Houston v. American Airlines, Incorporated

Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Houston
Defendant: American Airlines, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv10330
Filed: January 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Cleland
Presiding Judge: Scheer
Nature of Suit: Airplane

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Review of Clerk Action under Fed.R. Civ.P. 54(d)(1). Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER striking 54 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Memorializing Rulings on Orla Motions in Limine - denying [] Motion in Limine; denying [] Motion in Limine; Resolving [] Motion in Limine; Resolving [] Motion in Limine; granting [] Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 37 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Testimony; and DENYING 38 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to Plaintiff as a Registered Nurse. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION AND ORDER denying 22 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and converting hearing to a status conference. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER requiring statement of citizenshp too be filed by 12/9/2010. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. American Airlines, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Houston
Represented By: Elliott R. Perlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Incorporated
Represented By: William D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?