Federal-Mogul World Wide, Inc. et al v. Mahle GmbH et al
Plaintiff: Federal-Mogul World Wide, Inc. and Federal-Mogul Corporation
Defendant: Mahle GmbH and Mahle Engine Components USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv10675
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Julian Abele Cook
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 74 Motion to Disqualify Counsel and denying 84 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED ORDER denying 88 Motion to Strike (document #84 still pending). Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss; granting 55 Motion for Leave to File; denying 58 Motion to Strike; denying 65 Motion to Strike; denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 37 Motion. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal-Mogul World Wide, Inc. et al v. Mahle GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahle GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahle Engine Components USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh C. Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal-Mogul World Wide, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Artz
Represented By: Michelle L. Alamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal-Mogul Corporation
Represented By: Michelle L. Alamo
Represented By: John A. Artz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?