Binno v. The American Bar Association Featured Case
Plaintiff: Angelo Binno
Defendant: The American Bar Association
Case Number: 2:2011cv12247
Filed: May 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2011 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2011 re 19 MOTION to Strike 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 25 MOTION for Leave to File 17 MOTION to Dismiss < before District Judge Denise Page Hood. Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Sheri Ward) (LSau)
December 1, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION for Leave to File, 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 19 MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing RESET for 12/15/2011 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
November 23, 2011 Filing 27 RESPONSE to 25 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE filed by All Defendants. (Miller, Allyson)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Response to as to 25 Michigan Attorney General Bill Schuette's MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE :( Responses due by 11/23/2011) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
November 18, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION for Leave to File 19 MOTION to Strike and 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing RESET for 12/6/2011 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (SJa)
November 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION for Leave to File 19 MOTION to Strike and 17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Hearing RESET for 12/14/2011 04:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
November 2, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE by Bill Schuette. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief) (Neill, Brian)
October 31, 2011 Filing 24 REPLY to Response re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment filed by The American Bar Association. (Miller, Allyson)
October 18, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of hearing on 19 MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2011 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
October 17, 2011 Filing 22 RESPONSE to 19 MOTION to Strike 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment (motion to strike evidence contained in motion) MOTION to Strike 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment (motion to strike evidence contained in motion) filed by The American Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Mathis, Jo, Test of Wills, Detroit Legal News (July 29, 2011), # 3 Exhibit B - LSAT Percentile Tables, # 4 Exhibit C - Letter from Peter H. Webster dated October 3, 2011, # 5 Exhibit D - Supplemental Declaration of Hulett H. Askew, # 6 Exhibit E - Bowers v. Burnett) (Miller, Allyson)
October 17, 2011 Filing 21 RESPONSE to 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Angelo Binno. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A- Declaration of David R. Moss) (Bernstein, Richard)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED ORDER dismissing docket Entry 11 as moot. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
October 3, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment (motion to strike evidence contained in motion) by Angelo Binno. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A-Declaration of Angelo Binno, # 3 Exhibit B-Printout from LSAC Website) (Bernstein, Richard)
September 22, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of hearing on 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2011 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
September 19, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment by The American Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpt of ABA Standards and Rules of Procedure for Approval of Law Schools, # 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Hulett H. Askew, # 4 Exhibit C - Elder v National Conf. of Bar Examiners, et al) (Miller, Allyson)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER to extend deadlines. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
September 2, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing RESET for 11/22/2011 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
August 30, 2011 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Plaintiff's First) filed by Angelo Binno against The American Bar Association. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Printout from LSAC Website, # 3 Exhibit B - Example of LSAT Question, # 4 Exhibit C - May 25, 1995 Letter from LSAC, # 5 Exhibit D - ABA August 2009 "Consultant's Memo") (Bernstein, Richard)
August 16, 2011 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The American Bar Association (Miller, Allyson)
August 16, 2011 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by The American Bar Association. (Miller, Allyson)
August 16, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing on 11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2011 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
August 15, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Motion For Summary Judgment by The American Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpt of ABA Standards, # 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Hulett J. Askew, # 4 Exhibit C - Elder v. National Conf. of Bar Examiners, et al) (Miller, Allyson)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER to extend time for response to complaint 1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 8/15/2011) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
July 21, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson A. Miller on behalf of The American Bar Association. (Miller, Allyson)
July 21, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Peter H. Webster on behalf of The American Bar Association. (Webster, Peter)
July 21, 2011 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David R. Deromedi appearing on behalf of The American Bar Association (Deromedi, David)
July 18, 2011 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter H. Webster appearing on behalf of The American Bar Association (Webster, Peter)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 4 Motion for Law Student Practice. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
June 10, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION Plaintiff's motion to permit law student practice by Angelo Binno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Bernstein, Richard)
May 26, 2011 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Blau appearing on behalf of Angelo Binno (Blau, Michael)
May 24, 2011 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *The American Bar Association* (DWor)
May 24, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Angelo Binno against The American Bar Association. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-2993652 - Fee: $ 350. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Cook. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Bernstein, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Binno v. The American Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Binno
Represented By: Richard H. Bernstein
Represented By: Michael J. Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?