W E T Automotive Systems, Ltd v. IGB Automotive Ltd

Plaintiff: W.E.T. AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD.
Defendant: IGB Automotive Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2013cv11536
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Referring Judge: Paul J. Komives
Presiding Judge: Arthur J. Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Patent

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; Permitting Addition of Gentherm GmbH as a Party; denying 88 MOTION to Confirm Dismissal with Prejudice and Right to Pursue Exceptional Case Status, vacating in part 79 Supple mental Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Fifth and Ninth Claims; Granting 92 MOTION To Reduce Gentherm's Number of Asserted Patent Claims; Ordering Defendant to Reduce Prior Art and Setting Discovery Cut-off Date: Discovery due by 4/30/2016. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
February 26, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER SETTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: 85 SEALED MOTION to Compel IGB to Produce Withheld Materials and to Reopen a Deposition re 83 Notice (Other), 84 MOTION to Compel IGB to Produce Withhe ld Materials and to Reopen a Deposition [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Gentherm GmbH, Gentherm Canada ULC, 84 MOTION to Compel IGB to Produce Withheld Materials and to Reopen a Deposition [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Gentherm GmbH, Gentherm Canada ULC., ( Sur-reply due by 3/18/2016)(See document for additional dates) Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
December 9, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 65 Sealed Motion--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
March 18, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Telephonic Hearing 56 Notice to Appear/Hearings as to 39 MOTION to Compel Discovery from IGB Automotive :( Joint List of Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 4/2/2015, Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti)--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
February 26, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 MOTION to Stay filed by IGB Automotive Ltd. Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2015 is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W E T Automotive Systems, Ltd v. IGB Automotive Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.E.T. AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD.
Represented By: Douglas G. Muehlhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGB Automotive Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?