Yahya v. Yemenia-Yemen Airways et al
Plaintiff: Abdel Monen Yahya
Defendant: GSA-Arabian Horizons Travel and Tourism, Yemenia-Yemen Airways, Northwest Airlines, Incorporated and Delta Airlines, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2008cv14789
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Cox
Presiding Judge: Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER denying 35 MOTION for Reconsideration re 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by GSA-Arabian Horizons Travel and Tourism. Signed by District Judge Sean F Cox. (JHer)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER granting, with leave to Amend 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F Cox. (JHer)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER granting with leave to amend 6 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Northwest Airlines, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Sean F Cox. (JHer)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION AND ORDER granting with leave to amend 6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Northwest Airlines, Inc. Signed by District Judge Sean F Cox. (JHer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yahya v. Yemenia-Yemen Airways et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSA-Arabian Horizons Travel and Tourism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yemenia-Yemen Airways
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Airlines, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdel Monen Yahya
Represented By: Steven M. Chait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?