United States of America v. Currency $354,144.44
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency $354,144.44
Case Number: 2:2007cv12269
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Steven D Pepe
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Claimant's request for trial by jury and to change trial date 47 and claimant's Motion for extension of discovery 50 and denying claimant's renewed Motion for formal review into the merits and particularities of the claims in this case 48 and granting the government's Motion for status conference 52 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying claimant's Motion against plaintiff's continuous violations 41 ; denying claimant's Motion for formal investigation into the merits of the claims and the statements and claims of Andrew Di Martino 44 and granting Motion to Extend time to complete discovery 43 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying Motion to Dismiss construed in part as a motion for reconsideration 34 anddenying Supplemental Motion to Compel timely evidentiary exchange 37 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS AND ORDER to answer following remand by the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals 23 24 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 government's Motion for extension of time to file brief on or before 3/4/10, extending time for claimant Wada to file response brief on or before 3/29/10 and reaffirming 4/22/10 hearing at 2:00 PM. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency $354,144.44
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julie A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $354,144.44
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?