Securities & Exchange Commission v. Gagnon
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: Matthew John Gagnon
Case Number: 2:2010cv11891
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Order freezing assets contained within the Order of Preliminary Injunction 75 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff against defendant. Defendant is liable for $3,613,259.00 in disgorgement, $488,570.47 in prejudgment interest, and $100,000.00 in civil penalties. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Preliminary Injunction 4 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER continuing asset freeze and other ancillary relief and setting Telephone Conference for 8/5/2010 02:45 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER dismissing order to show cause 18 , granting defendant's request for continuance of injunction hearing and setting briefing schedule 20 and granting 22 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Responses due by 7/7/2010 Replies due by 7/15/2010 Motion Hearing re-set for 7/21/2010 02:30 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Gagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: John E. Birkenheier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew John Gagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?