Witmer, et al v. Acument Global Technologies, Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Owens, Ralph W Williamson, Edward Pfannes, Kenneth Witmer and Joseph Olex
Defendant: Textron, Inc, Acument Global Technologies, Inc and Platinum Equity, LLC
Case Number: 2:2008cv12795
Filed: June 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Duggan
Presiding Judge: Komives
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION AND ORDER granting 73 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION and ORDER re 78 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J Komives. (EBut)
July 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET FOR MAY/JUNE, 2009. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion to Certify Class; denying 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witmer, et al v. Acument Global Technologies, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Owens
Represented By: Roger J. McClow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph W Williamson
Represented By: Roger J. McClow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Pfannes
Represented By: Roger J. McClow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Witmer
Represented By: Roger J. McClow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Olex
Represented By: Roger J. McClow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acument Global Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Equity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?