Garcia v. Renaissance Global Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Ruth Garcia
Defendant: Renaissance Global Logistics, LLC, Clyde Howard, Ron Butler and Yvonne Rayford
Case Number: 2:2010cv13122
Filed: August 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Duggan
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Attorney Fees AND COSTS IN $59,687.26; denying 69 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 77 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 79 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Judgment; granting 47 Motion for Judgment. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION AND ORDER denying 54 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION AND ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING ASIDE re 25 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 13 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Renaissance Global Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Garcia
Represented By: Lennox Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Global Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Rayford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?