Grabow et al v. Macomb, County of
Plaintiff: Kristina Prochnow and Kelli Ann Grabow
Defendant: Macomb, County of
Case Number: 2:2012cv10105
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 81 Motion to review Clerk's Action re: Bill of Costs. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (CBet)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 62 Motion on the pleadings and Summary Judgment and dismissing case. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Memorandum and Order Granting Plaintiff's 50 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grabow et al v. Macomb, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Prochnow
Represented By: Vernon R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Ann Grabow
Represented By: Vernon R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?