Beacon Navigation GmbH v. Audi AG et al.

Plaintiff: Beacon Navigation GmbH
Defendant: Audi AG, Audi of America, Incorporated and Audi of America LLC
Counter_claimant: Audi of America, Incorporated, Audi of America LLC and Audi AG
Counter_defendant: Beacon Navigation GmbH
Case Number: 2:2013cv11389
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Duggan
Referring Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Patent

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING: (1) DISMISSAL OF SPECIFIED CLAIMS; (2) LIMITATION ON REMAINING CLAIMS; (3) LITIGATION BEFORE THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE; (4) DENIAL OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS; (5) DELAYED GRANT OF THE REQUESTS TO CONSOLIDATE; AND (6) STAY Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
August 12, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
March 28, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Defendants' Motions to Transfer Venue. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/20/2013. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00921-GMS et al.(asw) [Transferred from ded on 3/28/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beacon Navigation GmbH v. Audi AG et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beacon Navigation GmbH
Represented By: Michael C. Ting - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi AG
Represented By: Michael J. Lennon
Represented By: Susan A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael J. Lennon
Represented By: Susan A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Lennon
Represented By: Susan A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Audi of America, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Audi of America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Audi AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Beacon Navigation GmbH
Represented By: Michael C. Ting - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Michael C. Ting - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?