Griffor v. FDIC, as Receiver for CF Bancorp
Plaintiff: David Griffor
Defendant: FDIC, as Receiver for CF Bancorp
Case Number: 2:2010cv12383
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER regarding the issue unresolved by previous Order accepting in full the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation granting defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment 72 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER adopting in part 88 Report and Recommendation granting defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 72 and denying plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 74 . Defendant's response to plaintiff's objection due 4/10/13; reply due 4/24/13. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 76 defendant's Motion to Strike and denying 77 plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 16 defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Continue Stay. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffor v. FDIC, as Receiver for CF Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Griffor
Represented By: Douglas S. Touma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDIC, as Receiver for CF Bancorp
Represented By: Susan L. Kreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?