Christopher v. Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth J. Christopher
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors, Inc., US Bank, N.A. as Successor Trustee for Ownit Mortgage Loan Trust, Series, 2006-4, Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv11872
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER APPROVING 49 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Matthew Mitchell filed by Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 47 the Motion for Indicative Ruling to Effect Terms of Settlement. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER denying 42 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Kenneth J. Christopher. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Ciesla, C)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, US Bank, N.A. Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc and Bank of New York Mellon against Plaintiff Kenneth Christopher (LWag)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION AND ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 25 Defendants' Motion to Strike Count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and directing Defendants to submit to Plaintiff a Bill of Costs by 1/23/2013. (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 15 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Strike 13 Amended Complaint to set aside Sheriff's Sale and/or Force Judicial Foreclosure filed by Kenneth J. Christopher. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Dismissing Defendant Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher v. Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors, Inc.
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Kyle R. Dufrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, N.A. as Successor Trustee for Ownit Mortgage Loan Trust, Series, 2006-4
Represented By: Janetta A. Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Janetta A. Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth J. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?