Linear Group Services, LLC v. Attica Automation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linear Group Services, LLC
Defendant: Attica Automation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv10108
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Patent

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING LINEAR GROUP SERVICES, LLCS AND ND INDUSTRIES, INCS ORAL MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATER OF LAW. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER OVERRULING LINEARS OBJECTION TO ATTICAS PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION ON LITERAL INFRINGEMENT. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE [#131]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ATTICAS MOTIONS IN LIMINE [#119], DENYING LINEARS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE WILLIAM BENNETTS TESTIMONY REGARDING REASONABLE ROYALTY DAMAGES [#120], GRANTING ATTICAS MOTION TO REALIGN THE PARTIES [#121], AND DENYING LINEARS MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION [#122]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PRECLUDE MONETARY DAMAGES [#72], GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT [#77], GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MO TION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [#78], GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND DECLARATION OF JAMES DEFILLIPI [#98], DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY [#110], AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS [#112]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ANSWERS [#67] AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Calim Construction. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Compel Discovery - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION and ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE AND DISREGARD DEFENDANTS UNTIMELY EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION [#50]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FINDING ATTICA AUTOMATION, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL DISCLOSURES [#21] MOOT AND GRANTING ATTICA AUTOMATION, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL FIRST SETS OF INTERROGATORIES AND RULE 34 REQUESTS [#20]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linear Group Services, LLC v. Attica Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linear Group Services, LLC
Represented By: James Moskal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attica Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?