Robert Bosch LLC v. A.B.S. Power Brake, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Bosch LLC
Defendant: A.B.S. Power Brake, Inc., Pedro Gomez, Lucio Gomez and Guillermo Gomez
Case Number: 2:2009cv14468
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Duggan
Presiding Judge: Scheer
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER AMENDING re 150 Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER CLARIFYING re 105 Memorandum Opinion & Order Awarding Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPINION and ORDER AWARDING SANCTIONS Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER SETTING DATES FOR EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES & DISCOVERY. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Bosch LLC v. A.B.S. Power Brake, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Belinda J. Scrimenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.B.S. Power Brake, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Kadin - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Gomez
Represented By: David C. Kadin - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucio Gomez
Represented By: David C. Kadin - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Gomez
Represented By: David C. Kadin - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?