Wire Harness - Lead Case
Plaintiff: Ifeoma Adams, Jude Anheluk, Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Halley Ascher, Melissa Barron, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Lucha Bott, Curtis P. Boudreaux, Bradford Brewer, Gary Brock, Tenisha Burgos, CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Cesar-Scott, Inc., Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonw, Jennifer Chase, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Zahira Crespo, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Sam Davis, Jr, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., End-Payor Plaintiffs, Alena Farrell, Findlay Industries, Inc., Florida, State of, Ford Motor Company, Jason Grala, Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Curtis Gunnerson, Paul Gustafson, Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Meredith Heller, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Gary Arthur Herr, John Hollingsworth, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Janes, John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Vickie Josefsberg, Carol Ann Kashishian, Richard W Keifer, Craig Kelly, Kelly Klosterman, Susan Lacava, Scott Lamson, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Estaban Maravilla, Tony Maravilla, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Ellis Winton McInnis, Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Joseph Muscara, Stacey R Nickell, Roger D. Olson, Susan B. Olson, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Cindy Prince, Scott M Quinn, RD Automotive, Inc., Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc., Janne Rice, Robert Rice, SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Darrel Senior, Meetesh Shah, Darcy Sherman, Margaret A Sirmon, South Star Corporation, Superstore Automotive, Inc, T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Kathleen Tawney, Jane M Taylor, Technical Aids to Independence, Inc., Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, Timberline Manufacturing Companpy, Michael Tracy, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Roseana Weatherwax, Westfield Dodge City, Inc., Michael Wick, Gretha Wilkerson, Tommy N. Wilson, Phillip G. Young, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Dealership Plaintiffs, Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs and Dakkota Integrated Systems LLC
Defendant: American Furukawa, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv B.V. & Co. KG, Autoliv North America, Inc., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Delphi Automotive System, LLC, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC., Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, Furukawa Lear Corporation, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Tsuneaki Hanamura, K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Ryoji Kawai, Koyo Corporation of USA, Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC, LEONI BORDNETZ-SYSTEME GMBH, Lear Corporation, Lear Furukawa Corporation, Leoni AG, Leoni Kabel, Leoni Kabel GmbH, Leoni LG, Leoni Wire Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., N.S. International, Ltd., NSK Ltd., NTN Corporation, NTN USA Corporation, New Sabina Industries, Inc., Nippon Seiki Co., Ltd, Nippon Seiki Company, Limited, Shigeru Ogawa, S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH, SKF AB, Schaeffler AG, Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TK Holdings Corporation, TRAM, Incorporated, TRMI, INC, TRW Automobile Holdings Corporation, Hisamitsu Takada, Takata Corporation, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated, TRAM, Incorporated Doing business as Tokai Rika U.S.A., Incorporated, Indiana Attorney General and S-Y Systems Technologies America, LLC
In Re: Wire Harness - Lead Case
Interested Party: Mitsuba Corporation and American Mitsuba Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Grupo Antolin North America, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00100
Filed: September 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Marianne O Battani
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
2 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Attorney Michael R. Turco is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Attorney Turco completed his work for Defendant Leoni. (Turco, Michael)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER Granting #466 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Molly K.McGinley. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER Withdrawing Attorney Brian C. Smith re #462 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #465 Motion to Withdraw as to Attorney Larry S. Gangnes. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
August 9, 2022 Filing 466 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Molly K. McGinley by Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Proposed Order) (McGinley, Molly)
August 2, 2022 Filing 465 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Larry S. Gangnes by American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gangnes, Larry)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER Granting #458 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Terrence J. Truax, Charles B. Sklarsky, and Michael T. Brody filed by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting #457 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Michael R. Turco. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 21, 2022 Filing 462 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Brian C. Smith for on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Smith, Brian)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting #456 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Michael R. Shumaker. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting #455 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to John M. Majoras. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting #454 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Michelle K. Fischer. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
May 24, 2022 Filing 458 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Terrence J. Truax, Charles B. Sklarsky, and Michael T. Brody by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Truax, Terrence)
May 24, 2022 Filing 457 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Michael R. Turco by Leoni AG, Leoni Wire Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Turco, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 456 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Michael R. Shumaker by Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Shumaker, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 455 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney John M. Majoras by Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Majoras, John)
March 28, 2022 Filing 454 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Michelle K. Fischer by Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Fischer, Michelle)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #449 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Zachary Trotter. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting #450 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER granting #448 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Molly M. Donovan. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 25, 2022 Filing 450 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Tiffany D. Lipscomb-Jackson by Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Lipscomb-Jackson, Tiffany)
March 25, 2022 Filing 449 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Zachary Trotter by Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Lipscomb-Jackson, Tiffany)
March 18, 2022 Filing 448 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Molly M. Donovan by N.S. International, Ltd., New Sabina Industries, Inc., Nippon Seiki Co., Ltd. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Withdrawing Attorney Katherine Clemons. (See ECF No. 2153 in case number 12-2311). Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER Granting #444 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Andrew S. Marovitz. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER Granting #445 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Britt M. Miller. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 15, 2021 Filing 445 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Britt M. Miller by Lear Corporation. (Miller, Britt)
December 15, 2021 Filing 444 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Andrew S. Marovitz by Lear Corporation. (Marovitz, Andrew)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER Granting #442 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 3, 2021 Filing 442 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney William P. Sanders for on behalf of Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, William) Modified on 12/3/2021 (LHos).[DOCUMENT ENTITLED MOTION TO WITHDRAW]
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER Granting #440 Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Jeffrey G. Heuer by Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 20, 2021 Filing 440 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Jeffrey G. Heuer by Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC. (Heuer, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER Withdrawing Attorney David S. Molot re #438 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 21, 2021 Filing 438 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney David S. Molot for on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Molot, David)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #436 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 24, 2021 Filing 436 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Gary K. August by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (McNaughton, Matthew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 435 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Manuel J. Dominguez on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.(12-101; 12-10336), Cesar-Scott, Inc.(12-101; 12-10177), Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc.(12-101; 11-15186), Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc.(12-101; 12-10201), South Star Corporation(12-101; 12-11165). (Dominguez, Manuel)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Withdrawing Attorney Hollis L Salzman re ECF No. 2095 in Case No. 12-md-02311. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting #433 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 1, 2020 Filing 433 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Steven M. Zarowny by Denso International America, Incorporated. (Cherry, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Marianne O. Battani and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #430 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
April 1, 2020 Filing 430 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Elizabeth R. Odette by Cesar-Scott, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., Technical Aids to Independence, Inc., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Odette, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting #428 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney AND DIRECTING OFFICE OF ZACHARY TROTTER TO REMOVE ATTORNEY FROM ALL CASES. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
November 20, 2019 Filing 428 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Zachary D. Trotter by Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Trotter, Zachary)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #427 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Gabriel A. Fuentes filed by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 427 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Gabriel A. Fuentes by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Fuentes, Gabriel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 426 NOTICE by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.(12-101; 12-10336), Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated(12-101; 11-15553), Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Jagher, Jonathan)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #417 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Craig D. Bachman filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, #423 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Daniel Fenske filed by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
January 30, 2019 Filing 425 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by William Caldes on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Caldes, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 424 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney David P. Donovan for on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Donovan, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 423 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Daniel Fenske by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Fenske, Daniel)
December 3, 2018 Attorney Alexander E. Blum is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: withdrew. (Mantese, Gerard)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY CAITLYN HUFFSTUTTER Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
August 14, 2018 Attorney Krista M. Hosmer is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Withdraw as Counsel. (Hosmer, Krista)
July 27, 2018 Filing 421 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Caitlyn Huffstutter for on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Huffstutter, Caitlyn)
April 5, 2018 Filing 420 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael S. Smith appearing on behalf of Dakkota Integrated Systems LLC Direct Purchaser Plaintiff (Smith, Michael)
April 5, 2018 Filing 419 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Randall B. Weill appearing on behalf of Dakkota Integrated Systems LLC Direct Purchaser Plaintiff (Weill, Randall)
April 5, 2018 Filing 418 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory P. Hansel appearing on behalf of Dakkota Integrated Systems LLC Direct Purchaser Plaintiff (Hansel, Gregory)
January 24, 2018 Filing 417 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Craig D. Bachman by American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Davis, Kenneth)
November 29, 2017 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing scheduled for December 5, 2017 is CANCELLED re #360 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (KDoa)
November 15, 2017 Filing 416 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Omar Ochoa as Counsel for End-Payor Plaintiffs (Calkins, Erin)
November 15, 2017 Attorney Omar Ochoa is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Departure From Firm. (Calkins, Erin)
November 9, 2017 Attorney Warren T. Burns is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Departure From Firm. (Calkins, Erin)
November 1, 2017 Filing 415 NOTICE of Appearance by Priya Srinivasan on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Srinivasan, Priya)
October 31, 2017 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance by Demetra V. Frawley on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Frawley, Demetra)
October 30, 2017 Filing 413 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Suggs on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Suggs, David)
October 30, 2017 Filing 412 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Pace on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Pace, Jack)
October 19, 2017 Filing 411 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Chung on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Chung, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 410 REDACTED VERSION of #291 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,, by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated (Cherry, Steven)
September 22, 2017 Filing 409 REDACTED VERSION of #285 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Cherry, Steven)
September 22, 2017 Filing 408 REDACTED VERSION of #279 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL THE SUMITOMO DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF DOCUMENTS THEY INITIALLY CLAWED BACK AS INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED by All Plaintiffs. by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit C-2, #7 Exhibit C-3, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I) (Cherry, Steven)
September 22, 2017 Filing 407 REDACTED VERSION of #239 Sealed Document - Other,,,,,,,,, by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q) (Cherry, Steven)
September 22, 2017 Filing 406 REDACTED VERSION of #235 SEALED MOTION BY DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, AUTO DEALER PLAINTIFFS, AND FORD MOTOR CO. TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF TRANSACTIONAL DATA by All Plaintiffs. by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17) (Cherry, Steven)
August 22, 2017 Filing 405 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin A. Glavich on behalf of TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Glavich, Erin)
August 11, 2017 Attorney Paul A. Sand is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. (Raiter, Shawn)
July 31, 2017 Filing 404 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary D. Trotter on behalf of Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Trotter, Zachary)
June 22, 2017 Attorney Kurt G. Kastorf is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Departure from WilmerHale. (Kastorf, Kurt)
June 13, 2017 Filing 403 NOTICE by Wire Harness - Lead Case NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Spector, Eugene)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY Attorney Alan S. Miller terminated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER GRANTING #395 MOTION TO SEAL (IN WHOLE OR IN PART) CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (REFER TO IMAGE FOR IMPORTANT DETAILS REGARDING FILING REDACTED DOCUMENTS) (KDoa)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #391 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Christopher C. Yook filed by G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc.., Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
April 19, 2017 Attorney Kevin Lownds is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Departure from WilmerHale. (Lownds, Kevin)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER DENYING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DAILY TRANSACTIONAL DATA AND DENYING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS re #365 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Sealed Motion. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master (KDoa)
March 23, 2017 Minute Entry Miscellaneous Hearing held on 3/23/2017 before Gene J. Esshaki, Master Re: #365 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Sealed Motion (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (KDoa)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE IN PART #388 DELPHIS OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPELDELPHIS COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA AND DENYING DELPHIS MOTION TO QUASH GRUBER DEPOSITION SUBPOENA Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
March 16, 2017 Filing 398 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR: Miscellaneous Hearing regarding doc. #365 set for 3/23/2017 09:30 AM before Gene J. Esshaki, Master (KDoa)
March 6, 2017 Filing 397 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Miscellaneous Hearing regarding Delphi's Transactional Data Production (ECF No. 365) set for 3/23/2017 09:30 AM before Gene J. Esshaki, Master (REFER TO IMAGE FOR DETAILS) (KDoa)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #394 MOTION to Withdraw #393 MOTION To Take NTN Depositions in Japan (Unopposed) filed by Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., South Star Corporation, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER Withdrawing Appearance of Counsel - Courtney E. Torres. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
January 26, 2017 Filing 395 MOTION to Seal (In Whole Or In Part) Certain Documents Previously Filed Under Seal by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
January 24, 2017 Filing 394 MOTION to Withdraw #393 MOTION To Take NTN Depositions in Japan (Unopposed) by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.(12-101; 12-10336), Cesar-Scott, Inc.(12-101; 12-10177), Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation(12-101; 12-11165). (Fink, David)
January 24, 2017 Filing 393 MOTION To Take NTN Depositions in Japan (Unopposed) by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation(12-101; 12-11165). (Fink, David)
January 19, 2017 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. LaRocca on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (LaRocca, Robert)
November 16, 2016 Filing 391 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Christopher C. Yook by G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc.. (Yook, Christopher)
November 14, 2016 Filing 390 REPLY to #389 Response (Free), #388 Objection by Delphi Automotive System, LLC. (Papelian, Joseph)
November 8, 2016 Filing 389 RESPONSE to #388 Objection The Furukawa Defendants' Opposition to Delphi's Objections to Special Master's Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena and Denying Delphi's Motion to Quash Gruber Deposition Subpoena by American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Gangnes, Larry)
November 1, 2016 Filing 388 OBJECTION to #386 Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Quash by Delphi Automotive System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Papelian, Joseph)
October 28, 2016 Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by William Shotzbarger on behalf of Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs. (Shotzbarger, William)
October 24, 2016 Filing 386 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS [370 and 371] MOTION TO COMPEL DELPHIS COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA AND DENYING DELPHIS #377 MOTION TO QUASH GRUBER DEPOSITION SUBPOENA. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master (KDoa)
September 21, 2016 Attorney Edward E. McNally is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer involved in this matter. (McNally, Edward)
September 21, 2016 Attorney Sarah G. Leivick is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer involved in this matter. (Leivick, Sarah)
September 21, 2016 Attorney Robert W. Bosslet is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer involved in this matter. (Bosslet, Robert)
September 21, 2016 Attorney Eric J. Pelton is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer involved in this case. (Pelton, Eric)
September 21, 2016 Attorney Hector Torres is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer involved in this matter. (Torres, Hector)
September 15, 2016 Filing 385 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Jonathan W. Cuneo on behalf of Dealership Plaintiffs. (Cuneo, Jonathan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 384 REPLY to Response re #377 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena filed by Delphi Automotive System, LLC. (Papelian, Joseph)
September 8, 2016 Filing 383 DECLARATION by Larry S. Gangnes re #382 Response to Motion, filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Gangnes, Larry)
September 8, 2016 Filing 382 RESPONSE to #377 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena of Doug Gruber filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Gangnes, Larry)
September 6, 2016 Filing 381 REPLY to Response re #371 MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena, #370 SEALED MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotiv Reply Brief in Support of Certain Defendants' Motion to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Gangnes, Larry)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO SPECIAL MASTER re #377 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena filed by Delphi Automotive System, LLC. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
August 31, 2016 Filing 379 NOTICE OF HEARING on #377 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2016 10:00 AM before Gene J. Esshaki, Master (Judge Battani's Courtroom) (KDoa)
August 30, 2016 Filing 378 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on #370 SEALED MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotiv, #371 MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2016 10:00 AM before Gene J. Esshaki, Master (Judge Battani's Courtroom) (KDoa)
August 29, 2016 Filing 377 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena by Delphi Automotive System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Papelian, Joseph)
August 29, 2016 Filing 376 RESPONSE to #371 MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena filed by Delphi Automotive System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Papelian, Joseph)
August 26, 2016 Filing 375 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph E. Papelian appearing on behalf of Delphi Automotive System, LLC (Papelian, Joseph)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO SPECIAL MASTER RE: #371 MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena filed by G.S. Electech, Inc., et al. AND #370 SEALED MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotiv filed by G.S. Electech, Inc., et al. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
August 12, 2016 Filing 373 DECLARATION by Larry S. Gangnes re #371 MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena, #370 SEALED MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotiv filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F [facesheetonly], #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Gangnes, Larry)
August 12, 2016 Filing 372 SEALED Sealed L. Gangnes Decl. and Sealed Exhibit F re #371 MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena, #370 SEALED MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotiv by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F) (Gangnes, Larry)
August 12, 2016 Filing 371 MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance with Subpoena by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Gangnes, Larry)
August 12, 2016 Filing 370 SEALED MOTION to Compel Delphi's Compliance by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Gangnes, Larry)
August 12, 2016 Attorney Jamie J. Janisch is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: No longer with the Firm. (Janisch, Jamie)
August 11, 2016 Attorney Frances S Lewis is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: No longer associated with Susman Godfrey L.L.P. (Lewis, Frances)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting #367 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for An Order to Take Depositions in Japan.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
August 3, 2016 Filing 368 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF FRANCES S. LEWIS (Seltzer, Marc)
August 2, 2016 Filing 367 MOTION To Take Depositions in Japan (Unopposed) by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.(12-101; 12-10336), Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Fink, David)
July 26, 2016 Filing 366 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Courtney E. Torres appearing on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation (Torres, Courtney)
June 20, 2016 Filing 365 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DELPHIS [346 and 348] MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CERTAIN DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DELPHIS COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master. (KDoa)
June 9, 2016 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. Odette on behalf of Cesar-Scott, Inc.(12-101; 12-10177), Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., Technical Aids to Independence, Inc., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Odette, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #340 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Katherine M. Robison filed by Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
June 3, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly K. McGinley on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (McGinley, Molly)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #361 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
May 24, 2016 Filing 361 MOTION to Amend/Correct #355 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Unopposed) by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.(12-101; 12-10336), Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Fink, David)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE ( Motion for Certification due 3/3/17; Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses Available for Deposition 3/24/17; Response due by 6/28/2017, Defendants' Expert Witnesses Available for Deposition 7/19/17; Reply due by 10/26/2017, Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2017 10:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani) Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
May 10, 2016 Filing 359 NOTICE of Appearance by Frances S Lewis on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Lewis, Frances)
May 10, 2016 Filing 358 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in by Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs in Certain Defendants Opposition to Delphi Automotive Systems, LLCs Motion for Protective Order and Cross-Motion to Compel Delphi Connection Systems US, Inc.s and Delphi Automotive Systems, LLCs Compliance with Subpoenas (Parks, J.)
May 10, 2016 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Manly Parks on behalf of Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs. (Parks, J.)
May 3, 2016 Filing 356 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erin Lindsay Calkins appearing on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs (Calkins, Erin)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER GRANTING #354 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
April 28, 2016 Filing 354 MOTION to Amend/Correct #343 Order on Motion - Free (Unopposed) by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.(12-101; 12-10336), Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Fink, David)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS (346 AND 348) TO SPECIAL MASTER: #348 SEALED MOTION to Compel and Objection to Delphi's Motion for Protective Order by American Furukawa, Inc, et al AND #346 MOTION to Compel REDACTED OPPOSITION TO DELPHI MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL filed by G.S. Electech, et al. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
April 14, 2016 Filing 352 REPLY to Response re #348 SEALED MOTION to Compel and Objection to Delphi's Motion for Protective Order by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America,, #346 MOTION to Compel REDACTED OPPOSITION TO DELPHI MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Gangnes, Larry)
April 12, 2016 Filing 351 NOTICE of Appearance by Jetta C. Sandin on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc.. (Sandin, Jetta)
April 7, 2016 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan M. Cihlar - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Cihlar - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Nathan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 349 SEALED Declaration of L. Gangnes ISO Objection and Motion to Compel re #348 SEALED MOTION to Compel and Objection to Delphi's Motion for Protective Order by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Gangnes, Larry)
March 31, 2016 Filing 348 SEALED MOTION to Compel and Objection to Delphi's Motion for Protective Order by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Gangnes, Larry) Modified on 4/27/2016 (KDoa).
March 31, 2016 Filing 347 DECLARATION by Larry S. Gangnes re #346 MOTION to Compel REDACTED OPPOSITION TO DELPHI MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C, #2 Exhibit D through F, #3 Exhibit G through J, #4 Exhibit K through N, #5 Exhibit O through R, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T through W) (Gangnes, Larry)
March 31, 2016 Filing 346 MOTION to Compel REDACTED OPPOSITION TO DELPHI MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Gangnes, Larry)
March 30, 2016 Filing 345 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Brass on behalf of Mitsuba Corporation, American Mitsuba Corporation. (Brass, Rachel)
March 22, 2016 Filing 344 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Craig W. Hillwig appearing on behalf of Martinez Manufacturing, Inc. (Hillwig, Craig)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #342 Motion (ORDER/NOTICE TO ANY CONSUL OR VICE CONSUL OF THE UNITED STATES,UNITED STATES CONSULATE OSAKA-KOBE, JAPAN). Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
March 17, 2016 Filing 342 MOTION To Take Depositions in Japan (Unopposed) by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.(12-101; 12-10336), Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated(12-101; 11-15553), Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Fink, David)
March 17, 2016 Attorney Adam T. Schnatz is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. (Schnatz, Adam)
March 16, 2016 Filing 341 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Joseph Smith on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (Smith, Brian)
March 3, 2016 Filing 340 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Katherine M. Robison by Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Havstad, Megan)
March 2, 2016 Filing 339 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Brenha - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd.. (Brenha - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Christina)
February 23, 2016 Filing 338 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Krista M. Hosmer appearing on behalf of Dealership Plaintiffs (Hosmer, Krista)
February 19, 2016 Attorney Laura C. Taylor - NOT SWORN is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: No longer at firm. (Taylor - NOT SWORN, Laura)
February 16, 2016 Filing 337 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Fitzpatrick - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd.. (Fitzpatrick - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Elizabeth)
February 15, 2016 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Fine - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd.. (Fine - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Stephanie)
February 1, 2016 Filing 335 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Lownds on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Lownds, Kevin)
January 22, 2016 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Chapin on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Chapin, Benjamin)
January 19, 2016 Attorney Joshua S. Press is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: I no longer represent this client and now work for the U.S. Department of Justice. (Press, Joshua)
January 8, 2016 Filing 333 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Hugh Merber on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Merber, Kenneth)
January 8, 2016 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by April Williams - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Williams - MDL NOT ADMITTED, April)
November 25, 2015 Filing 331 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher C. Yook appearing on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc. (Yook, Christopher)
November 18, 2015 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlyn Huffstutter - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Huffstutter - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Caitlyn)
November 6, 2015 Attorney Thomas E. Bejin is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Defendant dismissed. (Bejin, Thomas)
November 6, 2015 Attorney Charles A. Bieneman is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Defendant dismissed. (Bieneman, Charles)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER WITHDRAWING APPEARANCE of Kathleen M. Clair. THE OFFICE OF KATHLEEN M. CLAIR IS DIRECTED TO REMOVE ATTORNEY CLAIR FROM CASES LISTED IN THE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
October 16, 2015 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara J Payne - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Payne - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Sara)
October 14, 2015 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle J Looby - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Looby - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Michelle)
September 21, 2015 Filing 326 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Michael A. Rubin on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd.. (Rubin, Michael)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER DENYING WIRE HARNESS DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION TO MODIFY MASTER ESSHAKIS JUNE 18, 2015 ORDER AND DENYING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION TO MODIFY, MASTER ESSHAKIS JUNE 18, 2015 - Denying #306 Sealed Motion; denying #307 Motion. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
September 16, 2015 Filing 324 NOTICE by K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. of Change of Firm Affiliation as to Rachel T. Osborn (Osborn, Rachel)
September 14, 2015 Attorney Brendan H. Frey is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: withdrawal order entered. (Frey, Brendan)
September 3, 2015 Filing 323 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexander E. Blum appearing on behalf of Dealership Plaintiffs (Blum, Alexander)
August 25, 2015 Attorney David F. Hansma is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer with Firm representing Auto Dealer Plaintiffs. (Hansma, David)
August 25, 2015 Attorney Joshua Paul Lushnat is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Departure from Mantese Honigman, PC. (Lushnat, Joshua)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #319 Motion. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
August 3, 2015 Filing 321 NOTICE by K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. of Change of Firm Affiliation as to David D. Cross (Cross, David)
July 17, 2015 Filing 320 NOTICE by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd. re #315 Order (Notice of Objections to End Payor Plaintiff and Auto Dealer Plaintiff Deposition Protocol Order) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
July 17, 2015 Filing 319 MOTION for relief from obligation to specify local counsel by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Wawro, David)
July 6, 2015 Filing 318 REPLY to Response re #306 SEALED MOTION to Modify, and Objections to, Master Esshaki's June 18, 2015 Order by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International Amer filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
July 2, 2015 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by David W.R. Wawro on behalf of Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Wawro, David)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 SCHEDULING ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTIONS TO MODIFY MASTER ESSHAKI'S JUNE 19, 2015 ORDER - #309 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - MOOT ( ARGUMENT ON OBJECTIONS set for 9/9/2015 10:00 AM (after the status conference has been concluded) before District Judge Marianne O. Battani) Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
June 30, 2015 Filing 315 WIRE HARNESS DEPOSITION PROTOCOL ORDER. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master (KDoa)
June 30, 2015 Filing 314 RESPONSE to #307 MOTION to Modify, and Objections to, Master Esshaki's June 18, 2015 Order [REDACTED VERSION], #306 SEALED MOTION to Modify, and Objections to, Master Esshaki's June 18, 2015 Order by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International Amer filed by Dealership Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Cuneo, Jonathan)
June 29, 2015 Filing 313 SEALED RESPONSE re #307 Motion,,,,,,,,,, #306 Sealed Motion,,,,, by Dealership Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Cuneo, Jonathan)
June 29, 2015 Filing 312 RESPONSE to #306 SEALED MOTION to Modify, and Objections to, Master Esshaki's June 18, 2015 Order by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International Amer, #307 MOTION to Modify, and Objections to, Master Esshaki's June 18, 2015 Order [REDACTED VERSION] filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven)
June 28, 2015 Filing 311 NOTICE by Tony Maravilla (Terrell - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Reginald)
June 26, 2015 Filing 310 RESPONSE to #309 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motions to Modify the Master's Rulings (EXPEDITED) filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Email from S. Williams to M. Sullivan Regarding Meet and Confer) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
June 25, 2015 Filing 309 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motions to Modify the Master's Rulings (EXPEDITED) by End-Payor Plaintiffs, Dealership Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Mantese, Gerard)
June 23, 2015 Filing 308 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Objections to, and Motions to Modify, Master Esshaki's June 18, 2015 Order by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
June 19, 2015 Filing 307 MOTION to Modify, and Objections to, Master Esshaki's June 18, 2015 Order [REDACTED VERSION] by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Defendants Position Statement Regarding Disputed Provisions Contained in the Parties Proposed Deposition Protocol, #3 Exhibit B - Joint Statement of Plaintiffs and Defendants Regarding Proposed Deposition Protocol, attaching Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Their Positions Regarding Disputed Deposition Protocol Provisions, #5 Exhibit D - Selected Pages from Transcript of January 28, 2015 Status Conference, #6 Exhibit E - Selected Pages from Transcript of May 6 Status Conference, #7 Exhibit F - Selected Pages from Transcript of May 6, 2015 Hearing Regarding Deposition Protocol, #8 Exhibit G - Selected Pages from Transcript of May 26 Telephone Conference, #9 Exhibit H - Selected Pages from Transcript of October 8, 2014 Status Conference, #10 Exhibit I - Dealership Plaintiffs Responses to Sumitomos First Set of Interrogatories, dated November 4, 2013 (filed under seal), #11 Exhibit J - April 19, 2015 Declaration of Allen T. Levenson (filed under seal), #12 Exhibit K - Selected Documents Produced by Auto Dealer Plaintiffs (filed under seal), #13 Exhibit L - June 19, 2015 Declaration of Dr. Edward A. Snyder with Attached Exhibit A (filed under seal), #14 Exhibit M - June 12, 2015 Email from V. Romanenko to S. Cherry, et al. regarding Dealer Plaintiffs Production (filed under seal), #15 Exhibit N - June 12, 2015 Letter from M. Sullivan to Auto Dealer Plaintiffs Counsel Regarding Deficiencies in Document Productions (filed under seal), #16 Exhibit O - Complaint, Federal Trade Commission v. Ramey Motors, Inc., 1:14-cv-29603, ECF No. 1 at 21-28, 30-32 (D.W.V. Dec. 11, 2014)) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
June 19, 2015 Filing 306 SEALED MOTION to Modify, and Objections to, Master Esshaki's June 18, 2015 Order by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit I - Dealership Plaintiffs Responses to Sumitomos First Set of Interrogatories, dated November 4, 2013, #3 Exhibit J - April 19, 2015 Declaration of Allen T. Levenson, #4 Exhibit K - Selected Documents Produced by Auto Dealer Plaintiffs, #5 Exhibit L - June 19, 2015 Declaration of Dr. Edward A. Snyder with Attached Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit M - June 12, 2015 Email from V. Romanenko to S. Cherry, et al. regarding Dealer Plaintiffs Production, #7 Exhibit N - June 12, 2015 Letter from M. Sullivan to Auto Dealer Plaintiffs Counsel Regarding Deficiencies in Document Productions) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
June 9, 2015 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Devon P. Allard on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Allard, Devon)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING NON-PARTY CDK GLOBALS MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master (KDoa)
May 27, 2015 Filing 303 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., Other Affiliate Motherson Sumi Systems, Ltd. for Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION #279 TO COMPEL THE SUMITOMO DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF THE DOCUMENTS THEY INITIALLY CLAWED BACK AS INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master. (KDoa)
May 19, 2015 Filing 301 OBJECTION to to Subpoena from Defendant Yazaki Corporation and Defendant Yazaki North America, Inc. by Grupo Antolin North America, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subpoena) (Hudson, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2015 Filing 300 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey L. Hudson appearing on behalf of Grupo Antolin North America, Incorporated (Hudson, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2015 Filing 299 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Tokai Rika Company, Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Toyota Motor Corporation for Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Klein, Sheldon)
May 5, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Ochoa on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Ochoa, Omar)
April 22, 2015 Filing 297 SECOND REVISED ORDER REGARDING SUBPOENA TO OEM. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master. (KDoa)
April 22, 2015 Filing 296 NOTICE of Correction re #295 Order. (KDoa)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SECOND REVISED ORDER REGARDING SUBPOENA TO OEM. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) (Main Document 295 replaced on 4/22/2015) (KDoa).
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ACCEPTING SERVICE OF AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - Chiyoda shall, as permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 12, answer, move, or otherwise respond on or before May 18, 2015 to the Complaint in the Action. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
April 17, 2015 Filing 293 SUR-REPLY re #273 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Ruling Regarding Depositions of Plaintiffs in Multiple Auto Parts Cases filed by Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cuneo, Jonathan)
April 17, 2015 Filing 292 SEALED Sur-Reply re #284 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,, by Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cuneo, Jonathan)
April 16, 2015 Filing 291 SEALED REPLY to Response re #279 Sealed Motion,,,, TO COMPEL THE SUMITOMO DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF DOCUMENTS THEY INITIALLY CLAWED BACK AS INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED by Ifeoma Adams, Jude Anheluk, Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Halley Ascher, Melissa Barron, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Lucha Bott, Curtis P. Boudreaux, Bradford Brewer, Gary Brock, Tenisha Burgos, CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.(12-101; 12-10336), Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Cesar-Scott, Inc., Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Jennifer Chase, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Zahira Crespo, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Sam Davis, Jr, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Alena Farrell, Findlay Industries, Inc., Jason Grala, Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Curtis Gunnerson, Paul Gustafson, Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Meredith Heller, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Gary Arthur Herr, John Hollingsworth, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Janes, John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Vickie Josefsberg, Carol Ann Kashishian, Richard W Keifer, Craig Kelly, Kelly Klosterman, Susan Lacava, Scott Lamson, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Estaban Maravilla, Tony Maravilla, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Ellis Winton McInnis, Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated(12-101; 11-15553), Joseph Muscara, Stacey R Nickell, Roger D. Olson, Susan B. Olson, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Cindy Prince, Scott M Quinn, RD Automotive, Inc., Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc., Janne Rice, Robert Rice, SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Darrel Senior, Meetesh Shah, Darcy Sherman, Margaret A Sirmon, South Star Corporation, South Star Corporation(12-101; 12-11165), Superstore Automotive, Inc, T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Kathleen Tawney, Jane M Taylor, Technical Aids to Independence, Inc., Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, Timberline Manufacturing Companpy, Michael Tracy, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Roseana Weatherwax, Westfield Dodge City, Inc., Michael Wick, Gretha Wilkerson, Tommy N. Wilson, Phillip G. Young. (Fink, David)
April 15, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Bright on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Bright, Thomas)
April 15, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Solomon B. Cera on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Cera, Solomon)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER GRANTING DEALERSHIP PLAINTIFFS MOTION #286 FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master (KDoa)
April 13, 2015 Filing 287 SEALED EXHIBIT re #286 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc.. (Cuneo, Jonathan)
April 13, 2015 Filing 286 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Zahira Crespo, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Cuneo, Jonathan)
April 9, 2015 Filing 285 SEALED RESPONSE re #279 Sealed Motion,,,, by K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc. Organization Chart, December 1, 2009, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of Daiske Yoshida, April 9, 2015, #4 Exhibit C- SUMI001460558, #5 Exhibit D- SUMI001492477, #6 Exhibit E- Sumitomo Defendants' Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit F- Special Master's Order Denying Motion of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs to Compel Hitachi to Produce Foreign Regulatory Documents, #8 Exhibit G- February 21, 2014 letter to Marguerite M. Sullivan from Michael Moskovitz, #9 Exhibit H- June 4, 2014 letter to Marguerite M. Sullivan and David D. Cross from Michael Moskovitz, #10 Exhibit I- April 1, 2015 letter to Steven Cherry from William Reiss) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
April 3, 2015 Filing 284 REPLY to Response re #273 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Ruling Regarding Depositions of Plaintiffs in Multiple Auto Parts Cases (CORRECTED) filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Joint Statement of Plaintiffs and Defendants Regarding Proposed Deposition Protocol, #3 Exhibit B- Selected Pages from Transcript of January 28, 2015 Status Conference, #4 Exhibit C-Certain Defendants' Motion to Establish Schedule for Auto Dealer Plaintiffs' Production of ESI Concerning Vehicle Purchases and Sales and Brief in Support, #5 Exhibit D-March 23, 2015 and March 25, 2015 emails between V. Romanenko and L. Gangnes regarding ESI Production) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
April 3, 2015 Filing 283 ERRATA Sheet re: #282 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,, filed by G.S. Electech, Inc., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated, K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, Denso Corporation, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd., Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., TRAM, Incorporated, Chiyoda USA Corporation, G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., American Furukawa, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Denso International America, Incorporated, Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Fujikura Ltd.. by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
April 2, 2015 Filing 282 REPLY to Response re #273 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Ruling Regarding Depositions of Plaintiffs in Multiple Auto Parts Cases filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Joint Statement of Plaintiffs and Defendants Regarding Proposed Deposition Protocol, #3 Exhibit B - Selected Pages from Transcript of January 28, 2015 Status Conference, #4 Exhibit C - Certain Defendants' Motion to Establish Schedule for Auto Dealer Plaintiffs' Production of ESI Concerning Vehicle Purchases and Sales and Brief in Support, #5 Exhibit D - March 23, 2015 and March 25, 2015 emails between V. Romanenko and L. Gangnes regarding ESI Production) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
April 2, 2015 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Shumaker on behalf of Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Shumaker, Michael)
March 23, 2015 Filing 279 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL THE SUMITOMO DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF DOCUMENTS THEY INITIALLY CLAWED BACK AS INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B-1. Redacted Japanese-Language Originals, # 3 Exhibit B-2. Redacted Informal Translations Prepared by Sumitomos Direction, # 4 Exhibit B-3. Certified Translations of Redacted Japanese Language Originals, # 5 Exhibit C-1. Redacted Japanese Language Originals, # 6 Exhibit C-2. Redacted Informal Translations Prepared by Sumitomos Direction, # 7 Exhibit C-3. Certified Translations Redacted Japanese Language Originals, # 8 Exhibit D. Privilege Log Produced by Sumitomo, # 9 Exhibit E. Amended Privilege Log, # 10 Exhibit F. Redacted Versions of Information Translations, Japanese Language Originals and Amended Privilege Logs, # 11 Exhibit G. Email from Sumitomos Counsel to Plaintiffs Counsel, # 12 Exhibit H. Transcript, # 13 Exhibit I. Press Release) (Fink, David)
March 20, 2015 Filing 278 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Harold G. Levison by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order) (Levison, Harold)
March 19, 2015 Filing 277 REVISED ORDER REGARDING SUBPOENA TO OEM. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER REGARDING SUBPOENA TO OEM. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master (KDoa)
March 19, 2015 Filing 275 RULING BY SPECIAL MASTER UPON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COURTS RULINGS REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFFS IN MULTI-AUTO PARTS CASES. Signed by Gene J. Esshaki, Special Master (KDoa)
March 9, 2015 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie J. Janisch on behalf of Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Janisch, Jamie)
March 6, 2015 Filing 273 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Ruling Regarding Depositions of Plaintiffs in Multiple Auto Parts Cases by American Furukawa, Inc., Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Joint Statement of Plaintiffs and Defendants Regarding Proposed Deposition Protocol, # 3 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Their Positions Regarding Disputed Deposition Protocol Provisions, # 4 Exhibit C - Defendants Position Statement Regarding Disputed Provisions, # 5 Exhibit D - Selected Pages from Transcript of October 8, 2014 Status Conference, # 6 Exhibit E - Selected Pages from Transcript of January 28, 2015 Status Conference) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
March 6, 2015 Filing 272 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Denso Corporation (Cherry, Steven)
March 6, 2015 Filing 271 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua Paul Lushnat appearing on behalf of Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc. (Lushnat, Joshua)
February 20, 2015 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D Hawkes [MDL - NOT ADMITTED] on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Hawkes [MDL - NOT ADMITTED], Peter)
February 18, 2015 Filing 269 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Chiyoda USA Corporation (Brady, Michael)
February 18, 2015 Filing 268 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation (Brady, Michael)
February 5, 2015 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Martinez on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (Martinez, Michael)
January 30, 2015 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary K. August on behalf of Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (August, Gary)
January 29, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Kowal on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (Kowal, Steven)
January 16, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren B. Salins on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (Salins, Lauren)
January 16, 2015 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren N. Norris on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (Norris, Lauren)
January 13, 2015 Filing 262 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Seth Orkand for on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Orkand, Seth)
January 12, 2015 Filing 261 MEMORANDUM REGARDING DEFENDANTS POSITIONS ON DISPUTED PROVISIONS CONTAINED IN THE PARTIES' PROPOSED DEPOSITION PROTOCOL by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants Deposition Protocol) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
January 12, 2015 Filing 260 MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR POSITIONS REGARDING DISPUTED DEPOSITION PROTOCOL PROVISIONS by Wire Harness - Lead Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order) (Williams, Steven)
January 12, 2015 Filing 259 MEMORANDUM JOINT MEMORANDUM OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS REGARDING PROPOSED DEPOSITION PROTOCOL (filed on behalf of all Parties) by K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Deposition Protocol) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
January 7, 2015 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Carome on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Carome, Patrick)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, DEADLINE FOR FILING ANSWERS, AND DISMISSAL OF SEPARATE ACTION. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
December 22, 2014 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Jansen on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (Jansen, William)
December 22, 2014 Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Fielder on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (Fielder, Amanda)
December 22, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Brady on behalf of Chiyoda Manufacturing Corporation, Chiyoda USA Corporation. (Brady, Michael)
December 18, 2014 Filing 253 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael S. Smith appearing on behalf of Cesar-Scott, Inc., Cesar-Scott, Inc.(12-101; 12-10177), Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc.(12-101; 11-15186), Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated(12-101; 11-15553), Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc.(12-101; 12-10201), South Star Corporation, South Star Corporation(12-101; 12-11165), T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., Technical Aids to Independence, Inc., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy (Smith, Michael)
November 25, 2014 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence J. Truax on behalf of Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Truax, Terrence)
November 25, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Sklarsky on behalf of Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Sklarsky, Charles)
November 25, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel A. Fuentes on behalf of Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Fuentes, Gabriel)
November 25, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Brody on behalf of Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc.. (Brody, Michael)
November 25, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Fenske on behalf of Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Fenske, Daniel)
November 4, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Press on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Press, Joshua)
October 24, 2014 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Kakinuki on behalf of Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc.. (Kakinuki, John)
October 17, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly N. Shaw - NOT SWORN on behalf of TRAM, Incorporated. (Shaw - NOT SWORN, Kimberly)
October 17, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly N. Shaw - NOT SWORN on behalf of TRMI, INC. (Shaw - NOT SWORN, Kimberly)[DOCKET ERROR-WRONG PARTY SELECTED-WILL REFILE CORRECTLY] Modified on 10/21/2014 (TMcg).
October 16, 2014 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrell W. Oxford on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Oxford, Terrell)
October 6, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E. Starling on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc.. (Starling, Jason)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINTS Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
July 31, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of withdrawal of # 235 SEALED MOTION BY DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, AUTO DEALER PLAINTIFFS, AND FORD MOTOR CO. TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF TRANSACTIONAL DATA by All Plaintiffs., # 234 MOTION to Compel Production of Transactional Data . (Fink, David)
July 25, 2014 Filing 239 SEALED Certain Defendants Memorandum Regarding Schedule for Class Certification re # 238 Statement,,,,,,,,,, by Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - SUMI000457478-81 (filed under seal), # 2 Exhibit C - SUMI000457423 (filed under seal), # 3 Exhibit D - SUMI000457383 (filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit E - DENS-CV000000095 (filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit F - DENS-CV000000086-92 (filed under seal), # 6 Exhibit G - YAZ-CORP-000000273 (filed under seal), # 7 Exhibit H - YAZ-CORP-000000223-225 (filed under seal), # 8 Exhibit I - FUR000177366 (filed under seal), # 9 Exhibit J - DENSO Corporations and DENSO International America, Inc.s Responses and Objections to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 10 Exhibit K - Defendants Fujikura Ltd. and Fujikura Automotive America LLCs Objections and Responses to the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 11 Exhibit L - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants and the Furukawa Defendants Objections and Answers Thereto Excerpts, October 8, 2014 (filed under seal), # 12 Exhibit M - Defendants G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems Inc. and G.S.W. Manufacturing Inc.'s Objections and Answers to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems Inc. and G.S.W. Manufacturing Inc. Excerpts, dated May 14, 2014 (filed under seal), # 13 Exhibit N - Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.s Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 14 Exhibit O - Responses and Objections of Defendant Yazaki Corporation to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 15 Exhibit P - Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc.s Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 16 Exhibit Q - Responses and Objections of Defendant Yazaki North America to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal)) (Cherry, Steven)
July 25, 2014 Filing 238 STATEMENT of Certain Defendants' Memorandum Regarding Class Certification by Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Transcript Excerpts of Status Conference, # 3 Exhibit B - SUMI000457478-81 (filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit C - SUMI000457423 (filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit D - SUMI000457383 (filed under seal), # 6 Exhibit E - DENS-CV000000095 (filed under seal), # 7 Exhibit F - DENS-CV000000086-92 (filed under seal), # 8 Exhibit G - YAZ-CORP-000000273 (filed under seal), # 9 Exhibit H - YAZ-CORP-000000223-225 (filed under seal), # 10 Exhibit I - FUR000177366 (filed under seal), # 11 Exhibit J - DENSO Corporations and DENSO International America, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 12 Exhibit K - Defendants Fujikura Ltd. and Fujikura Automotive America LLCs Objections and Responses to the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 13 Exhibit L - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants and the Furukawa Defendants Objections and Answers Thereto Excerpts, October 8, 2014 (filed under seal), # 14 Exhibit M - Defendants G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems Inc. and G.S.W. Manufacturing Inc.'s Objections and Answers to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems Inc. and G.S.W. Manufacturing Inc. Excerpts, dated May 14, 2014 (filed under seal), # 15 Exhibit N - Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.s Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 16 Exhibit O - Responses and Objections of Defendant Yazaki Corporation to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 17 Exhibit P - Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc.s Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 18 Exhibit Q - Responses and Objections of Defendant Yazaki North America to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants Excerpts, dated October 8, 2013 (filed under seal), # 19 Exhibit R - Transcript Excerpts of Status Conference) (Cherry, Steven)
July 18, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 235 SEALED MOTION BY DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, AUTO DEALER PLAINTIFFS, AND FORD MOTOR CO. TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF TRANSACTIONAL DATA by All Plaintiffs., # 234 MOTION to Compel Production of Transactional Data (Bressack, Darryl)
July 15, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Yifei Li on behalf of Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc.. (Li, Yifei)
July 14, 2014 Filing 235 SEALED MOTION BY DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, AUTO DEALER PLAINTIFFS, AND FORD MOTOR CO. TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF TRANSACTIONAL DATA by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Guilty Pleas in the Automotive Parts Industry (Companies), # 3 Exhibit 2 - Chart of Guilty Pleas in the Automotive Parts Industry (Executives), # 4 Exhibit 3 - SUMI001135398, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Responses and Objections of Defendant Yazaki Corporation to DPPs Interrogatories, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.s Objections and Responses to DPPs Interrogatories, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Furukawa Defendants Objections and Answers to DPPs Interrogatories, # 8 Exhibit 7 - SUMI000806826, # 9 Exhibit 8 - FUR000080531-T001, # 10 Exhibit 9 - FUR002686431, # 11 Exhibit 10 - SUMI000013140, # 12 Exhibit 11 - YC-HBUF-000242048, # 13 Exhibit 12 - YAZ-CORP-000000465, # 14 Exhibit 13 - SUMI000629979, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc.s Objections and Responses to DPPs Interrogatories, # 16 Exhibit 15 - FUR000191572-T001-T002, # 17 Exhibit 16 - YC-KASK-000000266, # 18 Exhibit 17 - SUMI001689112) (Fink, David)
July 14, 2014 Filing 234 MOTION to Compel Production of Transactional Data by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Guilty Pleas in the Automotive Parts Industry (Companies), # 3 Exhibit 2 - Chart of Guilty Pleas in the Automotive Parts Industry (Executives)) (Fink, David)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
July 1, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Marianne O. Battani: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2014 Re: # 231 Notice to Appear. Motions granted, counsel to prepare orders. (Court Reporter ROBERT L SMITH) (KDoa)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY PLAN Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (REFER TO IMAGE FOR IMPORTANT DETAILS) (KDoa)
June 24, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Notice of Hearing regarding pending motions (doc. no. 156 in 12-101; doc. no. 174 in 12-102; doc. no. 205 in 12-103; doc. no. 94 in 12-601; doc. no. 71 in 12-602; doc. no 81 in 12-603) set for 7/1/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. Objections must be filed on or before June 25, 2014. Replies must be filed on or before June 27, 2014. (KDoa)
June 20, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Kanchana Wangkeo Leung on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Leung, Kanchana)
June 9, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Lee Lang Talbot on behalf of K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Talbot, Rachel)
June 9, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Mary Clair on behalf of K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Clair, Kathleen)
June 9, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by David Daniel Cross on behalf of K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Cross, David)
May 30, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Orkand on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Orkand, Seth)
May 28, 2014 Filing 225 SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY PROVISIONS CONCERNING COORDINATION OF FORD ACTION WITH THE WIRE HARNESS CASES. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Approving Supplemental Discovery Plan. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
May 13, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Danielle Lipscomb-Jackson on behalf of Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Lipscomb-Jackson, Tiffany)
May 6, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel J Dominguez on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation. (Dominguez, Manuel)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting # 212 Motion to Withdraw # 213 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney James L. Kauffman James L. Kauffman, # 212 MOTION to Withdraw James L. Kauffman , # 220 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney James L. Kauffman James L. Kauffman, # 214 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney James L. Kauffman James L. Kauffman, # 218 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney James L. Kauffman James L. Kauffman ; granting # 213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting # 214 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting # 220 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
April 9, 2014 Filing 220 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney James L. Kauffman James L. Kauffman by Michael Tracy. (Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Peter)
April 9, 2014 Filing 219 [DOCKETING ERROR - ENTRY SHOULD NOT HAVE SPEAD] NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Davis on behalf of Valeo Climate Control Corp., Valeo Electrical Systems, Inc., Valeo Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Davis, Ryan) Modified on 4/9/2014 (SSch).
April 9, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney James L. Kauffman James L. Kauffman by Michael Tracy. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Peter)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Allowing Withdrawal of Attorney re # 215 Notice (Other) filed by American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited., Attorney Connor B. Shively terminated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
April 8, 2014 Filing 216 EXHIBIT of Proposed Order Allowing Withdrawal of Attorney re # 215 Notice (Other) by American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited (Gangnes, Larry)
April 8, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE by American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited of Withdrawal of Attorney Connor Shively (Gangnes, Larry)
April 8, 2014 Filing 214 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney James L. Kauffman James L. Kauffman by Michael Tracy. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Peter)
April 8, 2014 Filing 213 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney James L. Kauffman James L. Kauffman by Michael Tracy. (Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Peter)
April 8, 2014 Filing 212 MOTION to Withdraw James L. Kauffman by Michael Tracy. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Peter)
April 4, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Michael Tracy. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Peter)
April 4, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Michael Tracy. (Mougey - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Peter)
April 4, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Page Poerschke - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Michael Tracy. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Poerschke - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Page)
April 4, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Page Poerschke - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Michael Tracy. (Poerschke - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Page)
April 2, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Muecke - NOT SWORN, Manfred)
March 31, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Abrahams on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Abrahams, Douglas)
March 31, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Abrahams on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Abrahams, Douglas)
March 31, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Kohn on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Kohn, Joseph)
March 31, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Kohn on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Kohn, Joseph)
March 31, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Abrahams on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Abrahams, Douglas)
March 31, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Kohn on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Kohn, Joseph)
March 31, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Abrahams on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Abrahams, Douglas)
March 31, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Kohn on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Kohn, Joseph)
March 31, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Hoese on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Hoese, William)
March 31, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Hoese on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Hoese, William)
March 31, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Hoese on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Hoese, William)
March 28, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard B. Iwrey on behalf of Valeo Climate Control Corp., Valeo Electrical Systems, Inc., Valeo Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Iwrey, Howard)
March 28, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Hoese on behalf of TIFFIN MOTOR HOMES, INC.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Hoese, William)
March 26, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Dwayne D. Stresman for on behalf of Autoliv ASP, Incorporated, Autoliv B.V. & Co. KG, Autoliv Japan Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Incorporated, Calsonic Kansei Corporation, N.S. International, Ltd., NTN Corporation, NTN USA Corporation, Nippon Seiki Company, Limited, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, New Sabina Industries, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:12-md-02311-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00100-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00200-MOB-MKM, 2:12-cv-00300-MOB-MKM (Stresman, Dwayne)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER Concerning Coordination of Ford Action. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
February 5, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy C. Kelly on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Kelly, Cindy)
February 4, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna M. Horning Nygren on behalf of Cesar-Scott, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., Technical Aids to Independence, Inc., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Horning Nygren, Anna)
February 3, 2014 Filing 189 MEMORANDUM re # 187 Memorandum, # 185 Memorandum, # 186 Sealed Document - Other / Reply Memorandum of Ford Motor Company Regarding the Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan (REDACTED) by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3) (Torres, Hector)
February 3, 2014 Filing 188 SEALED Reply Memorandum of Ford Motor Company Regarding the Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan re # 185 Memorandum, # 187 Memorandum, # 186 Sealed Document - Other by Ford Motor Company. (Torres, Hector)
January 24, 2014 Filing 187 MEMORANDUM re # 185 Memorandum, Defendants' Response to Ford Motor Company's Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan and Supporting Memorandum by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Defendants' Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan, # 3 Exhibit B - Ford's Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan, # 4 Exhibit C - DOJ Press Release) (Majoras, John)
January 24, 2014 Filing 186 SEALED Defendants' Response to Ford Motor Company's Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan and Supporting Memorandum re # 185 Memorandum, by All Defendants. (Majoras, John)
January 10, 2014 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM of Ford Motor Company Regarding the Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan and the Proposed Supplemental Discovery Provisions Concerning Coordination of the Ford Action With the Wire Harness MDL by Ford Motor Company (Torres, Hector)
January 10, 2014 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM FUJIKURA LTD. AND FUJIKURA AUTOMOTIVE AMERICA LLC'S MEMORANDUM REGARDING THE PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY PROVISIONS CONCERNING COORDINATION OF FORD ACTION WITH THE WIRE HARNESS MDL by Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A) (Cooper, James)
January 10, 2014 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM JOINT MEMORANDUM OF PROPOSED CLASS PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS REGARDING PROPOSED FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY PLAN (filed on behalf of all Parties) by Lear Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan (comparison), # 3 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan, # 4 Exhibit C - Defendants Proposed First Supplemental Discovery Plan) (Iwrey, Howard)
December 20, 2013 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan L. Havstad on behalf of Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Havstad, Megan)
November 12, 2013 Filing 181 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Donald M. Barnes on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc.. (Barnes, Donald)
November 6, 2013 Attorney Sonia K. Pfaffenroth - NOT SWORN terminated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
October 30, 2013 Filing 180 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by American Furukawa, Inc., FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited (Gangnes, Larry)
October 10, 2013 Filing 179 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jay L. Levine appearing on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc. (Levine, Jay)
September 19, 2013 Filing 178 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward E. McNally appearing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (McNally, Edward)
September 19, 2013 Filing 177 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert W. Bosslet appearing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Bosslet, Robert)
September 19, 2013 Filing 176 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sarah G. Leivick appearing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Leivick, Sarah)
September 19, 2013 Filing 175 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Harold G. Levison appearing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Levison, Harold)
September 19, 2013 Filing 174 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hector Torres appearing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Torres, Hector)
September 16, 2013 Filing 173 REPLY to # 167 Notice (Other), # 169 Objection, # 171 Response (Free), Reply of Plaintiff Ford motor Company in Further Support of Its Opposition to Stipulation and Agreement and Proposed Order by Ford Motor Company. (Pelton, Eric)
September 13, 2013 Filing 172 NOTICE OF CORRECTION (SEE CASE NO. 13-12061 Doc. #18) (BThe) (Main Document 172 replaced on 9/13/2013) (BThe). Modified on 9/13/2013 (BThe).
September 9, 2013 Filing 171 RESPONSE to # 169 Objection, Defendants Yazaki Corporation's and Yazaki North America's Response to Opposition of Ford Motor Company [Doc 169] to Stipulation and Agreement [Doc 167] by Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Majoras, John)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 OPINION AND ORDER denying # 142 Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal and for a Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
August 23, 2013 Filing 169 OBJECTION to # 167 Notice (Other), Opposition of Plaintiff Ford Motor Company to Stipulation and Agreement [Doc #167] and Proposed Order by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E) (Pelton, Eric)
August 15, 2013 Filing 168 REPLY to Response re # 142 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) AND FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL filed by Lear Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Memorandum from D. Van Erps to M. Peristeraki, July 19, 2013, # 3 Exhibit B - Motion and Brief of the United States to Intervene and for a Temporary and Limited Stay of Discovery, July 8, 2013 (Dkt. No. 556), # 4 Exhibit C - Sims v. First Horizon Nat. Corp., 2010 WL 1050976 (W.D. Tenn. 2010)) (Iwrey, Howard)
August 15, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE by Wire Harness - Lead Case of Submission of Stipulation and Agreement and Order with Respect to Depositions of Shigeru Ogawa, Hisamitsu Takada, Kazuhiko Kashimoto, Ryoji Kawai and Tsuneaki Hanamura (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation and Agreement, # 2 COS) (Hoese, William)
August 6, 2013 Attorney Stephanie K. Wood is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Withdrawn. (Wood, Stephanie)
August 2, 2013 Filing 166 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Stephanie K. Wood for on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Wood, Stephanie)
July 31, 2013 Filing 165 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joanne G. Swanson appearing on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC (Swanson, Joanne)
July 31, 2013 Filing 164 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fred K. Herrmann appearing on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC (Herrmann, Fred)
July 31, 2013 Filing 163 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew L. Powell appearing on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC (Powell, Matthew)
July 31, 2013 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Clemons - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd.. (Clemons - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Katherine)
July 31, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Rubin - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC, Fujikura Ltd.. (Rubin - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura C. Taylor - NOT SWORN on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC. (Taylor - NOT SWORN, Laura)
July 31, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Cooper on behalf of Fujikura Automotive America LLC. (Cooper, James)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting # 157 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
July 23, 2013 Filing 157 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Daniel Glad by K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Glad, Daniel)
July 22, 2013 Filing 156 RESPONSE to # 142 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) AND FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Unpublished Opinions) (Fink, David)
July 17, 2013 Filing 155 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard D. Bisio appearing on behalf of FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC. (Bisio, Richard)
July 17, 2013 Filing 154 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald S. Nixon appearing on behalf of FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC. (Nixon, Ronald)
July 13, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Molot on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Molot, David)
July 5, 2013 Filing 152 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Sonia K. Pfaffenroth - NOT SWORN for on behalf of Fujikura Ltd.. (Pfaffenroth - NOT SWORN, Sonia)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER and AGREEMENT REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (REFER TO IMAGE FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
June 28, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Smith on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Smith, Brian)
June 26, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Darin Sands - NOT SWORN on behalf of FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC.. (Sands - NOT SWORN, Darin)
June 26, 2013 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Masayuki Yamaguchi on behalf of FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC.. (Yamaguchi, Masayuki)
June 26, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig D. Bachman on behalf of FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC.. (Bachman, Craig)
June 26, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry S. Gangnes on behalf of FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC.. (Gangnes, Larry)
June 26, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Davis, II on behalf of FURUKAWA WIRING SYSTEMS AMERICA, INC.. (Davis, Kenneth)
June 25, 2013 Filing 144 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT Regarding Deadline for filing Answers (refer to image for details). Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
June 22, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt G. Kastorf on behalf of Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Kastorf, Kurt)
June 20, 2013 Filing 142 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) AND FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL by Lear Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Opinion and Order entered on June 6, 2013, # 3 Exhibit B - Agenda for the March 13, 2013 Status Conference, # 4 Exhibit C - Unpublished Opinions Cited in Brief) (Marovitz, Andrew)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Tram, Inc., and Tokai Rika Co., LTD's Motion to Dismiss All Actions (See Doc. 231 in 12-02311). Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Lear Corporation's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (See Doc. 237 in 12-02311). Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
May 6, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Saveri - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of South Star Corporation. (Saveri - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Lisa)
May 2, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by William Heye - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of South Star Corporation. (Heye - MDL NOT ADMITTED, William)
May 2, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Saveri - NOT SWORN on behalf of South Star Corporation. (Saveri - NOT SWORN, Richard)
April 16, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvie K. Kern - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of John Hollingsworth. (Kern - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Sylvie)
April 10, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC, Lear Corporation, Leoni AG, Leoni Kabel GmbH, Leoni Wire Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH, Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated of New Authority (Attachments: # 1 In re: Refrigerant Compressors Antitrust Litigation) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
March 28, 2013 Filing 134 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John A. VanOphem appearing on behalf of S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH (VanOphem, John)
March 27, 2013 Filing 133 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH identifying Other Affiliate Continental AG for S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH. (VanOphem, John)
March 25, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Bisio on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Bisio, Richard)
March 25, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S. Nixon on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Nixon, Ronald)
March 8, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE by Wire Harness - Lead Case 12-cv-00100 All Wire Harness cases (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation and Agreement, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Hoese, William)
February 19, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE by American Furukawa, Inc., Denso Corpoation, Denso International America, Incorporated, Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Ltd., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited, K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC, Lear Corporation, Leoni AG, Leoni Kabel, Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc., S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH, Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd., TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd., Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated of New Authority (Attachments: # 1 National ATM Council, Inc. v. Visa, Inc.) (Sullivan, Marguerite)
February 13, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Kauffman on behalf of Michael Tracy. (Kauffman, James)
February 6, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE by Wire Harness - Lead Case of Change of Firm Affiliation (Salzman, Hollis)
February 6, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE by Wire Harness - Lead Case of Change of Firm Affiliation (Persky, Bernard)
February 6, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE by Wire Harness - Lead Case of Change of Firm Affiliation (Reiss, William)
February 5, 2013 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Sand - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Superstore Automotive, Inc. (Sand - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Paul)
January 24, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Brian P. Murray on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Murray, Brian)
December 4, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by End-Payor Plaintiffs (Williams, Steven)
November 30, 2012 Filing 121 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Dianne M. Nast - NOT SWORN on behalf of Gary Brock. (Nast - NOT SWORN, Dianne)
November 28, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Crabtree on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc.. (Crabtree, Molly)
November 28, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by John Monica, Jr on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc.. (Monica, John)
November 28, 2012 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Karri Allen - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc.. (Allen - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Karri)
November 28, 2012 Filing 117 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc. (Barnes, Donald)
November 28, 2012 Filing 116 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by G.S. Electech, Inc. (Barnes, Donald)
November 28, 2012 Filing 115 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc. (Barnes, Donald)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Preservation of Documents, Electronically Stored Information, and other Tangible Items. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
November 14, 2012 Filing 113 AMENDED NOTICE of MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (see document numbers 230, 229, 231, 234, 237, 239 and 358 previously filed in 12-02311; and document number 61 previously filed in 12-00102; and document number 72 previously filed in 12-00103. (REFER TO IMAGE FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (CMot)
November 14, 2012 Filing 112 AMENDED NOTICE of MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (see document numbers 228, 229, 231, 234, 239, 237 and 235 previously filed in 12-02311) (REFER TO IMAGE FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS.) (CMot)
November 8, 2012 Filing 111 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joanne G. Swanson appearing on behalf of Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Ltd. (Swanson, Joanne)
November 8, 2012 Filing 110 NOTICE of MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (see document numbers 230, 229, 231, 234, 239, 358 previously filed in 12-02311 and document number 61 previously filed in 12-00102 and document number 72 previously filed in 12-00103) (REFER TO IMAGE FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (CMot)
November 8, 2012 Filing 109 NOTICE of MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (see document numbers 228, 229, 231, 234, 239 and 237 previously filed in 12-02311)(REFER TO IMAGE FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (CMot)
November 2, 2012 Filing 108 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH identifying Other Affiliate Continental AG for S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH. (Bieneman, Charles)
November 1, 2012 Filing 107 Notice of E-mail Delivery Failure as to attorney Elizabeth A. Favaro. Bounced NEF for # 106 Attorney Appearance. (KCla)
October 29, 2012 Filing 106 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Scott D. Gilchrist - NOT SWORN appearing on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation (Appearance for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs) (Gilchrist - NOT SWORN, Scott)
October 26, 2012 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM Reply Brief in Support of Defendants TRAM, Inc. and Tokai Rika Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss All Actions (12-md-02311 Doc #231, Doc #387, Doc #381) by TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd. (Klein, Sheldon)
October 26, 2012 Filing 104 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Leoni Wire Inc. (Turco, Michael)
October 26, 2012 Filing 103 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc. (Turco, Michael)
October 26, 2012 Filing 102 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Leonische Holding, Inc. (Turco, Michael)
October 26, 2012 Filing 101 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Leoni Kabel GmbH (Turco, Michael)
October 26, 2012 Filing 100 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Leoni AG (Turco, Michael)
October 25, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2012 Attorney Brian D. Herrington is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Do not represent Plaintiff. (BThe)
October 24, 2012 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Wall on behalf of K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Wall, Daniel)
October 24, 2012 Filing 97 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason J. Thompson appearing on behalf of Cesar-Scott, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation, Technical Aids to Independence, Inc., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy (Thompson, Jason)
October 23, 2012 Filing 96 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lance C. Young appearing on behalf of Cesar-Scott, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation, Timberline Manufacturing Companpy, Technical Aids to Independence, Inc. (Young, Lance)
October 18, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Jennifer Chase, Curtis Gunnerson, Kelly Klosterman, Roger D. Olson, Susan B. Olson, Darrel Senior, Phillip G. Young. (Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Craig)
October 16, 2012 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Kilene - NOT SWORN on behalf of RD Automotive, Inc., Darcy Sherman. (Kilene - NOT SWORN, Jason) Modified on 10/16/2012 (DTyl)[PER HELP DESK CALL APPEARANCE SHOULD BE FOR DARCY SHERMAN ONLY]
October 16, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Gustafson on behalf of RD Automotive, Inc., Darcy Sherman. (Gustafson, Daniel) Modified on 10/16/2012 (DTyl)[PER HELP DESK CALL APPEARANCE SHOULD BE FOR DARCY SHERMAN ONLY]
October 12, 2012 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Bejin on behalf of S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH. (Bejin, Thomas)
October 12, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Bieneman on behalf of S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH. (Bieneman, Charles)
October 9, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Fanelli on behalf of S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH. (Fanelli, Michael)
October 9, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita F. Stork - NOT SWORN on behalf of S-Y Systems Technologies, GmbH. (Stork - NOT SWORN, Anita)
October 9, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation. (Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M Jagher on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation. (Jagher, Jonathan)
October 9, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by William Caldes on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation. (Caldes, William)
October 9, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene A. Spector on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation. (Spector, Eugene)
October 9, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore A. Romano on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc.. (Romano, Salvatore)
October 9, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Barnes on behalf of G.S. Electech, Inc., G.S.W. Manufacturing, Inc., G.S. Wiring Systems, Inc.. (Barnes, Donald)
October 3, 2012 Filing 82 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael E. Moskovitz appearing on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation (Moskovitz, Michael)
October 3, 2012 Filing 81 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael L. Silverman appearing on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation (Silverman, Michael)
October 3, 2012 Filing 80 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William H. London appearing on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation (London, William)
October 3, 2012 Filing 79 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven A. Kanner appearing on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Findlay Industries, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation (Kanner, Steven)
October 2, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor B. Shively on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Shively, Connor)
September 28, 2012 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvie K. Kern - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of John Hollingsworth. (Kern - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Sylvie)
September 28, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Joshua R. Carver - NOT SWORN by Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.. (Carver - NOT SWORN, Joshua)
September 28, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. of withdrawal of # 74 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Joshua R. Carver . (Carver - NOT SWORN, Joshua)
September 28, 2012 Filing 74 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Joshua R. Carver by CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, T.M. MORRIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.. (Carver - NOT SWORN, Joshua)
September 27, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Jennifer Chase, Curtis Gunnerson, Kelly Klosterman, Roger D. Olson, Susan B. Olson, Darrel Senior, Phillip G. Young. (Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Christopher)
September 27, 2012 Filing 72 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Denso Corpoation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service) (Cherry, Steven)
September 27, 2012 Filing 71 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Denso International America, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service) (Cherry, Steven)
September 26, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Zarowny on behalf of Denso International America, Incorporated. (Zarowny, Steven)
September 26, 2012 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry S. Gangnes on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Gangnes, Larry)
September 26, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Darin Sands - NOT SWORN on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Sands - NOT SWORN, Darin)
September 26, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Masayuki Yamaguchi on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Yamaguchi, Masayuki)
September 26, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie K. Wood on behalf of Denso Corpoation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Wood, Stephanie)
September 26, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig D. Bachman on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Bachman, Craig)
September 26, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Davis, II on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Davis, Kenneth)
September 26, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A. Strother - NOT SWORN on behalf of Cesar-Scott, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Strother - NOT SWORN, Julie)
September 26, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Joseph Bruckner on behalf of Cesar-Scott, Inc., Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., Timberline Manufacturing Companpy. (Bruckner, W.)
September 26, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Donovan on behalf of Denso Corpoation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Donovan, David)
September 26, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Cherry on behalf of Denso Corpoation, Denso International America, Incorporated. (Cherry, Steven)
September 24, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Turco on behalf of Leoni AG, Leoni Kabel GmbH, Leoni Wire Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Turco, Michael)
September 21, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon L. Miller on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Miller, Sheldon)
September 21, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall B. Weill on behalf of CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC., Cesar-Scott, Inc., Martinez Manufacturing, Inc., Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated, Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc., South Star Corporation, Findlay Industries, Inc.. (Weill, Randall)
September 19, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Atleen Kaur by Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Kaur, Atleen)
September 19, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Davidow - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc.. (Davidow - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Joel)
September 19, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Cuneo on behalf of Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc.. (Cuneo, Jonathan)
September 19, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Romanenko - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Westfield Dodge City, Inc., V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Green Team of Clay Center Inc., McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Table Rock Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Todd Archer Hyundai, Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki, Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Bonneville and Son, Inc., Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., Pitre, Inc., d/b/a Pitre Buick GMC, Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, SLT Group II, Inc., d/b/a Planet Nissan Subaru of Flagstaff, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonwealth Kia, Commonwealth Honda, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen, Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan, Ramey Motors, Inc., Thornhill Superstore, Inc., d/b/a Thornhill GM Superstore, Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC, Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota, Beck Motors, Inc.. (Romanenko - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Victoria)
September 17, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Favaro on behalf of K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Favaro, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Horton on behalf of K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Horton, William)
September 17, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Sklaver - NOT SWORN on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Sklaver - NOT SWORN, Steven)
September 17, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc M. Seltzer - NOT SWORN on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Seltzer - NOT SWORN, Marc)
September 14, 2012 Filing 48 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William A. Sankbeil appearing on behalf of Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Ltd. (Sankbeil, William)
September 14, 2012 Filing 47 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew L. Powell appearing on behalf of Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Ltd. (Powell, Matthew)
September 14, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Hansma on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Hansma, David)
September 14, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. DuMouchel on behalf of TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (DuMouchel, David)
September 14, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Todd Miller on behalf of TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Miller, W.)
September 14, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Donnini on behalf of Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Donnini, George)
September 14, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon H. Klein on behalf of TRAM, Incorporated, Tokai Rika Company, Ltd.. (Klein, Sheldon)
September 14, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Donnini on behalf of TRAM, Incorporated. (Donnini, George)
September 13, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Don Barrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barrett, Don)
September 13, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan H. Frey on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Frey, Brendan)
September 13, 2012 Filing 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Shawn M. Raiter appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Automobile Dealer Plaintiffs) (Raiter, Shawn)
September 13, 2012 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Automobile Dealer Plaintiffs) (Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Charles)
September 13, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard V. Mantese on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Mantese, Gerard)
September 13, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE by Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC , NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Falkenstein on behalf of Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC. (Falkenstein, Peter)
September 12, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson L. Oliver on behalf of Darcy Sherman. (Oliver, Alyson)
September 12, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonia K. Pfaffenroth - NOT SWORN on behalf of Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Ltd.. (Pfaffenroth - NOT SWORN, Sonia)
September 12, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Cooper on behalf of Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Ltd.. (Cooper, James)
September 12, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura C. Taylor - NOT SWORN on behalf of Fujikura America, Incorporated, Fujikura Ltd.. (Taylor - NOT SWORN, Laura)
September 12, 2012 Filing 30 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited for Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 12, 2012 Filing 29 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited for Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 12, 2012 Filing 28 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited for Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc.. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 12, 2012 Filing 27 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited for Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc.. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 12, 2012 Filing 26 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 12, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Irwin M. Alterman on behalf of American Furukawa, Inc., Furukawa Electric Company, Limited. (Alterman, Irwin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 24 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K&S Wiring Systems, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited for K&S Wiring Systems, Inc.. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 12, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glad on behalf of K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Glad, Daniel)
September 12, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Marguerite M. Sullivan on behalf of K&S Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Industries, Limited, Sumitomo Electric Wintec America, Inc., Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems (U.S.A.) Inc., Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 12, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Sanders on behalf of Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC. (Sanders, William)
September 11, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren T. Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren)
September 11, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Persky on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Persky, Bernard)
September 11, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Robison - NOT SWORN on behalf of Leoni AG, Leoni Kabel GmbH, Leoni Wire Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Robison - NOT SWORN, Katherine)
September 11, 2012 Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Lear Corporation (Iwrey, Howard)
September 11, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marovitz on behalf of Lear Corporation. (Marovitz, Andrew)
September 11, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Hollis L Salzman - NOT SWORN on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Salzman - NOT SWORN, Hollis)
September 11, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN on behalf of Lear Corporation. (Miller - NOT SWORN, Britt)
September 11, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Tubach on behalf of Leoni AG, Leoni Kabel, Leoni Kabel GmbH, Leoni Wire Inc., Leoni Wiring Systems, Inc., Leonische Holding, Inc.. (Tubach, Michael)
September 11, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dante A. Stella on behalf of Lear Corporation. (Stella, Dante)
September 11, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Reiss - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Reiss - MDL NOT ADMITTED, William)
September 11, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard B. Iwrey on behalf of Lear Corporation. (Iwrey, Howard)
September 11, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Majoras on behalf of Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Majoras, John)
September 11, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle K. Fischer on behalf of Yazaki Corporation, Yazaki North America, Incorporated. (Fischer, Michelle)
September 11, 2012 Attorney Larry J. Saylor is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: No longer representing Denso. (Saylor, Larry)
September 10, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Cotchett - NOT SWORN on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Cotchett - NOT SWORN, Joseph)
September 10, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank C. Damrell on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Damrell, Frank)
September 10, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene Kim - NOT SWORN on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Kim - NOT SWORN, Gene)
September 10, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Zapala - NOT SWORN on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Zapala - NOT SWORN, Adam)
September 10, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N. Williams on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Williams, Steven)
September 10, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Powell Miller on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Miller, E.)
September 10, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam T. Schnatz on behalf of Wire Harness - Lead Case. (Schnatz, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wire Harness - Lead Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ifeoma Adams
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jude Anheluk
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Steve W. Berman - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Anthony D. Shapiro - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Anthony D. Shapiro
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archer-Perdue, Inc., d/b/a Archer-Perdue Suzuki
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halley Ascher
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Barron
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Adam C. Belsky - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Sarah Crowley - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Terry Gross
Represented By: Sarah Crowley
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Adam C. Belsky
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beck Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonneville and Son, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucha Bott
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Steve W. Berman - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Anthony D. Shapiro - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Anthony D. Shapiro
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis P. Boudreaux
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford Brewer
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Hugh P. Lambert
Represented By: Candice C. Sirmon - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Candice C. Sirmon
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Brock
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Kenneth K. Kilbert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenisha Burgos
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAFT-CO ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Joshua R. Carver - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Megan A. Sanders - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Michael L. Silverman
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Manuel J Dominguez
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Gregory P. Hansel
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Randall B. Weill
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Joshua R. Carver
Represented By: Megan A. Sanders
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: William Caldes
Represented By: William H. London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Dealerships, Inc., d/b/a Capitol Toyota
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Salt Lake Valley Buick GMC
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar-Scott, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Silverman
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Manuel J Dominguez
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: Julie A. Strother - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: Lance C. Young
Represented By: Anna M. Horning Nygren
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Randall B. Weill
Represented By: William H. London
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Odette
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: Michael S. Smith
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: William Caldes
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Chevrolet, Commonw
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chase
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Craig Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Anthony L. DeLuca
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti
Represented By: Craig Corbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth Nissan, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Nissan
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., d/b/a Commonwealth Volkswagen
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahira Crespo
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: John F. Nevares
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: Yifei Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Heather Corporation d/b/a Lakeland Toyota Honda Mazda Subaru
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Davis, Jr
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Hugh P. Lambert
Represented By: Candice C. Sirmon - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Candice C. Sirmon
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert European Motorcars, Ltd.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: End-Payor Plaintiffs
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Terrell W. Oxford
Represented By: Frances S Lewis
Represented By: Michelle J Looby
Represented By: Nathan M. Cihlar
Represented By: Sara J Payne
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Devon P. Allard
Represented By: Erin Lindsay Calkins
Represented By: Omar Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alena Farrell
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Findlay Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Silverman
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: William Caldes
Represented By: Manuel J Dominguez
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Randall B. Weill
Represented By: Michael S. Smith
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: William H. London
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida, State of
Represented By: Timothy Fraser
Represented By: Robert Scott Palmer
Represented By: Greg Slemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Robert W. Bosslet
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Cindy C. Kelly
Represented By: Sarah G. Leivick
Represented By: Kanchana Wangkeo Leung
Represented By: Harold G. Levison
Represented By: Edward E. McNally
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Eric J. Pelton
Represented By: Hector Torres
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Grala
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Team of Clay Center Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Gunnerson
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Craig Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Anthony L. DeLuca
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Craig Corbitt
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gustafson
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Mark J. Schirmer
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hammett Motor Company, Inc
Represented By: Brian D. Herrington
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: David M. McMullan - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: David M. McMullan
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Heller
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc., d/b/a Champion Chevrolet
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Yifei Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Arthur Herr
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hollingsworth
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Sylvie K. Kern - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Sylvie K. Kern
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Janes
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Hugh P. Lambert
Represented By: Candice C. Sirmon - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Candice C. Sirmon
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Yifei Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Josefsberg
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Leonard A. Davis - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Soren E. Gisleson - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Russ M. Herman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Stephen J. Herman - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Russ M. Herman
Represented By: Soren E. Gisleson
Represented By: Stephen J. Herman
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard
Represented By: Leonard A. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Kashishian
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: S. Thomas Wienner
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W Keifer
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Leonard A. Davis - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Soren E. Gisleson - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Russ M. Herman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Stephen J. Herman - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Ria C. Momblanco - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Ria C. Momblanco
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Leonard A. Davis
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Represented By: Russ M. Herman
Represented By: Soren E. Gisleson
Represented By: Stephen J. Herman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Kelly
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Craig Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Demetrius X. Lambrinos - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Heather T. Rankie - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Judith A. Zahid - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Craig Corbitt
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla
Represented By: Judith A. Zahid
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti
Represented By: Demetrius X. Lambrinos
Represented By: Heather T. Rankie
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Klosterman
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Craig Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Anthony L. DeLuca
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti
Represented By: Craig Corbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lacava
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman - INACTIVE
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lamson
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Mario Nunzio Alioto - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Joseph Marid Patane - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Lauren Clare Russell - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Joseph Marid Patane
Represented By: Mario Nunzio Alioto
Represented By: Lauren Clare Russell
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landers Auto Group Number One, Inc
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Richard L. Quintus - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard L. Quintus
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estaban Maravilla
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Maravilla
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martens Cars of Washington, Inc
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinez Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua R. Carver - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Megan A. Sanders - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Michael L. Silverman
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Manuel J Dominguez
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Gregory P. Hansel
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Randall B. Weill
Represented By: Douglas A. Abrahams
Represented By: William E. Hoese
Represented By: Joseph C. Kohn
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: William Caldes
Represented By: William H. London
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Joshua R. Carver
Represented By: Megan A. Sanders
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Michael S. Smith
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Craig W. Hillwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McGrath Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Joel Davidow
Represented By: John C. Kakinuki
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Victoria Romanenko
Represented By: Joshua Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Winton McInnis
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: David E. Plunkett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mexican Industries In Michigan, Incorporated
Represented By: Joshua R. Carver - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Megan A. Sanders - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Michael L. Silverman
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Manuel J Dominguez
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Gregory P. Hansel
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Randall B. Weill
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Joshua R. Carver
Represented By: Megan A. Sanders
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Represented By: Michael S. Smith
Represented By: William Caldes
Represented By: William H. London
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Muscara
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Leonard A. Davis - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Russ M. Herman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Austin Cohen - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Howard Sedran
Represented By: Austin Cohen
Represented By: Leonard A. Davis
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Russ M. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey R Nickell
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Aaron E. Robinson - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Eric B. Snyder - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Eric B. Snyder
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Aaron E. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D. Olson
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Craig Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Anthony L. DeLuca
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti
Represented By: Craig Corbitt
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan B. Olson
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: Craig Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Anthony L. DeLuca
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Craig Corbitt
Represented By: Charles F Barrett
Represented By: Christopher Micheletti
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: John W BARRETT
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paesano Connecting Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Silverman
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Charles F Barrett - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Manuel J Dominguez
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: Julie A. Strother - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: Lance C. Young
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Represented By: Manuel J. D