Harris v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Willie Harris
Defendant: Brown, Adery and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2010cv13434
Filed: August 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER accepting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 40 on 29 Motion to Dismiss and 34 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 28 (plaintiff's Motion for Serving and filing pleadings and other papers 27 DENIED) and GRANTING plaintiff's Motion to Compel 30 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting 26 Report and Recommendation and denying 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 20 Motion Demand for Jury Trial and Objection to Summary Judgment - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?