Seales v. Detroit, City of et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Seales
Defendant: Detroit, City of and Detroit, City of, Police Officer
Case Number: 2:2012cv11679
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: Stephen J. Murphy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT [#155], DENYING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS [#148] AND FINDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS MOOT[#147]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting 130 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW THE JURY TO INSPECT THE JAILS WHERE PLAINTIFF WAS UNLAWFULLY INCARCERATED [#113], GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES BILLIE BRYANT AND JASON LANE [#115], DENYING EMERGENCY M OTION TO ADJOURN TRIAL OR ALTERNATIVELY TO DELAY COMMENCEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S PRESENTATION OF PROOFS UNTIL WEDNESDAY JULY 25, 2018 [#126] AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO NON-PARTY, WAYNE COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE, FOR FAILURE TO PRODUCE COMPLETE AND UN-REDACTED FILE [#128]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS CITY OF DETROIT'S AND THOMAS ZBERKOT'S AMENDED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 74 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING WAYNE COUNTY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 70 AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ADVERSE INFERENCE 77 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seales v. Detroit, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of
Represented By: Dennis Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of, Police Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Seales
Represented By: Martin T. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?