Surles v. Leach et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Surles
Defendant: G Leach, Raymond D Booker and Marva Myles
Case Number: 2:2012cv12403
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Branch
Presiding Judge: Paul D. Borman
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION AND ORDER denying 53 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Adopting 36 Report and Recommendation GRANTING 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Raymond D Booker, G Leach, GRANTING 34 Motion to Dismiss filed by Marva Myles, DENYING AS MOOT 15 Motion to Stay filed by Samuel Surles, DENYING AS MOOT 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Samuel Surles, DENYING AS MOOT 16 Motion to Stay, filed by Raymond D Booker, G Leach. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Despense with requirement of Security and denying 17 Motion to Strike - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surles v. Leach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Surles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond D Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marva Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?