Seals v. Scutt et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Seals
Defendant: Debra Scutt, B Gardon, B Clement, C Murphy, B Upston, K Nibbelink, V Stevenson, A Neff, A Edelman, C Ives, Prisoner Health Services, Incorporated, Correctional Medical Services, Incorporated and Aetna Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv15054
Filed: December 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Presiding Judge: Lawrence P. Zatkoff
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 94 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 108 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 111 Motion for Expert ; adopting 113 Report and Recommendation; Denying 118 Motion for De Novo Review,. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Denying 101 Renewed Motion to Appoint Counsel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Take Deposition from Nicholas Seals - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Directing Corizon Health to Provide Under Seal the Address for Un-served Defendant K. Nibbelink - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation for 55 Report and Recommendation, 46 Motion to Dismiss filed by V Stevenson, 51 Motion to Dismiss filed by Prisoner Health Services, Incorporated Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 49 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Amend Complaint - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal ; adopting 28 Report and Recommendation ; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seals v. Scutt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Scutt
Represented By: Joshua D. Marcum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Gardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Clement
Represented By: Joshua D. Marcum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Murphy
Represented By: Joshua D. Marcum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Upston
Represented By: Joshua D. Marcum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Nibbelink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Stevenson
Represented By: Randall A. Juip
Represented By: Brian J. Richtarcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Neff
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Edelman
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Ives
Represented By: Joshua D. Marcum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Health Services, Incorporated
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Incorporated
Represented By: Randall A. Juip
Represented By: Brian J. Richtarcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis M. Haffey
Represented By: Paul A. Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?