Bailey v. Nyloncraft, Inc.
Plaintiff: R.B. and James Bailey
Defendant: Nyloncraft, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv14199
Filed: September 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Randon
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Resolving Motion to determine attorney lien 88 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting Sommers Schwartz, P.C.'s Emergency Motion for Protective Order 96 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Resolving motions in limine at final pretrial conference: denying 41 Motion to Strike; taking under advisement 56 Motion in Limine; denying 68 Motion to Adjourn Trial Date; denying 68 Motion to Compel (redepose plaintiff); taking u nder advisement 72 (Issue No. 1) Motion in Limine (to preclude evidence relevant to plaintiff's negligent entrustment claim) and remaining motions in limine have been resolved by the parties 72 (Issue Nos. 2-8). Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Defendant's 29 Motion to Compel Medical Examination of Robert Bailey, and granting 30 Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Emergency Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (JCur)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 13 defendant's Motion extend discovery by 90 days. Discovery cut-off extended to 7/13/12. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Nyloncraft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.B.
Represented By: Robert H. Darling
Represented By: Francis M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bailey
Represented By: Francis M. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Robert H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyloncraft, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?