Purcell et al v. Fadlallah et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Purcell and Georgene Stergalas
Defendant: Imad Fadlallah and Dearborn Public Schools
Case Number: 2:2010cv13444
Filed: August 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Presiding Judge: Michael Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendants' 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Loury, R)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Supplemental brief as to 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment :( Supplement Brief due by 6/10/2013) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Response and setting deadline of 1/28/2013 for the response to be filed. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DIRECTING plaintiffs to file a motion to amend their response to defendants' motion for summary judgment by 12/7/2012,. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 37 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Final Witness List. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Amending Scheduling Order ( Supplemental Witness List due by 8/30/2012; Discovery due by 9/23/2012, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 10/23/2012) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Suspending Deadlines and setting date of 9/6/2011 to submit proposed amendment. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting telephone conference, ( Telephone Conference set for 1/27/2011 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert H Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion for Alternate Service; 7 Motion to Extend Summons. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purcell et al v. Fadlallah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Purcell
Represented By: Deborah K. Schlussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgene Stergalas
Represented By: Deborah K. Schlussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imad Fadlallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dearborn Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?