Machesney v. Lar-Bev of Howell, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shari Machesney
Defendant: Lar-Bev of Howell, Inc., Larbev, Inc., Larbev-Fenton, Inc., Larbev-Union Lake, Inc., Larbev-Waterford, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2010cv10085
Filed: January 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Cox
Presiding Judge: Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 OPINION and ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 139 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION and ORDER Granting 85 MOTION to Vacate the Judgment Entered Pursuant to Defendants' Offer of Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Denying 96 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION and ORDER GRANTING 78 MOTION to Dismiss In Accordance with Offer of Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION AND ORDER denying 48 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Signed by District Judge Sean F Cox. (JHer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machesney v. Lar-Bev of Howell, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Machesney
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lar-Bev of Howell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larbev, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larbev-Fenton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larbev-Union Lake, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larbev-Waterford, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?