Herbert v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Yolande Marie Herbert
Defendant: Dannie Ray Baker, Thomas Diaz and John Hankins
Objector: Kellie L Howard-Goudy
Case Number: 2:2009cv12314
Filed: June 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Hluchaniuk
Presiding Judge: Rosen
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING THE CITY DEFENDANTS' 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (RGun)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING (1) THE CITY DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS 83 TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND (2) PLAINTIFF'S 86 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by District Judge Gerald E Rosen. (RGun)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AFFIRMING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 56 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES. ( Discovery due by 3/31/2010,, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/30/2010,, Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/5/2010 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald E Rosen.) Signed by District Judge Gerald E Rosen. (RBri)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 37 , DENYING 25 Motion to Set Aside Stipulation and Order. Signed by District Judge Gerald E Rosen. (RBri)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 25 MOTION to Set Aside Supplemental Motion to Set Aside Stipulation filed by Yolande Marie Herbert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael Hluchaniuk. (PPel)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 7 MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. Signed by District Judge Gerald E Rosen. (RBri)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael Hluchaniuk. (PPel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolande Marie Herbert
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannie Ray Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Diaz
Represented By: Gina U. Puzzuoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hankins
Represented By: Gina U. Puzzuoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Kellie L Howard-Goudy
Represented By: Joseph M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?