Rodriguez v. McQuidgen
Petitioner: Mario Huerta Rodriguez
Respondent: Gregory McQuidgen
Case Number: 2:2008cv13263
Filed: July 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Komives
Presiding Judge: Steeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying issuance of Certificate of Appealability re 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Mario Huerta Rodriguez. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 26 movant's Motion for relief from judgment. (Any appeal would be frivolous, not in good faith and may not be taken in forma pauperis) Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea) Modified on 7/20/2015 (MBea).
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Stay; accepting and adopting 20 Report and Recommendation and granting 21 Motion for enlargement of time. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mario Huerta Rodriguez, accepting 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and dening certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (DeSa)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 7 MOTION to Dismiss & Brief in Support w/ Certificate of Service filed by Gregory McQuidgen Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J Komives. (EBut)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. McQuidgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Huerta Rodriguez
Represented By: Suzanna Kostovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory McQuidgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?