Kesler Associates, Inc. v. Wellman Plastics Recycling, LLC
Plaintiff: Kesler Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Wellman Plastics Recycling, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv13390
Filed: August 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Presiding Judge: Paul J Komives
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER AND OPINION Granting Defendant's 97 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Monda, H)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION and ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion In Limine to Bar Testimony of William Carroll Burrows for Lack of Foundation 67 , Denying Motion In Limine to Dismiss Defendant's Accord and Satisfaction Argument 68 , and Denying Emergency Motion for Order Requiring Defendant to Provide Sales Figures for 2012 Through Present Date in 2013 69 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 65 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting in Part Defendant's Objections 58 and Overruling Plaintiff's Objections 56 to the Magistrate Judge's Order 55 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Supplementation 54 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 49 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kesler Associates, Inc. v. Wellman Plastics Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesler Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellman Plastics Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?