Cowan v. Stovall
Case Number: 2:2006cv13846
Filed: August 29, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 65 Petitioner's Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus MOTION to allow petitioner to return to state court seeking relief and hold present petition in abeyance re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and Granting 57 MOTION to Stay Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (PMil)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Clarifying Response Deadline as to 57 MOTION to Stay :( Responses due by 8/29/2011) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 44 Motion for Reconsideration; DENYING 48 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Tracey Lynn Cowan;and DENYING 47 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION and ORDER Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Denying a Certificate of Appealability and Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (NHol)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowan v. Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?