Triplett v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marcus Bernard Triplett
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2007cv14861
Filed: November 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Presiding Judge: Donald A Scheer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER finding as moot 54 Motion to Compel Neuropsychological Independent Examination. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 42 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(c) :( Motion Hearing reset for 3/18/2009 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 45 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Payment of Expert Witness Fee. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER entered re 40 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2009 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triplett v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James F. Hewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Bernard Triplett
Represented By: Nicholas S. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?