Bormuth v. Jackson, City of et al
Plaintiff: Peter Bormuth
Defendant: Jackson, City of, Jackson Community College and John Yohe
Case Number: 2:2012cv11235
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: Laurie J. Michelson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION and ORDER Dismissing Claims and Setting Status Conference, ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/25/2013 12:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Loury, R)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 94 Plaintiff's Motion to set aside. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION AND ORDER denying 87 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE the Claims of Religious Discrimination against JCC and Todd Butler; denying 89 Motion for More Definite Statement and Directing Plaintiff to Show Cause by 5/27/2013 why the lack of evidence does not defeat the claims for religious discrimination against defendants John Yohe, City of Jackson and Gilbert Carlson. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION AND ORDER denying 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Defendants' Request for Partial Summary Judgment 82 is Granted in Part and Denied in Part and Plaintiff's Request to Dismiss Voluntarily is Denied. Plaintiff to submit a motion under 41(a)(2) by 1/29/2013. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 49 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as to any 1983 Claim against defendant Carlson; DENYING 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART 69 Defendants' Motion as to the 1983 Claims against Defendants Lillie and Brandt and the Monell claim against the City of Jackson and denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Appeal. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING 75 Stipulation filed by Peter Bormuth as to, 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment :( Plaintiff's Response due no later than 11/12/2012) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse/Disqualify. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter under Fed.R.Civ.Pro.Rule 59(e). Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Defendant City of Jackson's Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint and setting deadline of 7/24/2012 for responding to amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Directing Filing of Ex Parte Letter and Resetting the Scheduling Conference., ( Scheduling Conference re-set for 6/19/2012 11:30 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting ( Scheduling Conference for 6/21/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland)and Suspending Discovery. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse or Disqualify.. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bormuth v. Jackson, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Bormuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson, City of
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Community College
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Yohe
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?