State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Physiomatrix, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Kallil I. Kazan, D.C., Naim Khanafer, D.C., Sami Abu Farha, M.D., Sami Abu Farha, M.D, P.C., Tete Oniang'o, M.D., Tete Oniang'o, M.D., P.L.L.C., Physiomatrix, Inc. and Genex Physical Therapy, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv11500 |
Filed: |
April 3, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan |
Office: |
Ann Arbor Office |
County: |
Wayne |
Presiding Judge: |
David R. Grand |
Presiding Judge: |
John Corbett O'Meara |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 12, 2014 |
Filing
322
ORDER OVERRULING 302 Objection filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and 301 Objection filed by Physiomatrix, Inc., Genex Physical Therapy, Inc., Kallil I. Kazan, D.C., Naim Khanafer, D.C.. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
|
May 8, 2014 |
Filing
300
ORDER Adopting 285 Report and Recommendation re 246 Motion for Sanctions, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing
298
ORDER OVERRULING 276 Objection filed by Physiomatrix, Inc., Genex Physical Therapy, Inc., Kallil I. Kazan, D.C., Naim Khanafer, D.C.. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
226
OPINION AND ORDER denying 160 Motion to Dismiss; denying 187 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing
203
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 161 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (WBar)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
87
ORDER granting 74 Motion for Reconsideration, and to Amend Counter-Complaint, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
|
February 12, 2013 |
Filing
70
OPINION AND ORDER denying 38 Motion; granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting 44 Motion to Dismiss; granting 56 Motion to Dismiss; granting 57 Motion to Dismiss; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Physiomatrix, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Kallil I. Kazan, D.C. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Naim Khanafer, D.C. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sami Abu Farha, M.D. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sami Abu Farha, M.D, P.C. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tete Oniang'o, M.D. |
Represented By: |
Craig S. Romanzi |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tete Oniang'o, M.D., P.L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Craig S. Romanzi |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Physiomatrix, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Genex Physical Therapy, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
Represented By: |
Kathy P. Josephson |
Represented By: |
Patrick C. Harrigan |
Represented By: |
Eric T. Gortner |
Represented By: |
Ross O. Silverman |
Represented By: |
Morley Witus |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?