Gonzalez Production Systems, Inc. v. Martinrea International Inc.

Plaintiff: Gonzalez Production Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Martinrea International Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv11544
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Referring Judge: Laurie J. Michelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2016 296 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTSMOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 288 AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
September 15, 2015 240 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER CONCERNING USE OF 30(B)(6) VIDEO DEPOSITIONS AS EVIDENCE AT TRIAL Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
August 18, 2015 232 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MARTINREAS MOTION IN LIMINE 180 ; GRANTING IN PARTAND DENYING IN PART MARTINREAS MOTIONS IN LIMINE [168, 174, 179]; DENYING MARTINREAS MOTIONS IN LIMINE [170, 181, 182]; AND DENYING IN PART GONZALEZS MOTION IN LIMINE 184 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
August 13, 2015 231 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER RESOLVING EVIDENTIARY ISSUE ONE AND TWO IN GONZALEZS MOTION IN LIMINE 184 , GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MARTINREAS MOTIONS IN LIMINE [186, 190], AND DENYING MARTINREAS MOTION IN LIMINE 188 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
February 27, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING GONZALEZS MOTION REGARDING TRIAL WITNESSES [#153] WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND GRANTING GONZALEZS MOTION OT QUASH MARTINREAS DISCOVERY SUBPOENA TO LELAND BOREN [#154]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
January 26, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING GONZALEZS MOTION TO BAR DOCUMENTS AND STRIKE PORTIONS OF MARTINREAS EXPERT REPORT [#124], DENYING MARTINREAS MOTION TO STRIKE GONZALEZS PROPOSED DAMAGES REPORT [#126], AND ISSUING SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
January 9, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LIMITED RECONSIDERATION AND RELIEF CONCERNING THE SUMMARY JUDMGENT ORDER AS TO PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL, ONLY [#120]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
November 17, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [#88] AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [#86]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
August 7, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT [#49] AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER [#58]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez Production Systems, Inc. v. Martinrea International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalez Production Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jason D. Killips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinrea International Inc.
Represented By: Brian A. Kreucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?