22, 1996 Filing 131 NOTICE by the Court of hearing on motion to suppress evidence by Raphael A. Robinson [119-1] (RH) (DTyl).
May 22, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts, allowing deletion of address and anmes from exhibit attached to motion to adjourn trial (RH) (DTyl).
May 21, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham, for travel expenses from Michigan to Riverside California (RH) (DTyl).
May 16, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts, for noncustodial round-trip fare from Riverside, CA to Detroit, MI for purpose of motion hearing (kg) (DTyl).
May 15, 1996 Filing 127 RESPONSE by USA to motion for bill of particulars by Raphael A. Robinson [120-1] with brief and proof of mailing (kg) (DTyl).
May 15, 1996 Filing 126 RESPONSE by USA to motion to suppress evidence by Raphael A. Robinson [119-1] with brief and proof of mailing (kg) (DTyl).
May 15, 1996 Filing 125 RESPONSE by USA to motion to reveal informant's identity or to produce informant for in camera examination by Raphael Robinson [121-1] with brief and proof of mailing (kg) (DTyl).
May 14, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds criminal jury trial set for 9:00 10/15/96 for Antonio Nevada Evans, for Michael Bernard Jones, for Arthur Yancey, for Karl Graham, for Nakia Batts, for Raphael A. Robinson, for Herbert C. Robinson, for Rodney K. Neely (MM)
May 14, 1996 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, defendant Michael Bernard Jones, defendant Arthur Yancey, defendant Karl Graham, defendant Nakia Batts, defendant Raphael A. Robinson, defendant Herbert C. Robinson, defendant Rodney K. Neely on motion to adjourn trial by Nakia Batts [115-1] - disposition: GRANTED - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques (MM)
May 13, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson granting motion to adjourn trial by Nakia Batts [115-1], with proof of mailing. (PP) (DTyl).
May 9, 1996 Filing 123 MOTION by defendant Michael Bernard Jones for joinder in motion to adjourn trial by Nakia Batts (D-5) [115-1] with attachments and proof of mailing. (no brief) (cf) (DTyl).
May 8, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson hearing on motion to reveal informant's identity or to produce informant for in camera examination [121-1], motion for bill of particulars [120-1] , motion to suppress evidence [119-1] , and motion for evidentiary hearing [119-2] set for 10:00 5/20/96 (MM)
May 8, 1996 Filing 122 NOTICE as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson of hearing on motion to reveal informant's identity or to produce informant for in camera examination by Raphael A. Robinson [121-1], motion for bill of particulars by Raphael A. Robinson [120-1], motion to suppress evidence by Raphael A. Robinson [119-1], motion motion for evidentiary hearing by Raphael A. Robinson [119-2] set before Judge Edmunds with proof of mailing. (cf) (DTyl).
May 7, 1996 Filing 121 MOTION by defendant Raphael A. Robinson to reveal informant's identity or to produce informant for in camera examination with brief and exhibits (lg) (DTyl).
May 7, 1996 Filing 120 MOTION by defendant Raphael A. Robinson for bill of particulars with brief and proof of mailing (lg) (DTyl).
May 7, 1996 Filing 119 MOTION by defendant Raphael A. Robinson to suppress evidence and alternative motion for evidentiary hearing with brief and exhibits (lg) (DTyl).
May 3, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendants Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Arthur Yancey, Karl Graham, Nakia Batts, Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson, Rodney K. Neely, John Doe hearing on motion to adjourn trial [115-1] set for 2:00 5/14/96 motion to adjourn trial date by Herbert C. Robinson [109-1] set for 2:00 5/14/96 (Mm)
May 3, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendants setting a hearing on motion to adjourn trial by Nakia Batts [115-1] (LS) (DTyl).
May 2, 1996 Filing 117 APPOINTMENT of attorney Charles Spiekerman in place of attorney Federal Defender for Rodney K. Neely Voucher # 0445557 (LS) (DTyl).
May 2, 1996 Filing 116 APPOINTMENT for defendant Raphael A. Robinson of attorney Michlene T. Sager in place of attorney Federal Defender - Voucher # 0445558 (LS) (DTyl).
May 2, 1996 Filing 115 MOTION by defendant Nakia Batts to adjourn trial with brief, attachment and proof of mailing. (LS) (DTyl).
May 1, 1996 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, defendant Michael Bernard Jones, defendant Arthur Yancey, defendant Karl Graham, defendant Nakia Batts, defendant Raphael A. Robinson, defendant Herbert C. Robinson, defendant Rodney K. Neely on motion to adjourn trial date by Herbert C. Robinson [109-1] - disposition: granted - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: S. Jacques (Mm)
April 30, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendants Arthur Yancey, Karl Graham hearing on motion to sever defendants Arthur Yancey and Karl Graham by USA [111-1] set for 2:00 5/22/96 (Mm)
April 30, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones, extending time to file motions , etc.. (cf) (DTyl).
April 30, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendants Arthur Yancey and Karl Graham, setting date for oral argument on motion to sever defendants Arthur Yancey and Karl Graham by USA [111-1] (cf) (DTyl).
April 29, 1996 Filing 112 PROOF of mailing by USA of motion and brief to sever defendants (kg) (DTyl).
April 26, 1996 Filing 111 MOTION and brief by USA to sever defendants Arthur Yancey and Karl Graham (kg) (DTyl).
April 23, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendants Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Arthur Yancey, Karl Graham, defendant Nakia Batts, Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson, Rodney K. Neely hearing on motion to adjourn trial date by Herbert C. Robinson [109-1] set for 2:00 5/1/96 (Mm)
April 23, 1996 Filing 110 NOTICE by the court as to Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Arthur Yancey, Karl Graham, Nakia Batts, Raphael A. of hearing on motion to adjourn trial date by Herbert C. Robinson [109-1] (LS) (DTyl).
April 16, 1996 Filing 109 MOTION by defendant Herbert C. Robinson to adjourn trial date with proof of mailing. (no brief) (cf) (DTyl).
April 16, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts that the U. S. Marshal provide defendant with noncustodial round trip fare from Riverside, California to Detroit, Michigan for the purpose of appearing for pretrial conference, etc.. (cf) (DTyl).
April 15, 1996 Filing 107 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Karl Graham and defense counsel of superseding indictment (cf) (DTyl).
April 15, 1996 Filing 106 APPEARANCE for defendant Karl Graham of attorney Robert Lech. (cf) (DTyl).
April 15, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT held as to defendant Karl Graham, plea of not guilty entered , No Pretrial Needed continue bond from case # 95-81102 as to defendant Karl Graham - Magistrate Judge Thomas A. Carlson - D/Atty: Robert Lech - AUSA: Terrance Berg - Tape #: Carlson 96-049 (vs)
April 15, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 105 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Donald Scheer and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones (PP) (DTyl).
April 15, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Donald Scheer and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Arthur Yancey (PP) (DTyl).
April 11, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION and order by Judge Bernard A. Friedman acting in the absence of Judge Nancy Edmonds as to defendant Karl Graham, for travel expenses (lg) Modified on 04/12/1996 (DTyl).
April 10, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendants Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Arthur Yancey, Karl Graham, Nakia Batts, Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson, Rodney K. Neely criminal jury trial set for 9:00 5/28/96 (MM)
April 10, 1996 Filing 102 NOTICE as to Antonio Nevada Evans, Michael Bernard Jones, Arthur Yancey, Karl Graham, Nakia Batts, Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson, Rodney K. Neely of criminal jury trial (lg) (DTyl).
April 9, 1996 PRETRIAL conference held as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer (RJ)
April 9, 1996 PRETRIAL conference held as to defendant Arthur Yancey - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer (RJ)
April 8, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe as to defendant Arthur Yancey, for travel and expenses from Detorit, Michigan to Riverside, California (RH) (DTyl).
April 8, 1996 Filing 100 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Arthur Yancey and defense counsel of superseding indictment (RH) (DTyl).
April 8, 1996 Filing 99 APPEARANCE for defendant Arthur Yancey of CJA attorney Gabi Silver (RH) (DTyl).
April 8, 1996 SCHEDULE: as to defendant Arthur Yancey pretrial conference set for 9:30 4/9/96 (ml)
April 8, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT held as to defendant Arthur Yancey, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe - D/Atty: Gabi Silver - AUSA: Margaret Poff - Tape #: Duty Call 4/8/96 (ml)
April 5, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson, setting unsecured bond in the amount of $10,000 with conditions (Mm) (DTyl).
April 5, 1996 Filing 97 BOND in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson (Mm) (DTyl).
April 5, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson, setting unsecured bond in the amount of $10,000 with conditions (Mm) (DTyl).
April 5, 1996 Filing 95 BOND in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson (Mm) (DTyl).
April 5, 1996 BOND review hearing held as to defendants Raphael A. Robinson, Herbert C. Robinson - Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. Tape #: LVH 4/5/96 (Mm)
April 4, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson deadline for filing motions set for 5/14/96 (Mm)
April 4, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Raphael A. Robinson, to extend motion cut-off date (lg) Modified on 04/09/1996 (DTyl).
April 4, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Nancy Edmunds and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to Nakia Batts (lg) (DTyl).
April 2, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham, for roundtrip travel from Riverside, CA. to Detroit, MI. for arraignment (kg) (DTyl).
April 1, 1996 Filing 91 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Michael Bernard Jones and defense counsel of indictment (Mm) (DTyl).
April 1, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones pretrial conference set for 9:30 4/9/96 (Mm)
April 1, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT held as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. - D/Atty: James Thomas - AUSA: Buckley - Tape #: LVH 4/1/96 (Mm)
March 28, 1996 PRETRIAL conference not held as to defendant Nakia Batts. Form completed and executed by attorneys - Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan (KG)
March 28, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION and order by Judge Gerald E. Rosen as to defendant Arthur Yancey, that United States Marshal provide transportation expenses from Riverside, California to Detroit, and from Detroit to Riverside, California for purposes of arraignment (PP) (DTyl).
March 25, 1996 Filing 89 WARRANT for arrest returned executed by FBI agent on 1/9/96 as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson (mc) (DTyl).
March 25, 1996 Filing 88 WARRANT for arrest returned executed by FBI agent on 1/9/96 as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (mc) (DTyl).
March 25, 1996 Filing 87 WARRANT for arrest returned executed by FBI agent on 1/9/96 as to defendant Rodney K. Neely (mc) (DTyl).
March 25, 1996 Filing 86 WARRANT for arrest returned executed by FBI agent on 1/9/96 as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson (mc) (DTyl).
March 21, 1996 Filing 85 AUTHORIZATION by Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan and voucher for payment of transcript for defendant Michael Bernard Jones Voucher # 3960654181 (RH) (DTyl).
March 18, 1996 Filing 84 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Nakia Batts and defense counsel of superseding indictment (RH) (DTyl).
March 18, 1996 SCHEDULE: as to defendant Nakia Batts pretrial conference set for 9:30 3/28/96 (ml)
March 18, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT held as to defendant Nakia Batts, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe - D/Atty: Rita Chastang - AUSA: Lee Janice - Tape #: Duty Call 3/18/96 (ml)
March 12, 1996 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones taken on 12/1/95 of detention hearing (LS) (DTyl).
March 6, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, as to defendant Nakia Batts, that the U. S. Marshal provide defendant with noncustodial round trip fare from Riverside, California to Detroit, Michigan for the purpose of appearing for arraignment on a superseding indictment on 3/18/96 at 1:00 p.m., etc.. (cf) (DTyl).
March 5, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Pepe and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Rodney K. Neely (cf) (DTyl).
March 1, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts denying without prejudice motion pursuant to 404(b) requesting pretrial disclosure by the Govt of intent to introduce other crimes evidence at trial by Nakia Batts [42-1] (RH) (DTyl).
March 1, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts denying without prejudice motion for discovery and inspection by Nakia Batts [40-1] (RH) (DTyl).
March 1, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts denying without prejudice motion to sever by Nakia Batts [41-1] (RH) (DTyl).
March 1, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts denying without prejudice motion for disclosure of Brady materials by Nakia Batts [39-1] (RH) (DTyl).
February 28, 1996 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Nakia Batts on motion pursuant to 404(b) requesting pretrial disclosure by the Govt [42-1], motion to sever by Nakia Batts [41-1], motion for discovery and inspection by Nakia Batts [40-1], motion for disclosure of Brady materials by Nakia Batts [39-1] - disposition: ALL MOTIONS DENIED - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Carol Sapala (MM)
February 27, 1996 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson on appeal of Magistrate's Order for Detention - disposition: denied - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: Fred Pratt (Mm)
February 23, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Pepe and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson (LS) (DTyl).
February 23, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Pepe and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson (LS) (DTyl).
February 23, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Pepe and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans (LS) (DTyl).
February 22, 1996 PRETRIAL conference held as to defendant Rodney K. Neely - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe (ml)
February 16, 1996 Filing 73 PROOF of mailing as to defendant Nakia Batts of [69-1] [70-1] [71-1] [72-1]. (PP) (DTyl).
February 16, 1996 Filing 72 RESPONSE by plaintiff USA as to defendant Nakia Batts to motion for disclosure of Brady materials by Nakia Batts [39-1] with brief (PP) (DTyl).
February 16, 1996 Filing 71 RESPONSE by plaintiff USA as to defendant Nakia Batts to motion for discovery and inspection by Nakia Batts [40-1] with brief (PP) (DTyl).
February 16, 1996 Filing 70 RESPONSE and brief by plaintiff USA as to defendant Nakia Batts to motion pursuant to 404(b) requesting pretrial disclosure by the Govt of intent to introduce other crimes evidence at trial by Nakia Batts [42-1] (PP) (DTyl).
February 16, 1996 Filing 69 RESPONSE and brief by plaintiff USA as to defendant Nakia Batts to motion to sever by Nakia Batts [41-1] (PP) (DTyl).
February 15, 1996 MOTION hearing held as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson on to appeal Magistrate's Detention Order - disposition: denied - Judge Nancy G. Edmunds - Court Reporter: S. Jacques (Mm)
February 13, 1996 Filing 68 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Rodney K. Neely and defense counsel of first superseding indictment (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Filing 67 APPEARANCE for defendant Rodney K. Neely of attorney Charles H. Spiekerman (cf) Modified on 02/15/1996 (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Filing 64 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Herbert C. Robinson and defense counsel of first superseding indictment (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Filing 63 APPEARANCE for defendant Herbert C. Robinson of attorney Jerome P. Barney (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson, for detention pending trial (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Filing 61 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Raphael A. Robinson and defense counsel of first superseding indictment (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Filing 60 APPEARANCE for defendant Raphael A. Robinson of attorney Michelene T. Sager (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson, for detention pending trial (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Filing 58 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Antonio Nevada Evans and defense counsel of first superseding indictment (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Filing 57 APPEARANCE for defendant Antonio Nevada Evans of attorney Steven F. Fishman (cf) (DTyl).
February 13, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, for detention pending trial (cf) (DTyl).
February 12, 1996 Filing 66 BOND in the amount of $75,000.00 unsecured entered as to defendant Rodney K. Neely. (time stamped 2/13/96) (cf) (DTyl).
February 12, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer as to defendant Rodney K. Neely, setting unsecured bond in the amount of $75,000.00 with conditions . (time stamped 2/13/96) (cf) (DTyl).
February 12, 1996 SCHEDULE: pretrial conference set for 10:00 2/22/96 for Raphael A. Robinson (RJ)
February 12, 1996 DETENTION hearing held as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson Disposition: Bond denied - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer D/Atty: Michelene Sager AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: DAS 96-024 (RJ)
February 12, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT concluded as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer - D/Atty: Michelene Sager - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape #: DAS 96-024 (RJ)
February 12, 1996 DETENTION hearing held as to defendant Darrell Evan Disposition: Bond denied - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer D/Atty: Steven Fishman AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: DAS 96-024 (RJ)
February 12, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT concluded as to defendant Darrell Evan, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer - D/Atty: Steven Fishman - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape #: DAS 96-024 (RJ)
February 12, 1996 DETENTION hearing held as to defendant Rodney K. Neely Disposition: Bond set in the amount of 75,000 unsecured - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer D/Atty: Charles Spiekerman AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: DAS 96-024 (RJ)
February 12, 1996 SCHEDULE: pretrial conference set for 10:00 2/22/96 for Rodney K. Neely (RJ)
February 12, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT concluded as to defendant Rodney K. Neely, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer - D/Atty: Charles Spiekerman - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape #: DAS 96-024 (RJ)
February 12, 1996 SCHEDULE: pretrial conference set for 10:00 2/22/96 for Herbert C. Robinson (RJ)
February 12, 1996 DETENTION hearing held as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson Disposition: Bond denied - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer D/Atty: Jerome Barney AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: DAS 96-024 (RJ)
February 12, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT concluded as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer - D/Atty: Jerome Barney - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape #: DAS 96-024 (RJ)
February 12, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT adjourned as to defendant Darrell Evan to 1:00 2/12/96 - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe - D/Atty: No attorney present - AUSA: Terrence Berg - Tape #: Duty Call 2/9/96 (ml)
February 9, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe as to defendant Antonio Nevada Evans, for temporary detention pending bail hearing (RH) (DTyl).
February 9, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson, for temporary detention pending bail hearing (RH) (DTyl).
February 9, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Raphael A. Robinson (RH) (DTyl).
February 9, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson, for temporary detention pending bail hearing (RH) (DTyl).
February 9, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Rodney K. Neely, with financial affidavit (RH) (DTyl).
February 9, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe as to defendant Rodney K. Neely, for temporary detention pending bond hearing (RH) (DTyl).
February 9, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT adjourned as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson to 1:00 2/12/96 - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe - D/Atty: Jill Leslie Price - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape #: Duty Call 2/9/96 (ml)
February 9, 1996 INITIAL appearance by defendant Raphael A. Robinson (6) count(s) 1 before Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe, detention hearing set for 1:00 2/12/96 - D/Atty: Jill Leslie Price - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape # Duty Call 2/9/96 (ml)
February 9, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT adjourned as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson to 1:00 2/12/96 - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe - D/Atty: No attorney present - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape #: Duty Call 2/9/96 (ml)
February 9, 1996 INITIAL appearance by defendant Herbert C. Robinson (7) count(s) 1 before Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe, detention hearing set for 1:00 2/12/96 - D/Atty: No attorney present - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape # Duty Call 2/9/96 (ml)
February 9, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT adjourned as to defendant Rodney K. Neely to 1:00 2/12/96 for Rodney K. Neely - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe - D/Atty: Jill Leslie Price - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape #: Duty Call 2/9/96 (ml)
February 9, 1996 INITIAL appearance by defendant Rodney K. Neely (8) count(s) 1 before Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe, detention hearing set for 1:00 2/12/96 - D/Atty: Jill Leslie Price - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape # Duty Call 2/9/96 (ml)
February 9, 1996 INITIAL appearance by defendant Darrell Evan (1) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 1s, 2s, 5s, 7s, 4s, 8s before Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe, detention hearing set for 1:00 2/12/96 - D/Atty: No attorney present - AUSA: Terrence Berg - Tape # Duty Call 2/9/96 (ml)
February 8, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts hearing on motion pursuant to 404(b) requesting pretrial disclosure by the Govt of intent to introduce crimes evidence at trial by Nakia Batts [42-1] , motion to sever by Nakia Batts [41-1], motion for discovery and inspection by Nakia Batts [40-1] , motion for disclosure of Brady materials by Nakia Batts [39-1] set for 2:00 2/28/96 (Mm)
February 8, 1996 Filing 49 WARRANT and request for warrant as to defendant John Doe. (Copy of warrant dated 2/8/96.) (cf) (DTyl).
February 8, 1996 Filing 48 WARRANT and request for warrant as to defendant Rodney K. Neely. (Copy of warrant dated 2/8/96.) (cf) (DTyl).
February 8, 1996 Filing 47 WARRANT and request for warrant as to defendant Herbert C. Robinson. (Copy of warrant dated 2/8/96.) (cf) (DTyl).
February 8, 1996 Filing 46 WARRANT and request for warrant as to defendant Raphael A. Robinson. (Copy of warrant dated 2/8/96.) (cf) (DTyl).
February 8, 1996 Filing 45 WARRANT and request for warrant as to defendant Darrell Evan. (Copy of warrant dated 2/8/96.) (cf) (DTyl).
February 8, 1996 Filing 44 SUPERSEDING indictment (first) adding defendant John Doe (9) count(s) 1, 5-7 (cf)
February 8, 1996 Filing 43 NOTICE by Judge Edmund's chambers as to defendant Nakia Batts of hearing on motion pursuant to 404(b) requesting pretrial disclosure by the Govt of intent to introduce other crimes evidence at trial by Nakia Batts [42-1], motion to sever by Nakia Batts [41-1], motion for discovery and inspection by Nakia Batts [40-1], motion for disclosure of Brady materials by Nakia Batts [39-1] (PP) (DTyl).
February 7, 1996 Filing 42 MOTION by Nakia Batts pursuant to 404(b) requesting pretrial disclosure by the Govt of intent to introduce other crimes evidence at trial with brief and proof of mailing (lg) Modified on 02/08/1996 (DTyl).
February 7, 1996 Filing 41 MOTION by Nakia Batts to sever with brief and proof of mailing (lg) Modified on 02/08/1996 (DTyl).
February 7, 1996 Filing 40 MOTION by Nakia Batts for discovery and inspection with brief and proof of mailing (lg) Modified on 02/08/1996 (DTyl).
February 7, 1996 Filing 39 MOTION by Nakia Batts for disclosure of Brady materials with brief and proof of mailing (lg) Modified on 02/08/1996 (DTyl).
January 30, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION and order by Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan as to defendant Darrell Evan, dismissing complaint without prejudice and cancelling bond as to defendant Darrell Evan (mc) (DTyl).
January 24, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Steven Pepe and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Nakia Batts (PP) (DTyl).
January 24, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Steven Pepe and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Karl Graham (PP) (DTyl).
January 24, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRETRIAL conference summary order by Magistrate Steven Pepe and approved by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones (PP) (DTyl).
January 23, 1996 PRETRIAL conference held as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe (ml)
January 23, 1996 PRETRIAL conference held as to defendant Karl Graham - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe (ml)
January 23, 1996 PRETRIAL conference held as to defendant Nakia Batts - Magistrate Judge Steven D. Pepe (ml)
January 19, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan as to defendant Nakia Batts, granting noncustodial airfare from Detroit to Riverside, California (mc) (DTyl).
January 19, 1996 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Nakia Batts and defense counsel of indictment (cf) (DTyl).
January 19, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan as to defendant Nakia Batts reinstating original special conditions of bond. (cf) (DTyl).
January 19, 1996 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Karl Graham and defense counsel of indictment (cf) (DTyl).
January 19, 1996 Filing 30 APPEARANCE for defendant Karl Graham of attorney Robert Lech. (cf) (DTyl).
January 18, 1996 SCHEDULE: as to defendants Karl Graham and Nakia Batts pretrial conference set for 9:30 1/23/96 (KG)
January 18, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT held as to defendant Karl Graham, defendant Nakia Batts, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Virginia M. Morgan - D/Atty: Robert Lech & Rita Chastang - AUSA: Jennifer Peregord - Tape #: VM 1212 (KG)
January 11, 1996 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by defendant Michael Bernard Jones and defense counsel of indictment (cf) (DTyl).
January 11, 1996 Filing 28 APPEARANCE for defendant Michael Bernard Jones of attorney James Thomas. (cf) (DTyl).
January 11, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. reinstating and continuing bond from case # 95-m-81102-2 in the amount of $ 20,000.00 unsecured as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones (cf) (DTyl).
January 11, 1996 SCHEDULE: by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones pretrial conference set for 9:30 1/23/96 for Michael Bernard Jones (Mm)
January 11, 1996 ARRAIGNMENT held as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones, plea of not guilty entered - Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. - D/Atty: Thomas - AUSA: Gorland - Tape #: LVH 1/11/96 (Mm)
January 11, 1996 MINUTE SHEET of proceedings before Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. - as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones continue bond in the amount of $ 50,000 unsecured as to defendant Michael Bernard Jones D/Atty: J. Thomas AUSA: Gorland - TAPE #: LVH 1/11/96 (Mm)
January 9, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Nakia Batts that the U. S. Marshal provide defendant with noncustodial airfare from Riverside, California to Detroit, Michigan for the purpose of appearing for arraignment on an indictment on 1/18/96 at 1:00 p.m., etc.. (cf) Modified on 01/10/1996 (DTyl).
December 21, 1995 Filing 24 INDICTMENT against Nakia Batts (5) count(s) 1 (lg) (DTyl).
December 21, 1995 Filing 25 REQUEST for warrant for arrest upon indictment issued as to defendant Darrell Evan (lg) (DTyl).
December 21, 1995 Filing 24 INDICTMENT against Karl Graham (4) count(s) 1 (lg) (DTyl).
December 11, 1995 attorney Federal Defender for Karl Graham terminated as to defendant Karl Graham (cf)
December 11, 1995 Filing 23 APPOINTMENT of attorney Robert J. Lech in place of attorney Federal Defender for Karl Graham Voucher # 0417390 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (This voucher replaced on 4/29/97 with voucher # 0416502) (cf) Modified on 04/29/1997 (DTyl).
December 11, 1995 Filing 22 APPOINTMENT of attorney Gabi Deborah Silver in place of attorney Federal Defender for Arthur Yancey Voucher # 0417388 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 11, 1995 Filing 21 APPOINTMENT of attorney James C. Thomas in place of attorney Federal Defender for Michael Jones Voucher # 0417389 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Filing 20 BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 unsecured entered as to defendant Nakia Batts [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Nakia Batts, setting unsecured bond in the amount of $10,000.00 with conditions [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Filing 16 APPEARANCE for defendant Karl Graham of attorney Robert J. Lech [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Filing 15 BOND in the amount of $50,000.00 unsecured entered as to defendant Karl Graham [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Karl Graham, setting unsecured bond in the amount of $50,000.00 with conditions [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Filing 11 APPEARANCE for defendant Arthur Yancey of attorney Gabi D. Silver [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Filing 10 BOND in the amount of $50,000.00 unsecured entered as to defendant Arthur Yancey [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Arthur Yancey, setting unsecured bond in the amount of $50,000.00 with conditions [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Filing 6 APPEARANCE for defendant Michael Jones of attorney James C. Thomas [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Filing 5 BOND in the amount of $20,000.00 unsecured entered as to defendant Michael Jones [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Michael Jones, setting unsecured bond in the amount of $20,000.00 with conditions [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
December 1, 1995 SCHEDULE: as to defendant Michael Jones preliminary examination set for 1:00 12/21/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (ml)
December 1, 1995 DETENTION hearing held as to defendant Michael Jones Disposition: bond set in the amount of $20,000 unsecured - Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. D/Atty: James Thomas AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: Duty Call 12/1/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (ml)
December 1, 1995 SCHEDULE: as to defendant Arthur Yancey preliminary examination set for 1:00 12/21/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (ml)
December 1, 1995 DETENTION hearing not held as to defendant Arthur Yancey Disposition: bond set in the amount of $50,000 unsecured - Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. D/Atty: Gabi Silver AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: Duty Call 12/1/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (ml)
December 1, 1995 SCHEDULE: as to defendant Nakia Batts preliminary examination set for 1:00 12/21/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (ml)
December 1, 1995 DETENTION hearing not held as to defendant Nakia Batts Disposition: bond set in the amount of $10,000 unsecured Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. D/Atty: Rita Chastang AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: Duty Call 12/1/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (ml)
December 1, 1995 SCHEDULE: as to defendant Karl Graham preliminary examination set for 1:00 12/21/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (ml)
December 1, 1995 DETENTION hearing not held as to defendant Karl Graham Disposition: bond set in the amount of $50,000 unsecured - Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. D/Atty: Robert Lech AUSA: Ross Parker Tape #: Duty Call 12/1/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (ml)
November 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Nakia Batts [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
November 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Nakia Batts, for temporary detention pending hearing pursuant to the Bail Reform Act. [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
November 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Karl Graham [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
November 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Karl Graham, for temporary detention pending hearing pursuant to the Bail Reform Act. [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
November 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Arthur Yancey [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
November 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Arthur Yancey, for temporary detention pending hearing pursuant to the Bail Reform Act. [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
November 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. appointing the Federal Defender Office to represent defendant Michael Jones [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
November 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr. as to defendant Michael Jones, for temporary detention pending hearing pursuant to the Bail Reform Act. [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (cf) (DTyl).
November 30, 1995 INITIAL appearance by defendant Karl Graham (4) count(s) cmp before Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr., detention hearing set for 1:00 12/1/95 for Karl Graham - D/Atty: Rick Helfrick - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape # Duty Call 11/30/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (kd)
November 30, 1995 INITIAL appearance by defendant Michael Jones (2) count(s) cmp before Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr., detention hearing set for 1:00 12/1/95 for Michael Jones - D/Atty: Rick Helfrick - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape # Duty Call 11/30/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (kd)
November 30, 1995 INITIAL appearance by defendant Nakia Batts (5) count(s) cmp before Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr., detention hearing set for 1:00 12/1/95 for Nakia Batts - D/Atty: Rick Helfrick - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape # Duty Call 11/30/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (kd)
November 30, 1995 INITIAL appearance by defendant Arthur Yancey (3) count(s) cmp before Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe Jr., detention hearing set for 1:00 12/1/95 for Arthur Yancey - D/Atty: Rick Helfrick - AUSA: Ross Parker - Tape # Duty Call 11/30/95 [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (kd)
November 30, 1995 Filing 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Lynn V. Hooe against Deandre Johnson (1) count(s) cmp, Michael Jones (2) count(s) cmp, Arthur Yancey (3) count(s) cmp, Karl Graham (4) count(s) cmp, Nakia Batts (5) count(s) cmp [ 2:95-m -81102 ] (kd) Modified on 12/01/1995 (DTyl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Nevada Evans
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Represented By: Stephen T. Rabaut
Represented By: Marcia J. Silvers
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Yancey
Represented By: Gabi D. Silver
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nakia Batts
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Evans
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Represented By: Stephen T. Rabaut
Represented By: Marcia J. Silvers
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deandre Johnson
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Represented By: Stephen T. Rabaut
Represented By: Marcia J. Silvers
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael A. Robinson
Represented By: Federal Defender
Represented By: Michelene Eberhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Graham
Represented By: Robert J. Lech
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bernard Jones
Represented By: Ross G. Parker
Represented By: Marc P. Picker
Represented By: Federal Defender
Represented By: James C. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Clarence Fisher
Represented By: Francisco J. Villarruel
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Lamonte
Represented By: Francisco J. Villarruel
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: John Doe
Represented By: Francisco J. Villarruel
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Rodney K. Neely
Represented By: Charles H. Spiekerman
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Half
Represented By: Francisco J. Villarruel
Represented By: Federal Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Herbert C. Robinson
Represented By: Jerome P. Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ross G. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?