Dillard v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Dillard
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Irma J Chenevert, Nancy M Blount and Terrance K Boyle
Case Number: 2:2009cv10702
Filed: February 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Iosco
Presiding Judge: Hood
Presiding Judge: Pepe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Letter Requests, His Supplement, His Request for Issuance of a Writ of Habeas Corpus, & His Request for Reversal and Remand 35 , 36 , 37 , 38 , 39 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Reinstate. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MWil) (Main Document 30 replaced on 1/4/2013) (MWil).
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying plaintiff's 15 Motion for Relief from Judgment; denying 17 Motion to Reopen Case and denying 18 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION and ORDER Dismissing 1 Civil Rights Complaint, denying 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, and Concluding that an Appeal cannot be taken in Good Faith. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (CGre)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma J Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy M Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance K Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?