D'Angelo v. Clinton Township et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Thomas D'Angelo
Defendant: Clinton Township, Nicholas Dykas, Jason Figurski, Keith Watson and Paul parent
Case Number: 2:2010cv12195
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Lawrence P Zatkoff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2011 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on 11/10/2011 is Cancelled. WILL BE RESCHEDULED AFTER APPEAL IS DECIDED (IF NECESSARY). (MVer)
November 1, 2011 Filing 36 Certificate of Service re 35 Notice of Appeal. (TMcg)
November 1, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jason Figurski, Nicholas Dykas re 33 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Receipt No: 0645-3237502 - Fee: $ 455 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Peacock, Peter)
October 13, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2011 10:30 AM before District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff IN PORT HURON (MVer)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
July 7, 2011 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on July 21, 2011 is Cancelled re 17 Final Pretrial Conference. It will be rescheduled after all motions have been decided. (MVer)
April 13, 2011 Filing 32 REPLY to Response re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clinton, Township of, Nicholas Dykas, Jason Figurski, Keith Watson. (Peacock, Peter)
April 6, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas D'Angelo. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit #1-Deposition of Thomas D'Angelo, # 3 Exhibit #2-Transcript of Criminal Jury Trial, # 4 Exhibit #3-Deposition of Janine Taylor, # 5 Exhibit #4-Deposition of Deborah Bodner, # 6 Exhibit #5-Deposition of Officer Jason Figurski, # 7 Exhibit #6-Deposition of Officer Nicholas Dykas, # 8 Exhibit #7-Police Reports, # 9 Exhibit #8-Case Law) (Williams, Amos)
March 18, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Clinton, Township of, Nicholas Dykas, Jason Figurski, Keith Watson. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Taylor Deposition Transcript, # 4 Exhibit Bodner Deposition Transcript, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Dykas Deposition Transcript, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Clinton Township General Incident Report, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Portions of Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Portions of 9/11/08 Trial Transcript) (Peacock, Peter)
March 16, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE by Thomas D'Angelo of withdrawal of 26 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for sanctions. (Williams, Amos)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 26 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for sanctions. Set Motion Deadlines: (Responses due by 3/15/2011, JOINT Statement of Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 4/15/2011) - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: 26 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for sanctions filed by Thomas D'Angelo. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
February 25, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for sanctions by Thomas D'Angelo. (Williams, Amos)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER settling 7 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar) (Main Document 23 replaced on 11/17/2010) (LBar).
November 10, 2010 Filing 22 STATEMENT of Resolved and Unresolved Issues by All Parties (Williams, Amos)
November 3, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of hearing on 7 MOTION to Compel Discovery. JOINT STATEMENT of Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 11/10/2010 and Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2010 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
November 1, 2010 Filing 20 RESPONSE to 7 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Clinton, Township of, Nicholas Dykas, Jason Figurski, Keith Watson. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Ltr to Pltf Atty & Clinton Twp. Defs Response to Pltf's 1st Disc Req to Defs) (Peacock, Peter)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File a Response to Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub: 14 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 7 filed by Keith Watson, Nicholas Dykas, Clinton, Township of, Jason Figurski. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/25/2011 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/18/2011 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2011 10:00 AM before District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MVer)
October 14, 2010 Minute Entry - Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2010 before District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
October 8, 2010 Filing 16 Case Summary REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Williams, Amos)
October 8, 2010 Filing 15 STATEMENT of Resolved and Unresolved Issues by All Parties (Williams, Amos)
October 7, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 7 by Clinton, Township of, Nicholas Dykas, Jason Figurski, Keith Watson. (Peacock, Peter)
October 7, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE by Clinton, Township of, Nicholas Dykas, Jason Figurski, Keith Watson of withdrawal of 10 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and/or Motion to Dismiss. (Peacock, Peter)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 10 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and/or Motion to Dismiss (motion will be decided upon by the briefs) - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
September 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub: 10 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and/or Motion to Dismiss filed by Keith Watson, Nicholas Dykas, Clinton, Township of, Jason Figurski. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
September 2, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and/or Motion to Dismiss by Clinton, Township of, Nicholas Dykas, Jason Figurski, Keith Watson. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Interrogatories to Plaintiff Dated June 3, 2010, # 3 Exhibit B - August 5, 2010 Email, # 4 Exhibit C - August 18, 2010 Email) (Peacock, Peter)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 7 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Set Motion Deadlines:(Responses due by 9/17/2010, JOINT Statement of Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 10/6/2010) - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub: 7 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Thomas D'Angelo. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
August 31, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Thomas D'Angelo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1-Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests to Defendants) (Williams, Amos)
August 17, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2010 09:30 AM before District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff IN PORT HURON (MVer)
July 21, 2010 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Macomb County Circuit Court of receipt of 4 Notice of remand. (DPer)
June 29, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE remanding case to *MACOMB COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT*. (PMil)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REMANDING PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS to Macomb County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (PMil)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Clinton Township, Nicholas Dykas, Jason Figurski, Keith Watson. (Peacock, Peter)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Keith Watson, Clinton Township, Jason Figurski, Nicholas Dykas from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 10-944-NO. Receipt No: 0645-2493092 - Fee: $ 350 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Peacock, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Angelo v. Clinton Township et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Township
Represented By: Peter W. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Dykas
Represented By: Peter W. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Figurski
Represented By: Peter W. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Watson
Represented By: Peter W. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?