Federal Mogul Corporation v. Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Plaintiff: Federal Mogul Corporation
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 2:2012cv12005
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Nancy G. Edmunds
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 OPINION and ORDER re 139 accepting in part and rejecting in part pltf's proposed form of final judgment. The Court OVERRULES Defendant's first objection and SUSTAINS the second, and it ACCEPTS IN PART and REJECTS IN PART Plaintiff' s proposed judgment. In light of the rulings in this opinion and order, the parties should now be capable of agreeing to a judgment conforming to the Court's rulings. The Court accordingly directs the parties to submit a stipulated proposed judgment within seven days of this opinion and order. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OPINION & ORDER granting 27 Pltf's Motion to exclude expert report & testimony of the team experts; denying pltf's motion to exclude expert reports and testimony of Dr. Lee Branscome 29 and granting deft's motions to exclude expert reports, opinion testimony and sur-rebuttal report of Dr. Gerald Galloway [32 & 33]. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying 104 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED Opinion & 102 Order granting pltf's motion for partial summary judgment 90 and denying deft's cross-motion for partial summary judgment 96 .*Amended to reflect typographical error on page 15 Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION and ORDER granting pltf's 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment; and denying deft's cross motion for partial summary judgment 96 . Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION and ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 20 and Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 31 . The Court finds that all the pending motions to strike are rendered moot. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (JCur)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Mogul Corporation v. Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Mogul Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Michele A. Chapnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?